Gamble v. Minnesota State-Operated Services
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:16-cv-02720
District Judge John R. Tunheim, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 13, 2021 at 5:30 PM EDT (4.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Clarence Antonia Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clarence Antonia Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clarence Antonia Washington +1 507 484 9930
No Logo Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MSOP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II
No Logo David James Jannetta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MSOP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David James Jannetta
No Logo David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by St. Peter Regional Treatment Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. +1 507 484 9930
No Logo Jerrad William Wailand, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jerrad William Wailand

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerrad William Wailand +1 507 484 9930
v.
No Logo Charlie Hoffman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Iverson Landrum +1 651 757 1189 +1 651 282 5832 kathryn.landrum@ag.state.mn.us
No Logo Dennis Benson, Defendant
No Logo DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Iverson Landrum +1 651 757 1189 +1 651 282 5832 kathryn.landrum@ag.state.mn.us
No Logo Emily Johnson Piper, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Iverson Landrum +1 651 757 1189 +1 651 282 5832 kathryn.landrum@ag.state.mn.us
No Logo John and Jane Does 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Lucinda Jesson, Defendant
No Logo Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Iverson Landrum +1 651 757 1189 +1 651 282 5832 kathryn.landrum@ag.state.mn.us
No Logo Minnesota State Industries, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Iverson Landrum +1 651 757 1189 +1 651 282 5832 kathryn.landrum@ag.state.mn.us
No Logo Minnesota State-Operated Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Iverson Landrum +1 651 757 1189 +1 651 282 5832 kathryn.landrum@ag.state.mn.us
No Logo Nancy A. Johnston, Defendant
No Logo Shelby Richardson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Iverson Landrum +1 651 757 1189 +1 651 282 5832 kathryn.landrum@ag.state.mn.us
No Logo Shirley Jacobson, Defendant
No Logo State of Minnesota, the, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Iverson Landrum +1 651 757 1189 +1 651 282 5832 kathryn.landrum@ag.state.mn.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 560 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None protective order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Adopting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 146 ; Denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216 and Identified Consenting Individuals as Collective Action Plaintiffs and Authorize Notice to Other Potential Collective Action Plaintiffs 134 ; denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion to Accept Late Filing of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum 149 . (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/20/2018. (JMK) cc: Jerrad William Wailand. Modified text on 4/23/2018 (MMP).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 87 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Clarence Antonia Washington, Jerrad William Wailand, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on December 27, 2017. (HAZ) Modified text on 12/27/2017 (ACH). cc: Gable, Gladden, Jannetta, Wailand, Washington
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to deny 87 Motion for TRO; to deny 87 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/1/2017. (lmb) cc: Pro Se Plaintiffs. Modified text on 12/12/2017 (kt).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, overruling in part and sustaining in part Defendants' Objections to the R&R 81 ; overruling Plaintiffs' Objections to the R&R 94 ; adopting in part and rejecting in part the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 80 ; granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 38 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 09/28/2017. (JMK) cc: Pro Se Plaintiffs. Modified text on 9/28/2017 (MMP). (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DECLARATION of David Le Roy Gamble re 101 Response by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope 1, # 3 2)(JDF) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FACTUAL BACKGROUND filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington .(JDF) Modified text on 8/24/2017 (JDF). (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennis Benson, Department of Human Services, Charlie Hoffman, Shirley Jacobson, Lucinda Jesson, Nancy A. Johnston, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the re 99 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to 94 Report and Recommendation by Dennis Benson, Department of Human Services, Charlie Hoffman, Shirley Jacobson, Lucinda Jesson, Nancy A. Johnston, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (Landrum, Kathryn) Modified filers on 8/21/2017 (lmb). (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennis Benson, Department of Human Services, Charlie Hoffman, Shirley Jacobson, Lucinda Jesson, Nancy A. Johnston, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the re 97 Request, (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE WITH EXHIBITS A AND B by Dennis Benson, Department of Human Services, Charlie Hoffman, Shirley Jacobson, Lucinda Jesson, Nancy A. Johnston, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. (Landrum, Kathryn) Modified text on 8/8/2017 (kt). (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          DECLARATION OF SERVICE by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington re 94 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 95 Appendix filed. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(kt) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            APPENDIX filed re 94 Objection to Report and Recommendations re Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(kt) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              OBJECTION to 80 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(kt) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr re 92 Proposed Order to Judge, 88 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 89 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 91 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 90 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 87 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested (ACH) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 87 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington.(ACH) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of David James Jannetta in SUPPORT OF 87 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington.(ACH) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of David Le Roy Gamble Jr. in SUPPORT OF 87 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(ACH) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Cyrus P. Gladden II in SUPPORT OF 87 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington.(ACH) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 87 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington.(ACH) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND NOTICE OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - Expedited Handling Requested, AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(ACH) Modified text on 8/4/2017 (ACH). (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 83 Motion to Enlarge Word Limit of and File Objection to Report and Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on July 27, 2017. (HAZ) cc: pro se plaintiffs'. Modified text on 7/28/2017 (MMP). (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                DECLARATION OF SERVICE by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington re 83 MOTION TO ENLARGE WORD LIMIT OF AND TIME TO FILE OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, 84 Letter to District Judge. (kt) Modified text on 7/24/2017 (kt). Document QC'd on 8/7/2017 (las). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (kt) Document QC'd on 8/7/2017 (las). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION TO ENLARGE WORD LIMIT OF AND TIME TO FILE OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 8/7/2017 (las). (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennis Benson, Department of Human Services, Charlie Hoffman, Shirley Jacobson, Lucinda Jesson, Nancy A. Johnston, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the re 81 Objection to Report and Recommendations, (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Benson, Department of Human Services, John and Jane Does 1-20, Shirley Jacobson, Lucinda Jesson, Nancy A. Johnston, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. Filed by Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)) (MMP) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          OBJECTION to 80 Report and Recommendations filed by Department of Human Services, Charlie Hoffman, Shirley Jacobson, Lucinda Jesson, Nancy A. Johnston, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certification of Compliance)(Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER that the plaintiffs' Motion to Amend, ECF No. 60 , is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is directed to refile the non-redlined version of the Proposed Amended Complaint, ECF No. 60-1, and the exhibits that were filed with the redlined version of the Amended Complaint, ECF No. 69-1, as the Amended Complaint in a separate docket entry. This docket entry will be considered the operative pleading in this case. The Court will issue an R&R on the defendants' motion to dismiss, ECF No. 38 , as if it had been filed in relation to the Amended Complaint without need for further briefing. The defendants will not be required to file a responsive pleading until after the District Court rules on the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/14/2017. cc: Pro se Plaintiffs. (MMP) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to grant in part and deny in part 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/5/17. (kt) CC: Pro se parties. (kt) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                DECLARATION of Service by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr re 74 Declaration in Support, 75 Declaration in Support, 76 Declaration in Support. (lmb) Qc'd on 3/24/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Declaration of Robert Marshall in Support of 60 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings re 1 Complaint; In Response to 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. (lmb) Modified text on 3/16/2017 (ACH). Qc'd on 3/24/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Declaration of Jason Boyd Fultz in Support of 60 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings re 1 Complaint; In Response to 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment). (lmb) Modified text on 3/16/2017 (ACH). Qc'd on 3/24/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Declaration of David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. in Support of 60 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings re 1 Complaint; In Response to 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General, filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment). (lmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2017: # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Envelope) (lmb). Qc'd on 3/24/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 67 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Plaintiffs Reply Brief Supporting Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/15/17. (cc: Plaintiffs with Local Rules) (AKL) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          DECLARATION OF SERVICE by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington re 68 Reply to Response to Motion, 71 Declaration in Support, 69 Exhibit, 67 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply, 70 Declaration in Support, (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(AKL) QC'd on 3/22/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Declaration of David James Jannetta in Support of 60 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 1 Complaint filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington.(AKL) QC'd on 3/22/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Declaration of Cyrus Patrick Gladden II in Support of 60 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 1 Complaint filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington.(AKL) QC'd on 3/22/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                EXHIBIT re 60 Motion to Amend (Amended Complaint). (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Exhibits A and B)(AKL) QC'd on 3/22/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Reply to Response to Motion re 60 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 1 Complaint filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington.(AKL) QC'd on 3/22/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Over-Length Reply Supporting 60 Motion to Amend filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (AKL) QC'd on 3/22/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 03/14/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by David James Jannetta, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. Emily Johnson Piper served on 12/21/2016, answer due 1/11/2017; Shelby Richardson served on 12/21/2016, answer due 1/11/2017. (MMP) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/10/17. (kt) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the re 64 Reply,, (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          REPLY re 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General , 60 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 1 Complaint,,, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend and Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by David James Jannetta, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. Minnesota Attorney General's Office served on 12/27/2016. (ACH) Document QC'd on 2/14/2017 (las). (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER The Court finds that the requested extension is reasonable and would serve the interest of justice and judicial economy. Accordingly, the request is GRANTED. It is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The defendants' response to the plaintiffs' motion to amend is due on or before February 24, 2017. 2. The defendants motion to dismiss (ECF No. 38 ) and the plaintiffs' motion to amend (ECF No. 60 ) will be considered simultaneously. The Court will issue a report and recommendation on both motions based on the papers without a hearing. 3. Though the parties have not requested it, the Court directs the plaintiffs to file a reply memorandum addressing the arguments made in the defendants' response to the motion to amend. The reply is due on or before March 10, 2017. The Court will not entertain a sur-reply brief on the defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/10/2017. cc: pro se parties. (MMP) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File and Serve Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Declaration of Service, # 3 Cover Letter, # 4 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd on 2/13/2017 (las). (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 54 Motion For Leave to File Over-Length Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. 1. The defendants shall have until February 24, 2017 to file their reply brief. 2. The defendants' reply brief shall not exceed 8,500 words. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/3/17. (LPH) cc: Pro se parties (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Landrum, Kathryn) Modified text on 2/3/2017 (kt). (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter is before the Court on the plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 54. The defendants are HEREBY ORDERED to inform the Court of whether they plan to oppose this motion on or before February 2, 2017. As they have previously done in this case, the defendants can provide this information by letter filed on ECF. If they are prepared to, the defendants should also indicate whether they would like permission to file an overlong reply brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/31/17. (MG) cc: all plaintiffs. Modified on 1/31/2017 (MMP). (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF SERVICE by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington re 55 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 54 MOTION For Leave to File Over-Length Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (MMP) Qc'd on 2/7/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (MMP) Qc'd on 2/7/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION For Leave to File Over-Length Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(MMP) Qc'd on 2/7/2017 (AKL). (Entered: 01/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by David James Jannetta, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, Jerrad William Wailand. Department of Human Services served on 12/27/2016, answer due 1/17/2017; Minnesota Sex Offender Program served on 12/27/2016, answer due 1/17/2017; Minnesota State Industries served on 12/27/2016, answer due 1/17/2017; Minnesota State-Operated Services served on 12/27/2016, answer due 1/17/2017; State of Minnesota, the served on 12/27/2016, answer due 1/17/2017. (MMP) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 2/1/17. (kt) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying without prejudice 8 Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Rule 23 filed by Clarence Antonia Washington, Jerrad William Wailand, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on January 10, 2017. (HAZ) cc: Pro Se Parties. Modified on 1/11/2017 (MMP). (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 2/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/6/17. (cc: Plaintiffs) (AKL) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta re 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General , 46 Declaration in Support, 47 Declaration in Support, 48 Letter to District Judge (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 1/27/2017 (JGK). (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 1/27/2017 (JGK). (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of David James Jannetta in Support of 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by David James Jannetta. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 1/27/2017 (JGK). (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Cyrus Patrick Gladden II in Support of 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 1/27/2017 (JGK). (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General by Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 1/27/2017 (JGK). (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to the Court by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 1/11/2017 (JGK). (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the re 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the re 40 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 41 Meet and Confer Statement, 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General , 39 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 38 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 38 MOTION to Dismiss/General : at date and time to be determined. (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss/General by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Minnesota Attorney General's Office. (lmb) Document QC'd on 1/24/2017 (las). (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT 37 . SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. Minnesota State-Operated Services served on 12/5/2016, answer due 12/27/2016. (lmb) Modified on 12/21/2016 (lmb). (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the re 34 Letter to Magistrate Judge, 33 Notice of Appearance, (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the . (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Iverson Landrum on behalf of Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. (Landrum, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Based on the foregoing, the Court HEREBY RECOMMENDS that the plaintiffs motion for class certification (ECF No. 8) be denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/7/2016. cc: Clarence Antonia Washington, Jerrad William Wailand, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. (KNK) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER (See Order for Details). cc: Gamble, Gladden III, Jannetta, Wailand and Washington. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 12/5/16. (JDF) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by David James Jannetta, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. Department of Human Services served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; Minnesota Sex Offender Program served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; Minnesota State Industries served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; Minnesota State-Operated Services served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; Emily Johnson Piper served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; Shelby Richardson served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016; State of Minnesota, the served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016. Minnesota Attorney General served 10/11/6. (LPH) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 12/30/16. (kt) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron no longer assigned to the case.NOTE: the new case number is 16-cv-2720 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)CC: Pro se parties. (kt) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued on behalf of Jerrad Wailand as to Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson. cc: USM (kt) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued on behalf of David Jannetta as to Department of Human Services, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson. (AKL) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Cyrus P. Gladden, II, enclosing seven USM forms. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope). (LEG) Document QC'd by JGK. Modified text on 11/8/2016 (JGK). (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the. USM forms received for Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the (LEG) Modified text on 10/13/2016 (LEG). (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, The State of Minnesota. (LEG) Modified text on 10/6/2016 (LEG). USM-285 forms received for Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, The State of Minnesota. (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from David Le Roy Gamble Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(LEG) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER REFERRING Litigants to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. cc: David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand and Clarence Antonia Washington. (LEG) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(LEG) Qc'd on 11/28/2016 (AKL). (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerrad William Wailand. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(LEG) Qc'd on 11/28/2016 (AKL). (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from Clerk's Office to Clarence Antonia Washington re: Order Granting Plaintiffs' Applications to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 14 with 8 USM forms. cc: Clarence Anotina Washington. (LEG) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from Clerk's Office to Jarrad William Wailand re: Order Granting Plaintiffs' Applications to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 14 with 8 USM forms. cc: Jarrad William Wailand. (LEG) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER from Clerk's Office to David James Jannetta re: Order Granting Plaintiffs' Applications to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 14 with 8 USM forms. cc: David James Jannetta. (LEG) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from Clerks Office to Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, re: Order Granting Plaintiffs' Applications to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 14 with 8 USM forms. cc: Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II. (LEG) Modified text on 9/28/2016 (LEG). (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from Clerk's Office to David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., re: Order Granting Plaintiffs' Applications to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 14 with 8 USM forms. cc: David Le Roy Gamble, Jr (LEG) Modified text on 9/28/2016 (LEG). (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that plaintiffs' Applications to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [Docket Nos. [2-6] are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/28/16. cc: David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (LEG) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE, NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS, REQUEST re Status of IFP Application, and request for forms, from David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(JDF) Modified text on 9/12/2016 (lmb). Document QC'd on 9/14/2016. Modified on 9/14/2016 (JGK). (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER regarding Request for a Recommendation to FBA Pro Se Project from David Le Roy Gamble Jr. (LEG) Modified docket text on 8/15/2016 (TSS). Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., in SUPPORT OF 8 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class filed by David Le Roy Gamble. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of of Cyrus Patrick Gladden in SUPPORT OF 8 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class filed by Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Certify Conditional Class filed by David Le Roy Gamble,Jr., Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). Modified on 8/15/2016 (MMP). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO RULE 23 by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). Modified text on 8/15/2016 (MMP). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM SUPPORTING COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David James Jannetta, Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Anotnia Washington. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). Modified on 8/15/2016 (MMP). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Clarence Antonia Washington. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). Modified on 8/15/2016 (MMP). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jerrad William Wailand. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by David James Jannetta. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by David Le Roy Gamble, Jr. (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). Modified text on 8/15/2016 (MMP). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Department of Human Services, Minnesota Sex Offender Program, Minnesota State Industries, Minnesota State-Operated Services, Emily Johnson Piper, Shelby Richardson, State of Minnesota, the, and any John and Jane Does 1-20. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Filed by David James Jannetta, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Consent forms, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Envelope). cc: David James Jannetta, Cyrus Patrick Gladden, II, David Le Roy Gamble, Jr., Jerrad William Wailand, Clarence Antonia Washington (LEG) Document QC'd on 8/15/2016 (JGK). Modified text on 8/15/2016 (LEG). (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?