CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01208

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 21, 2021 at 12:29 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Center for Biological Diversity, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Biological Diversity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy R. Atwood +1 503 283 5474 +1 503 283 5528 atwood@biologicaldiversity.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William John Snape, III +1 202 536 9351 +1 415 436 9683 wsnape@wcl.american.edu
v.
No Logo U.S. Bureau of Land Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Memorandum
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Surreply
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Surreply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Related document: 6 Amended Complaint filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Standing Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?