USA v. Junior

Federal Court Proceeding Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:14-mj-07879
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated June 17, 2017 at 11:19 PM EDT (7.9 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jason Junior, Defendant (1)

Represented by Suite 1000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Idaho Federal Defender +1 208 331 5500 nancy_hernandez@fd.org
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice to District of Utah of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Jason Junior. Your case number is: 2:14-cr-247-DN. Docket sheet and documents attached. The clerk will transmit restricted documents via email. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to InterdistrictTransfer_IDD@id.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) Order of Transfer. (Attachments: # 1 ID docket sheet, # 2 ID minutes, # 3 ID Government's Motion to Unseal Indictment, # 4 ID Order Unsealing Indictment, # 5 ID Waiver of Rule 5 and 5.1 Hearings, # 6 ID Order Setting Conditions of Release, # 7 Rule 5 docs received, # 8 Redacted Rule 5 docs received)(st)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF TRANSFER as to Jason Junior (Notice sent to USM) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that further proceedings in this case shall be conducted in the District of Utah. The Clerk of this Court shall forthwith transmit to the Clerk of Court in said district the records of proceedings conducted in this district. Defendant is directed to appear in that district for further proceedings on May 27, 2014 at 10:30 a.m., before Judge Evelyn Furse, (Courtroom 8.4). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release (Notice sent to USP & USM). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Jason Junior (Notice sent to USP & USM) (st) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jason Junior (st) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER UNSEALING INDICTMENT granting 5 Motion to Unseal Case (Notice sent to USM) as to Jason Junior (1). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Government's Motion to Unseal Indictment by USA as to Jason Junior. (st) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Jason Junior held on 5/19/2014 (Notice sent to USP & USM) (Court Reporter/ESR S. O'Larey.) (so) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REDACTED Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Jason Junior (Notice sent to USP & USM). Redacted Utah Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Utah Warrant)(st)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jason Junior (Notice sent to USP & USM) Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) set for 5/19/2014 01:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge Larry M. Boyle. (ah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Jason Junior (Notice sent to USP & USM) (Attachments: # 1 Warrant Issued)(cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 39 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?