ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01203

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 9:51 PM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Mina Amirpashaie +1 703 771 8394 kmalawoffice@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hannah Mary Margaret Connor +1 202 676 2354 hconnor@humanesociety.org

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer C. Chavez +2026 674 500 x208 jchavez@earthjustice.org
Space Emma C. Cheuse +1 202 667 2356 echeuse@earthjustice.org
Space Thomas Cmar +1 312 663 9900 tcmar@earthjustice.org
Space Robin Cooley +1 303 623 9466 +1 303 623 8083 rcooley@earthjustice.org
Space Abigail M Dillen +1 406 579 9844 +1 406 586 9695 adillen@earthjustice.org
Space Lisa Gollin Evans +1 781 631 4119 levans@earthjustice.org
Space Bridget M. Lee +1 212 791 1881 +1 212 918 1556 blee@earthjustice.org
Space Edward Breckenridge Zukoski +1 303 623 9466 +1 303 623 8083 tzukoski@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer S. Duggan +1 802 225 6774 +1 202 296 8822 jduggan@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Mary Evelyn Greene +1 202 296 8800 +1 202 296 8822 mgreene@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Lisa Widawsky Hallowell +1 202 294 3282 +1 202 296 8822 lhallowell@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Tarah Elizabeth Heinzen +1 202 263 4441 theinzen@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Sparsh Khandeshi +1 202 263 4446 skhandeshi@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Adam M. Kron +1 202 263 4451 +1 202 296 8822 akron@environmentalintegrity.org
Space Abel J. Russ +1 202 263 4453 +1 202 296 8822 aruss@environmentalintegrity.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric V. Schaeffer +1 202 296 8800 +1 202 296 8892 eschaeffer@environmentalintegrity.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Humane Society Of The United States,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Alfred Brandt +1 240 388 5023 +1 202 778 6132 pbrandt@hsus.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morningside Heights Legal Services Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan J. Kraham +1 212 854 4291 +1 212 854 3554 skraha@law.columbia.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Natural Resources Defense Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared Eldridge Knicley +1 202 513 6242 jknicley@nrdc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by One Thomas Circle, NW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer S Peterson +1 202 263 4449 +1 202 296 8822 jpeterson@environmentalintegrity.org

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather E. Gange +1 202 514 4206 +1 202 514 8865 heather.gange@usdoj.gov
v.
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov
Space Jeremy S. Simon +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 jeremy.simon@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred Elmore Haynes +1 202 514 7201 +1 202 514 8780 fred.haynes@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua L. Rogers +1 202 252 2578 joshua.rogers3@usdoj.gov
Space April Denise Seabrook +1 202 252 2525 +1 202 252 2599 april.seabrook@usdoj.gov
Space Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Simi Bhat +1 202 514 0242 simi.bhat@usdoj.gov
Space Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov
Space Madeline P. Fleisher +1 202 514 0242 madeline.fleisher@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
Space Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
Space Nikhel Sus +1 202 514 2071 +1 202 616 8470 nikhel.s.sus@usdoj.gov
Space Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 07/25/2018. (lcjdb3)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for attorney fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Clarify
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    Consent MOTION to Vacate by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Supplemented Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended and Supplemented Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Eric)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Schaeffer, Eric) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ERRATA by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Schaeffer, Eric)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER directing parties to confer and to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions by not later than August 21, 2017. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/21/2017. (lcjdb3)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Rogers, Joshua)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/26/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt, # 2 Exhibit Electronic Confirmation)(Schaeffer, Eric)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt, # 2 Exhibit Electronic Confirmation)(Schaeffer, Eric)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Schaeffer, Eric)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Schaeffer, Eric) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/20/2017) (td).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Filing fee $ 400) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons EPA, # 7 Summons USAO, # 8 Summons USDOJ)(Schaeffer, Eric)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?