Global Risk Solutions America, Inc. v. Department of Homeland Security
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-22192

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 2:55 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adriana Margarita Delgado Vera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Roy Jesus Barquet +1 305 482 8403 +1 305 482 8600 rbarquet@foley.com
, , , , Richard S. Davis +1 305 482 8414 +1 305 482 8600 rdavis@foley.com
No Logo Global Risk Solutions America, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Roy Jesus Barquet +1 305 482 8403 +1 305 482 8600 rbarquet@foley.com
, , , , Richard S. Davis +1 305 482 8414 +1 305 482 8600 rdavis@foley.com
No Logo Miguel Alejandro Hidalgo Delgado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Roy Jesus Barquet +1 305 482 8403 +1 305 482 8600 rbarquet@foley.com
, , , , Richard S. Davis +1 305 482 8414 +1 305 482 8600 rdavis@foley.com
No Logo Miguel Jose Hidalgo Paredes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Roy Jesus Barquet +1 305 482 8403 +1 305 482 8600 rbarquet@foley.com
, , , , Richard S. Davis +1 305 482 8414 +1 305 482 8600 rdavis@foley.com
No Logo Oriana Valentina Hidalgo Delgado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Roy Jesus Barquet +1 305 482 8403 +1 305 482 8600 rbarquet@foley.com
, , , , Richard S. Davis +1 305 482 8414 +1 305 482 8600 rdavis@foley.com
v.
No Logo Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , John C. Spaccarotella +1 305 961 9212 john.spaccarotella@usdoj.gov
No Logo Associate Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Service Center Operations, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , John C. Spaccarotella +1 305 961 9212 john.spaccarotella@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Joseph Coppolino

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Anthony Joseph Coppolino

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office - Elm St (Htfd)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Maura Murphy-Osborne +1 860 808 5020 +1 860 808 5347 maura.murphyosborne@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space OIL-DCS Trial Attorney +1 202 305 0598 oil-dcs.cacd@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Henderson & Grohman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Karen Grohman +1 505 738 3507 kfg@hglegalgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Larry D Adams +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 larry.adams@usdoj.gov
, , , , Kathryne Gray +1 202 305 7386 +1 202 305 7777 kathryne.m.gray@usdoj.gov
, , , Jason Daniel Medinger +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 0122 jason.medinger@usdoj.gov
, Rod J Rosenstein +1 410 209 4800 rod.rosenstein@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , John C Bell John.Bell2@usdoj.gov
, Caroline Jane Clark Prime +1 619 546 7183 +1 619 546 7751 caroline.prime@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Anthony Marutollo +1 718 254 6288 +1 718 254 7489 joseph.marutollo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stacey Elise McCord +1 501 340 2630 stacey.mccord@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Jeremy Paul Sherer +1 205 244 2019 jeremy.sherer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kathryn Louise Smith +1 202 616 4039 +1 202 616 4002 kathryn.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Donald W Yoo +1 213 894 3994 +1 213 894 7819 donald.yoo@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Walter Manning Evans +1 202 616 2186 +1 202 305 4829 Manning.Evans@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by P.o. Box 868

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Carlton Frederick Sheffield +1 202 532 4737 carlton.f.sheffield@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Stevens Wilson +1 205 244 2140 +1 205 244 2181 Sarah.Wilson2@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sekret Tamara Sneed

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sekret T Sneed +1 213 894 3551 +1 213 894 7819 sekret.sneed@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Anthony Pogorzelski +1 305 961 9296 +1 305 530 7139 anthony.pogorzelski@usdoj.gov
, , , Nitin Shah +1 202 514 4269 nitin.shah@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Victoria S Shin +1 212 735 3732 +1 203 773 5373 Victoria.Shin@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-HFD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Lisa E. Perkins +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 760 7979 lisa.perkins@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michelle Lynn McConaghy +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 michelle.mcconaghy@usdoj.gov
, Douglas P. Morabito +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 Douglas.Morabito@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brock Darren Dupre +1 504 680 3005 brock.dupre@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Lynn Trinka Ernce +1 916 554 2720 +1 916 554 2900 lynn.trinka.ernce@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Arjun Garg +1 202 305 8613 +1 202 616 8470 arjun.garg@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Sam Delk Kennedy, Jr. +1 615 736 5151 delk.kennedy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sunni Jones LeBeouf +1 504 680 3061 Sunni.J.Lebeouf@usdoj.gov
, Lisa Leontiev +1 915 534 3491 lisa.leontiev@usdoj.gov
, Robert Ira Lester +1 213 894 2464 +1 213 894 7819 robert.lester@usdoj.gov
, , , , Heather Kirsten McShain +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Heather.McShain@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Craig Arthur Oswald +1 312 353 5300 craig.oswald@usdoj.gov
, Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither +1 713 567 9303 +1 713 718 3415 eleanor.robinson-gaither@usdoj.gov
, , , Sharon Denise Smith +1 504 680 3000 sharon.d.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Erik Kenneth Stegeby +1 202 616 4119 +1 813 274 6200 kenneth.stegeby@usdoj.gov
Space Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV +1 213 894 2434 USACAC.Habeas@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Jeannette Anne Vargas +1 212 637 2000 +1 212 637 2730 Jeannette.Vargas@usdoj.gov
Space Mark H. Wildasin +1 615 736 2079 +1 615 736 5323 mark.wildasin@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Northern District Of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abigail Lynn Peluso +1 312 353 5300 abigail.peluso@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Gary L. Anderson +1 210 384 7365 +1 210 384 7312 stephanie.karam@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , John C. Spaccarotella +1 305 961 9212 john.spaccarotella@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
, , , Christopher Douglas Frey +21263 720 00x2270 +1 212 637 2527 christopher.frey@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey Michael Bauer +1 202 532 4786 +1 202 616 8962 jeffrey.bauer@usdoj.gov
, , , Timothy Michael Belsan +1 202 532 4596 +1 202 305 7000 timothy.m.belsan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Renee Bennett +1 202 305 8902 michelle.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Jesi J Carlson +1 202 305 7037 +1 202 305 7000 jesi.j.carlson@usdoj.gov
, , , , Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lily Sara Farel +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 lily.farel@usdoj.gov
, , , August Edward Flentje +1 202 514 1278 august.flentje@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kyle Renee Freeny +1 202 514 5108 +1 202 616 8460 kyle.freeny@usdoj.gov
, , , Helen L Gilbert +1 202 514 4862
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn M Girdharry +1 202 532 4807 +1 202 305 7000 glenn.girdharry@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel P. Go +1 202 353 9923 +2 026 +16 8962 samuel.go@usdoj.gov
, , , Katherine E.M. Goettel +1 202 532 4115 +1 202 305 7000 kate.goettel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Aaron S Goldsmith +1 202 532 4107 +1 202 616 8962 aaron.goldsmith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Christopher Wayne Hollis +1 202 305 0899 +1 202 616 8962 christopher.hollis@usdoj.gov
, , , , Luke M. Jones +1 202 514 3770 luke.jones@usdoj.gov
, Jennie Leah Kneedler +1 202 305 8662 +1 202 616 8150 Jennie.L.Kneedler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Craig W. Kuhn +1 202 616 3540 craig.kuhn@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Brant S. Levine +1 202 616 4373 +1 202 616 4314 Brant.Levine@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Edward Martin +22616102 226 616 1024 edward.martin2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Emily B Nestler +1 202 616 8489 emily.b.nestler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Brett A. Shumate +1 202 514 2331 brett.a.shumate@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Laura Katherine Smith +1 202 616 0419 +1 202 616 4314 laura.smith2@usdoj.gov
, , , NATHAN MICHAEL SWINTON +1 202 305 7667 +1 202 616 8470 nathan.m.swinton@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrew H. Tannenbaum +1 202 616 8202 +1 202 616 8202 andrew.tannenbaum@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
, , , Lana L. Vahab +1 202 532 4067 +1 202 305 7000 lana.vahab@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
, , , , ADRIENNE ZACK +1 202 598 2446 adrienne.zack@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US Attorney Habeas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , US Attorney Habeas

Toggle Switch Represented by US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (SEA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Priscilla To-Yin Chan +1 206 553 7970 Priscilla.Chan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Rebecca S. Cohen +1 206 553 7970 +1 206 553 4067 rebecca.cohen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, District 9, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , John C. Spaccarotella +1 305 961 9212 john.spaccarotella@usdoj.gov
No Logo Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Wendy M. Garbers +1 415 436 6475 wendy.garbers@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Alejandro Pereda +1 415 436 7167 +1 415 436 6748 david.pereda@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , John C. Spaccarotella +1 305 961 9212 john.spaccarotella@usdoj.gov
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , John C. Spaccarotella +1 305 961 9212 john.spaccarotella@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order of Dismissal. The Court directs the Clerk to close this case. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/27/2017. (jas) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Adriana Margarita Delgado Vera, Global Risk Solutions America, Inc., Miguel Alejandro Hidalgo Delgado, Oriana Valentina Hidalgo Delgado, Miguel Jose Hidalgo Paredes (Davis, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice 1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus,,, as Moot by Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Associate Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Service Center Operations, Department of Homeland Security, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, District 9. Responses due by 11/3/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: NOID, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spaccarotella, John)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants the Defendants' 7 unopposed motion for extension of time. The Defendants' response to the 1 Complaint is due on or before October 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 10/13/2017. (jle) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus,,, by Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Associate Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Service Center Operations, Department of Homeland Security, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, District 9. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spaccarotella, John)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants the 5 United States of America's unopposed motion for extension of time. The Defendants' responses to the 1 Complaint are due on or before October 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 8/10/2017. (jle) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus,,, by Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Associate Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Service Center Operations, Department of Homeland Security, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, District 9, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Associate Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Service Center Operations(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, District 9(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spaccarotella, John) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Order Requiring Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 6/14/2017. (jas)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Summons Issued as to Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Associate Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Service Center Operations, Department of Homeland Security, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, District 9, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lrz1) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (lrz1) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9806141, filed by Adriana Margarita Delgado Vera, Miguel Jose Hidalgo Paredes, Global Risk Solutions America, Inc., Oriana Valentina Hidalgo Delgado, Miguel Alejandro Hidalgo Delgado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - USCIS Form I-140 Petition, # 2 Exhibit 2 - USCIS Form I-485 Adjustment of Status Applications, # 3 Exhibit 3 - USCIS Processing Time Information, # 4 Exhibit 4- USCIS e-Request Response, # 5 Summon(s) Department of Homeland Security, # 6 Summon(s) John F. Kelly, # 7 Summon(s) United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, # 8 Summon(s) James McCament, # 9 Summon(s) Linda Swacina, # 10 Summon(s) Donald Neufeld, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Richard) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 27 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?