BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC. v. NUNA INTERNATIONAL B v.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-02724

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 1, 2021 at 11:28 AM EST (9.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Britax Child Safety Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn M. Hazard +1 215 994 2247 +1 215 655 2247 carolyn.hazard@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson Kill & Olick, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARISA J. STEEL +1 212 278 1000 +1 212 278 1733

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel T. Brier +1 570 342 6100 dbrier@mbklaw.com
Space PATRICK T. HENIGAN +1 610 565 3700 +1 610 565 1596 phenigan@eckellsparks.com
Space PETER F. VAIRA +1 215 985 4275 p.vaira@gpeff.com
Space Ann D. White +1 215 690 3858 +1 215 481 0271 awhite@awhitelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DANIEL R. GRAVELYN +1 616 742 3930 +1 616 742 3999 dgravelyn@btlaw.com
Space MARK S. KITTAKA +1 260 423 9440 +1 260 424 8316 mkittaka@btlaw.com
Space Kendall Millard +1 317 231 7461 +1 317 231 7433 kmillard@btlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellen Meriwether +1 215 864 2144 +1 215 864 2810 emeriwether@caffertyclobes.com
Space MICHAEL S. TARRINGER +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 mtarringer@caffertyclobes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey I. Zuckerman +1 202 452 7350 +1 202 452 7333 Jzuckerman@cm-p.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JENNIFER A. BAGNATO +1 212 696 8895

Toggle Switch Represented by D.R. MARTIN LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Ramon Martin +1 770 454 1999 +1 770 458 5709 dmartin@abogar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by David B. Smith Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM R. KANE +1 610 407 7018

Toggle Switch Represented by DAVID M. ZACKS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID M. ZACKS +1 404 815 6100

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M Clinton +1 206 903 8800 +1903882 +19 903 8820 clinton.richard@dorsey.com
Space Neil Edwin McDonell +1 212 415 9200 +1 212 953 7201 mcdonell.neil@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Edelson & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARC H. EDELSON +1 215 230 8043 +1 215 230 8735 medelson@edelson-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ellenoff Grossman & Schole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK L. WEYMAN +1 212 370 1300 mweyman@egsllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Russell Kohn +1 215 277 5770 +1 215 277 5771 pkohn@faruqilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flaster Greenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HARRY J. GIACOMETTI, JR. +1 215 587 5680 +1 215 279 9394 harry.giacometti@flastergreenberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KRISTINA C.E. COLE +1 215 994 2331
Space George G. Gordon +1 215 994 2000 +1 215 994 2222 george.gordon@dechert.com
Space Joseph A. Tate +1 215 994 2350 +1 215 994 2222 joseph.tate@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Anne Fegan +1 708 776 5600 +1 708 776 5601 beth@hbsslaw.com
Space Ivy Arai Tabbara +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 ivy@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter M. Boyle +1 202 508 5831 +1 202 585 0057 pboyle@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space AUDRA ANN DIAL +1 404 815 6500 +1 404 815 6555 adial@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Svetlana S. Gans +1 202 639 4732 sgans@kilstock.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRIS W. HAAF +1 336 607 7309 +1 336 607 7500 chaaf@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Jonathan Ernest Harris +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jeharris@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Noel Dean Powell, Jr. +1 336 607 7300 dpowell@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space CONSTANCE K. ROBINSON +1 202 508 5822 +1 202 585 0002 crobinson@kilpatrickstockton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JONATHAN SHUB +1 215 238 1700 +1 215 238 1968 jshub@kohnswift.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason D Cruise , +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 jason.cruise@lw.com
Space Alexander Maltas +1 202 637 2295 +1 202 637 2201 alexander.maltas@lw.com
Space Marguerite Mitchell Sullivan +1 703 456 1000 +1 202 637 2201 marguerite.sullivan@lw.com
Space Edward Marcellus Williamson +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 marc.williamson@lw.com
Space Margaret Moran Zwisler +1 202 637 1092 +1 202 637 2201 peggy.zwisler@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bruce Egert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALAN A. TURNER +1 215 546 9700 +1 215 546 9712 aturnerlaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joseph V. Neill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHRISTOPHER R. BOOTH, JR. +1 215 518 6683 cboothjr@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah Blaine +1 973 597 2500
Space DOUGLAS SCOTT EAKELEY +1 973 597 2500 deakeley@lowenstein.com
Space Michael Jeffrey Hahn +1 973 597 2526 +1 973 597 2527 mhahn@lowenstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MCSHEA LAW FIRM PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RALPH J. KELLY +1 215 599 0800 rkelly@mcshealawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MEREDITH & NARINE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KRISHNA B. NARINE +1 215 564 5182 knarine@m-npartners.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meringolo and Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LISA LEVINE KEMPNER +1 267 307 5859 levinekempner@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Myers, Brier & Kelly, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Suzanne Patricia Conaboy +1 570 342 6100 +1 570 342 6147 sconaboy@mbklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Offit, Kurman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL CONLEY +1 267 299 7135 mconley@offitkurman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PENNSYLVANIA INNOCENCE PROJECT AT TEMPLE UNIVER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NILAM A. SANGHVI +1 215 204 4255 nilam.sanghvi@temple.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Penthouse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Isaac Jaime Mitrani +1 305 358 0050 +1 305 358 0550 imitrani@mitrani.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAWRENCE KILL +1 212 521 6054
Space HARRY H. RIMM +1 212 521 6080 +1 212 278 1733
Space MELISSA RUBENSTEIN +1 215 851 8100 +1 215 851 1420 mrubenstein@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Garrett D. Blanchfield +1 651 287 2100 +1 651 287 2103 g.blanchfield@rwblawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Jane Fait +1 847 922 6729 +1 312 676 2676 maryjane15@me.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SAMUEL W. SILVER +1 215 751 2309 +1 215 751 2205 ssilver@schnader.com
Space DENNIS R. SUPLEE +1 215 751 2068 +1 215 751 2205 dsuplee@schnader.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Finkelman, Miller & Shah, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jayne A. Goldstein +1 954 515 0123 +1 954 515 0124 jgoldstein@sfmslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM J. MURRAY, JR. +1 267 670 1818 williamjmurrayjr.esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Caldes - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 bcaldes@srkw-law.com
Space Jeffrey J. Corrigan +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 jcorrigan@srk-law.com
Space Jeffrey Louis Kodroff +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 jkodroff@srkw-law.com
Space Eugene A. Spector +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 espector@srkw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore Beloyeannis Bell +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 tbell@whafh.com
v.
No Logo NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary C. Ma +1 650 849 6600 +1 650 849 6666 Gary.Ma@finnegan.com
Space Roger Dale Taylor +1 404 653 6480 +1 404 653 6444 taylorr@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gross McGinley, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SAMUEL EZRA COHEN +1 610 820 5450 scohen@grossmcginley.com
No Logo Nuna International B.v., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary C. Ma +1 650 849 6600 +1 650 849 6666 Gary.Ma@finnegan.com
Space Roger Dale Taylor +1 404 653 6480 +1 404 653 6444 taylorr@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gross McGinley, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SAMUEL EZRA COHEN +1 610 820 5450 scohen@grossmcginley.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Decision - Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/12/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Summary Partial Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Seal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Returned Mail
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/4/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Transcript - PDF
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Markman Hearing
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION/ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS NO. 26 IS DENIED; THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ANY DISCOVERY BY 9/8/18; AND DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 9/8/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/26/18. 7/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT THE COURT DENIES NUNA B.V.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6)(2) WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH THE RIGHT TO RENEW AT THE CLOSE OF JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. ADDITIONALLY THE COURT DENIES DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6). A SEPARATE ORDER FOLLOWS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/26/18. 7/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by SUZANNE P CONABOY on behalf of BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC. with Certificate of Service(CONABOY, SUZANNE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL T. BRIER on behalf of BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BRIER, DANIEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: 12/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss re 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC., NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V. Certificate of Service. (COHEN, SAMUEL) Modified on 12/11/2017 (lisad, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jon Harris with Exhibits A-J, # 2 Text of Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Text of Proposed Order re Discovery-Leave to Amend)(HAAF, CHRIS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC., NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V..Brief, Affidavits and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, SAMUEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY GARY C. MA, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/6/17. 11/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY, E-MAILED. (mas, ) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 12, IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/6/17. 11/6/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT together with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service against NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC., NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V., filed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Part 3)(ti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC.. (HAAF, CHRIS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF GARY C. MA ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V. AND NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC.; FILING FEE $40.00 PAID, RECEIPT NO. APE004438; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nuna International B.V. with Certificate of Service by NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC..(COHEN, SAMUEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V..(COHEN, SAMUEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ROGER D. TAYLOR, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/25/17. 10/25/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, MAILED WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JONATHAN E. HARRIS, TO PRACTICE IN THISCOURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/20/17.10/23/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED W/ECF FORMS, E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 10/23/2017 (er, ). (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF N. DEAN POWELL, JR. ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/20/17.10/23/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF AUDRA A. DIAL, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THISCOURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/20/17.10/23/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED W/ECF FORMS, E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 10/23/2017 (er, ). (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF STEVEN D. MOORE, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/20/17.10/23/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of ROGER D. TAYLOR by NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC., NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V. (FEE PAID - $40 - APE004415). (er, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC., NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V..Brief, Affidavit and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, SAMUEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL EZRA COHEN on behalf of NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC., NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V. with Certificate of Service(COHEN, SAMUEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan E. Harris ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12400700.) filed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC..Applicant's Statement, Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service.(HAAF, CHRIS) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of N. Dean Powell, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12400684.) filed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC..Applicant's Statement, Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service.(HAAF, CHRIS) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Audra A. Dial ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12400671.) filed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC..Applicant's Statement, Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service.(HAAF, CHRIS) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Steven D. Moore ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12400645.) filed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC..Applicant's Statement, Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service.(HAAF, CHRIS) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC.. NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC. waiver sent on 9/11/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V. waiver sent on 9/11/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (HAAF, CHRIS) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE THAT A REVIEW OF THE COURT'S RECORDS DOES NOT INDICATE THAT PLAINTIFF HAS PROPERLY SERVED DEFENDANTS AS OF THIS DATE. IF PROOF OF SERVICE IS NOT FILED WITHIN THIRTY DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS NOTICE, THE COURT MAY DISMISS THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 4(m). (ky, ) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 9,586,504. (jmv, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/20/2017) (jmv, ). (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC.(jmv, ) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration re 1 Complaint, by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A - US Patent No 9586504)(HAAF, CHRIS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against NUNA BABY ESSENTIALS, INC., NUNA INTERNATIONAL B.V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE161254), filed by BRITAX CHILD SAFETY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Case Management Track Form, # 3 Designation Form)(jmv, ) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?