United States v. Certain Rights To and Interests In The Viceroy Hotel Group
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-04438

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 19, 2020 at 4:06 PM DT (11.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christen Sproule +1 213 894 4493 +1 213 894 7177 Christen.A.Sproule@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Galatzan +1 213 894 2727 +1 213 894 7177 jonathan.galatzan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Kucera +1 213 894 3391 +1 213 894 7177 john.kucera@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Woo S Lee +1 202 598 2249 woo.lee@usdoj.gov
Space Barbara Y Levy +1 202 353 9759 +1 202 616 1344 barbara.levy@usdoj.gov
Space Michael Raymond Sew Hoy +1 213 894 3314 +1 213 894 7177 michael.r.sew.hoy@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Certain Rights To and Interests In The Viceroy Hotel Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naeun Rim +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 nrim@birdmarella.com
No Logo JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd., Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia H Jun +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 phj@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D Matz +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 jmatz@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naeun Rim +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 nrim@birdmarella.com
No Logo JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia H Jun +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 phj@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy D Matz +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 jmatz@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naeun Rim +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 nrim@birdmarella.com
No Logo Mubadala Development Company Pjsc, Claimant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 0981
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Lifting Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Judgment - consent
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/22/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. IT IS ORDERED that potential claimant Mubadala Development Company PJSC's time to file a claim to the defendant asset is extended to July 13, 2018 and the time to file an answer or other resonsive document to the complaint remains as 30 days after the stay is lifted in this case. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (et) Modified on 6/13/2018 (bp).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint as to Potential Claimant Mubadala Development Company PJSC only; Claim deadline would be extended to 6/13/18; Answer remains 30 days after stay is lifted filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, 53, Potential Claimant, Mubadala Development Company PJSC's Mubadala Development Company PJSC answer due 6/13/2018 by Judge Dale S. Fischer (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) (bp) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint as to Mubadala Development Company PJSC only; Claim to be due 6/13/18 and Answer to be due 30 days after stay is lifted filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: 4/11/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, 50 . Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (pso)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Galatzan counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Jonathan Galatzan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Galatzan, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint; Claim to be due 5/14/18 and Answer to be due 6/4/18 as to potential claimant Mubadala Development Company PJSC only filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Michael R. Sew Hoy as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Sew Hoy, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              **SEALED**DETAILED STATUS REPORT ON STAYED CASE filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (bp) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  **SEALED**DECLARATION of John J. Kucera in support of APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review 45 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (bp) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Leave For In Camera Review
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT FILING FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW 45 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT on Stayed Case filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kucera, John)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/8/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer 42 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (twdb)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint. Claim would be due 4/13/18 and Answer would be due 5/4/18 as to Mubadala Development Company PJSC only filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, 40 . IT IS ORDERED that potential claimant Mubadala Development Company PJSC's time to file a claim to the defendant asset is extended to March 14, 2018 and the time to file an answer or other responsive document to the complaint is extended to April 4, 2018. (bp) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to Initial Complaint. Claim would be due 3/14/18 and Answer would be due 4/4/18 as to Mubadala Development Company PJSC only filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) Type of Service, Complaint/Summons. Served The Viceroy, Los Angeles Corporate Office, serve via email on 12/4/17. (bp) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, 36 . Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (iv) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File, 36 CORRECTING THE PROPOSED ORDER ONLY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint; Claim to be due 2/12/18 and Answer to be due 3/5/18 as to Potential Claimant Mubadala Development Company PJSC filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd., JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC, identifying JW Nile (BVI) Ltd.; FFP (Directors) Limited; FFP (Cayman) Limited; Jynwel Capital Partners Ltd.; Low Hock Peng; Goh Gaik Ewe; Low Taek Szen; Low May Lin; Low Taek Jho. (Attorney Naeun Rim added to party JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd.(pty:clm), Attorney Naeun Rim added to party JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC(pty:clm))(Rim, Naeun) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT 33 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Stipulation is granted. See Order for specifics. (ah)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Claim 1/11/2018 and Answer 2/5/2018 as to Mubadala Development Company PJSC filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, 31 . Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (pso)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Claim extended to 12/11/17 and Answer extended to 1/4/18 as to Mubadala Development Company PJSC filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER STAYING CIVIL FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Stay Case 29 (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Stipulation to Stay Case
                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, 25 . Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (pso)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd., JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC, re Claim 26 served on October 11, 2017. (Rim, Naeun) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None claim
                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM filed by Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd., JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC. (Rim, Naeun) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Stipulation for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Claim to initial complaint extended to 11/10/17, and answer or response to initial complaint to 12/4/17 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kucera, John) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeremy D Matz counsel for Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd., JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC. Adding Jeremy D. Matz as counsel of record for JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd. and JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd. and JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC. (Attorney Jeremy D Matz added to party JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd.(pty:clm), Attorney Jeremy D Matz added to party JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC(pty:clm))(Matz, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patricia H Jun counsel for Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd., JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC. Adding Patricia H. Jun as counsel of record for JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd. and JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd. and JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC. (Attorney Patricia H Jun added to party JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd.(pty:clm), Attorney Patricia H Jun added to party JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC(pty:clm))(Jun, Patricia) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ekwan E Rhow counsel for Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd., JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC. Adding Ekwan E. Rhow as counsel of record for Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG Intl) Ltd. and JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Claimants JW Hospitality (VHG Intl) Ltd. and JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC. (Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party JW Hospitality (VHG INTL) Ltd.(pty:clm), Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party JW Hospitality (VHG US) LLC(pty:clm))(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance 20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Naeun Rim on behalf of Defendant Certain Rights To and Interests In The Viceroy Hotel Group (Attorney Naeun Rim added to party Certain Rights To and Interests In The Viceroy Hotel Group(pty:dft))(Rim, Naeun) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Service of Summons and Complaint by Publication
                                                                                                                                                                  SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication upon Defendant Certain Rights To and Interests In The Viceroy Hotel Group last date of publication 7/18/2017, answer due 8/7/2017. Publication was made in the official government website (www.forfeiture.gov). (Kucera, John) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), 17 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Barbara Y Levy counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Barbara Y. Levy as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Barbara Y Levy added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Levy, Barbara) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christen Sproule counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Christen A. Sproule is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Sproule, Christen) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Galatzan counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Jonathan Galatzan as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Jonathan Galatzan added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Galatzan, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM (In Chambers) Order DENYING Request for Order re Stipulation by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (pso) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Warrant In Rem Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM (SEE WARRANT FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form onlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01899 DSF(VBKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge John A. Kronstadt to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-04438 DSF(PLAx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Woo S Lee on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Attorney Woo S Lee added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Lee, Woo) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff United States of America. Related Case(s): CV 16-5362 DSF (PLAx) (Kucera, John) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem
                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Warrant in Rem filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Warrant for Arrest In Rem) (Sproule, Christen) (bp).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Conflict Memorandum filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Sproule, Christen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Memorandum by US Attorney re Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on June 15, 2017, was pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Sproule, Christen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christen Sproule counsel for Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. Adding Christen A. Sproule as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Christen Sproule added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Sproule, Christen) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Kucera, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A-E) (Attorney John Kucera added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Kucera, John) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 334 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?