Jarius Phillips v. Eddie Pearson
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-6850

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 16, 2017 at 12:59 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 2:15-cv-00453-AWA-LRL. Mailed to: J. Phillips. [16-6850] (EM)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER filed [999926359] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute (Local Rule 45) Copies to all parties. Mailed to: J. Phillips. [16-6850] (EM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Jarius Damar Phillips re: for failure to satisfy PLRA and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Informal Opening Brief due 08/24/2016. PLRA documents due 08/24/2016. Mailed to: Jarius Damar Phillips. [16-6850] (EM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Jarius Damar Phillips. Informal Opening Brief due 08/01/2016 [16-6850] (EM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          FEE NOTICE issued to Jarius Damar Phillips - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 08/05/2016 Originating case number: 2:15-cv-00453-AWA-LRL. Mailed to: Jarius Damar Phillips. [16-6850] (EM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 2:15-cv-00453-AWA-LRL. Date notice of appeal filed: 06/23/2016. Case manager: EMusser. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [16-6850] (EM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 108 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?