Wiitanen v. Midland Funding LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Western District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00534

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 3:19 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Karen Wiitanen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Golden Law Offices, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bert Thomas Golden +1 616 897 2900 btg@bthomasgolden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Warner Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Charles Warner +1 312 238 9820 +1 312 638 9139 cwarner@warnerlawllc.com
v.
No Logo Encore Capital Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle M. Asher +1 517 374 9137 kasher@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Wilson Seitz +1 517 374 9149 +1 517 374 9191 tseitz@dykema.com
No Logo Midland Credit Management Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle M. Asher +1 517 374 9137 kasher@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Wilson Seitz +1 517 374 9149 +1 517 374 9191 tseitz@dykema.com
Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle M. Asher +1 517 374 9137 kasher@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Wilson Seitz +1 517 374 9149 +1 517 374 9191 tseitz@dykema.com
No Logo Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Plunkett Cooney (Kalamazoo)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Hengeveld +1 248 901 4000 jhengeveld@plunkettcooney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Kenneth Mitzel +1 248 594 6718 bmitzel@plunkettcooney.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Karen Wiitanen (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion 36 for Reconsideration; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Compel Arbitration held 09/28/2017 before Honorable Gordon J. Quist; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 1/23/2018 ; redaction request due 11/15/2017 (Court Reporter: Trexler, Glenda (517)819-0396) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for reconsideration re 35 36 filed by Karen Wiitanen (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Reconsideration 36 filed by Karen Wiitanen (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for reconsideration re 35 by plaintiff Karen Wiitanen; (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS 22, 25 TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; case STAYED pending completion of arbitration; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MINUTES of motion hearing re 22 MOTION to compel Arbitration filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Funding LLC, 25 MOTION to compel Arbitration filed by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. held before Judge Gordon J. Quist (Court Reporter: Kevin Gaugier) (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING re 22, 25 : oral argument will be heard 9/28/2017 at 3:30 PM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to be held after motion hearing (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY to response to motion 25 filed by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. (Hengeveld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to response to motion 22 to Compel Arbitration filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER RESCHEDULING RULE 16: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/28/2017 at 3:30 PM at 482 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; status report due by 9/25/2017; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to compel Arbitration 22, MOTION to compel Arbitration 25 filed by Karen Wiitanen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Ms. Wiitanen) (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/27/2017 at 3:30 PM at 482 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; joint status report due by 9/22/2017; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel Arbitration 25 filed by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Hengeveld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to compel arbitration by defendant Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A.; (Hengeveld, Jeffrey) Modified text on 8/23/2017 (clw). (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to compel Arbitration 22 filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      BRIEF in support of MOTION to compel Arbitration 22 filed by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Motion to Compel) (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to compel arbitration by defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC; (Seitz, Theodore) Modified text on 8/23/2017 (clw). (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, Joint Notice for a Rule 16 Conference (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER DISMISSING AS PREMATURE "PLACEHOLDER" MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 5 ; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 8/11/2017; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. identifying Corporate Parent Weltman, Weinberg & Reis, LPA for Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. (Hengeveld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ANSWER to complaint 1 with affirmative defenses by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. (Hengeveld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Funding LLC identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Encore Capital Group, Inc. (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ANSWER to complaint 1 with affirmative defenses by Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Karen Wiitanen re MOTION to certify class 5, Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence 7, Memorandum in Support of a Motion 6 on Defendant Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A.; served on June 28, 2017 (Golden, Bert) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SUMMONS returned executed; Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. served on 6/28/2017, answer due 7/19/2017 (Golden, Bert) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Karen Wiitanen re MOTION to certify class 5, Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence 7, Memorandum in Support of a Motion 6 on Defendants Midland Funding LLC, and Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Golden, Bert) (Entered: 06/24/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  SUMMONS returned executed; Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017 (Golden, Bert) (Entered: 06/24/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS returned executed; Midland Funding LLC served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017 (Golden, Bert) (Entered: 06/24/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to certify class 5 filed by Karen Wiitanen (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Certify Class 5 filed by Karen Wiitanen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Curtis C. Warner) (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to certify class by plaintiff Karen Wiitanen; (Warner, Curtis)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC, Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. (clw) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (clw) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (Golden, Bert) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  COMPLAINT with jury demand, Class Action, against All Defendants filed by Karen Wiitanen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey Steven Hengeveld on behalf of defendant Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A. (Hengeveld, Jeffrey)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Theodore W. Seitz on behalf of defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kyle Michael Asher on behalf of defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Asher, Kyle)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Karen Wiitanen in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3867955 (Warner, Curtis)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bert Thomas Golden on behalf of plaintiff Karen Wiitanen (Golden, Bert)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?