Penn v. Fugro Consultants, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00244
District Judge James J. Brady, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 17, 2017 at 11:59 PM EDT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Jonathan Penn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal G. Bounds +1 225 663 2612 cbounds@craftlaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Leininger Craft +1 225 663 2612 +1 225 663 2613 jcraft@craftlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps Dunbar (BR)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica C. Huffman +1 225 346 0285 +1 225 381 9197 Jessica.Huffman@phelps.com
v.
No Logo Fugro Consultants, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jill L. Craft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal G. Bounds +1 225 663 2612 cbounds@craftlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps Dunbar (BR)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica C. Huffman +1 225 346 0285 +1 225 381 9197 Jessica.Huffman@phelps.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Harry Kiggans +1 225 346 0285 +1 225 381 9197 kigganst@phelps.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER of DISMISSAL by Fugro Consultants, Inc., Jonathan Penn. This matter shall be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party bear his/its own costs and attorneys fees. (CGP) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Dismiss by Fugro Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(Kiggans, Thomas) Modified on 4/22/2013 (LLH). (Entered: 04/19/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. All discovery shall be completed and motion to compel filed by 4/30/2013. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 5/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 03/05/2013. (CGP) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order 2013-05, this case is reassigned from Magistrate Judge Unassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/21/2013. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(NLT ADI, ) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Joint MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery and Dispositve Motion Deadlines) by Fugro Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(Huffman, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Docket Entry Modification by Deputy Clerk regarding 8 - This document was filed in the incorrect case (NLT) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/19/2012. (SMG) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Fugro Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Agreed Protective Order)(Coco, Jessica) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 8/9/2012 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2012. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 8/27/2012. Discovery due by 3/11/2013. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 1/28/2013. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 2/27/2013. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 2/12/2013. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 3/14/2013. Discovery from Experts due by 4/15/2013. Motions shall be filed by 5/15/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2013. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/9/2013. Responses to Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/30/2013. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 10/30/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2013 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge James J. Brady. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 11/18/2013. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/31/2012. (JSL) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    STATUS REPORT by Jonathan Penn. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2012 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby. Status Report due by 7/26/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 6/4/2012. (JSL) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER to Complaint by Fugro Consultants, Inc..(Coco, Jessica) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 610,849. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053N-811526), filed by Fugro Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Service of Process, # 2 Attachment Proof of Service, # 3 Attachment Affidavit, # 4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Coco, Jessica) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?