CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. v. Montgomery Sibley
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-2305

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 1:29 AM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY by Appellee CarMax Auto Superstores, Incorporated. [1000048878]. [16-2305]--[Edited 03/24/2017 by BB] Joshua Waxman
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER filed [1000044670] deferring action on Motion to strike filed by Appellee CarMax Auto Superstores, Incorporated [28]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Montgomery B. Sibley. [16-2305] (TW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE/ANSWER by Montgomery B. Sibley to notice requesting response [29], Motion to strike [28]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-2305] (MR)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE ISSUED to Montgomery B. Sibley requesting response to Motion to strike [28] Response due 03/20/2017.[1000038037]. Mailed to: appellant. [16-2305] (MR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION by Appellee CarMax Auto Superstores, Incorporated to strike Appellant Montgomery Sibley's Request to Supplement the Record Pursuant to Rule 28(j).. Date and method of service: 03/07/2017 US mail. [1000037806] [16-2305] Joshua Waxman
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice issued re: [26] Letter , [23] Order. Mailed to: appellant. . [16-2305] (MR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Letter re: [23] Order by Appellant Montgomery B. Sibley. [1000033658] [16-2305] (MR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellant Montgomery B. Sibley. [1000025142]. [16-2305] (MR)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER filed [1000019278] placing case in abeyance. Case 16-2305 placed in abeyance pending decision in 16-285 from U. S. Supreme Court. Copies to all parties.. [16-2305] (MR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 13 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?