Bull Shoals Community Hospital & Clinic - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 3:91-ap-03514
District Judge Robert F. Fussell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 9:47 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bull Shoals Community Hospital & Clinic, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Isaac A. Scott, Jr. +1 501 371 0808 +1 501 212 1236
v.
No Logo A. Jumpuris, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Air Evac Ems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Arizona Family Care Assoc., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Arkansas Allergy Clinic, P.A., Defendant
No Logo Arkansas Spine Center, Defendant
No Logo Baxter County Regional Hospital, Defendant
No Logo Baxter Hospital Home Health, Defendant
No Logo Baxter Medical Equipment, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Beck Clinic, Defendant
No Logo Bennett Professional Assoc., Defendant
No Logo CARTI, Defendant
No Logo Chambers Clinic, LTD., Defendant
No Logo Charles R. Barton, DDS, Defendant
No Logo Charles R. Klepper, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Chock Medical Clinic, P.A., Defendant
No Logo Comprehensive Pathology Services, Defendant
No Logo Cox Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo D. S. Douglas, M.D., Pathology, Defendant
No Logo Damon Clinical Laboratories, Defendant
No Logo David T. Sward, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Delnor Community Hospital, Defendant
No Logo Diagnostic Clinic, Defendant
No Logo Diagnostic Clinic, P.C., Defendant
No Logo E. R. Borja, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Eye Surgeons of Springfield, Defendant
No Logo Fayetteville Diagnostic Clinic, Defendant
No Logo Ferrell-Duncan Clinic, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frederick C. Turner, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Gary B. Wells, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Gladden & Williams, M.D.'s, P.A., Defendant
No Logo Harrison Anesthesia Group, Defendant
No Logo Helen Him, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Henry Brandon, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Integrated Medical Imaging, PC, Defendant
No Logo James C. Croom, Defendant
No Logo John Wissinger, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Kerr-Wilbur Clinic, Defendant
No Logo L. A. Kelley, M.D., Defendant
No Logo L. Davis, Defendant
No Logo Langevin Vision Clinic, PA, Defendant
No Logo Litton & Giddings Radiology, Defendant
No Logo Loyde Hudson, Defendant
No Logo Medical College Physicians Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Arkansas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Alan Bell +1 501 686 2536 jbell@uasys.edu
LEAD ATTORNEY Fred H. Harrison +1 501 686 2515 fharrison@uasys.edu
No Logo Medical Mile Imaging, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mountain Home Anesthesia, Defendant
No Logo Mountain Home Obstetrics & Gynecology, Defendant
No Logo Mountain Home Physical Therapy Clinic, Defendant
No Logo Mountain Home Radiology Consultants, Defendant
No Logo Mountain Home Urology, Defendant
No Logo National Medical Rentals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo North Arkansas Medical Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gresham & Kirkpatrick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY James E. Gresham +1 870 741 6164
No Logo Northwest Arkansas Radiology Associates, Defendant
No Logo Oak Hills Pathology, Defendant
No Logo Oncology Hema Assoc. SPFLD, Defendant
No Logo Ozark Counseling Services, Defendant
No Logo Ozark Eye Center, Defendant
No Logo Ozark Orthopedic Assoc., Defendant
No Logo Ozark Surgical Group, Defendant
No Logo Pathology Services of Springfield, Defendant
No Logo Professional Sales & Rentals, Defendant
No Logo Providers of Medical Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Arkansas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Alan Bell +1 501 686 2536 jbell@uasys.edu
LEAD ATTORNEY Fred H. Harrison +1 501 686 2515 fharrison@uasys.edu
No Logo Radiology Associates, Defendant
No Logo Ramon Gonzalez, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Renu S. Jerath, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Richard L. Burnett, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Robert Miller, M.D., Pathology, Defendant
No Logo Ronald M. Crow, D.O., Defendant
No Logo Smith-Glynn-Callaway, Defendant
No Logo Sneed Eye Clinic, Defendant
No Logo South Texas Radiology Group, Defendant
No Logo Specialized Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Clinics, Defendant
No Logo Springfield Community Hospital, Defendant
No Logo Springfield Neurological Assoc., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Springfield Radiological Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Springfield Thoracic & Cardiovascular Clinic, Inc., Defendant
No Logo St. James Hospital Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo St. Luke's Lutheran Hospital, Defendant
No Logo St. Vincent Infirmary Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Statscan, Defendant
No Logo Stone County Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Surburban Heights Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Terkeurst Urology Clinic, Defendant
No Logo Thomas E. Knox, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Thumb Radiological Services, Defendant
No Logo Tri-City Radiology, Defendant
No Logo Twin Lakes Gastroenterology, P.A., Defendant
No Logo Ungerank Chiropractic Life Center, Defendant
No Logo University Hospital of Arkansas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Arkansas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Alan Bell +1 501 686 2536 jbell@uasys.edu
LEAD ATTORNEY Fred H. Harrison +1 501 686 2515 fharrison@uasys.edu
No Logo University Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo University of Tennessee, Defendant
No Logo University of Tennessee Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Washington Regional Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Watchcare Anesthesia, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Karen J. F. Swogger
No Logo William Berry, M.D., Defendant
No Logo William F. Dossmann, M.D., Defendant
No Logo William Tolleson, M.D., Defendant
No Logo Claude R. Jones, Trustee
Nature of Suit 434 - Injunctive Relief
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/1993, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Dismissing [1-1] Complaint NOS 434 Injunctive Relief . Dismissed without prejudice. [casemgr] (Entered: 04/26/1993)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/31/1993, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Courts Certificate of Mailing on [0-0] Pre Trial/Status Conference Re: [1-1] Complaint NOS 434 Injunctive Relief # of notices: 5. [casemgr] (Entered: 04/01/1993)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/1992, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Certificate Of Mailing By Kimberly Tucker/Isaac A. Scott for Plaintiff Bull Shoals Community Hospital & Clinic Of copy of [0-0] Summons, and [1-1] Complaint NOS 434 Injunctive Relief . [casemgr] (Entered: 03/23/1992)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/14/1992, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Answer To Complaint by Defendant Watchcare Anesthesia, Inc. [casemgr] (Entered: 02/19/1992)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Answer To Complaint by Defendant Medical College Physicians Group, Defendant University Hospital of Arkansas, Defendant Providers of Medical Services . [casemgr] (Entered: 02/04/1992)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Answer To Complaint by Separate Defendant North Arkansas Medical Center . [casemgr] (Entered: 02/03/1992)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/1991, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Complaint [91-3514] Bull Shoals Community Hospital & Clinic vs. Providers of Medical Services . NOS 434 Injunctive Relief . [ Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 10576] [casemgr] (Entered: 12/26/1991)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 16 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?