District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Eastern District Court United States Supreme Court

Lorienton N. A. Palmer, et al. v. John Doe 98-CR-01101, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 14-676

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lorienton N. A. Palmer, et al., Petitioners
United States of America United States of America, Respondents
Officially listed as "United States"
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 1/25/2015, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015.
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
        Motion (14M61) of petitioner for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
          MOTION (14M61) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 5, 2014.
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2015)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
              Motion (14M61) of petitioner for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                Application (14A216) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until November 3, 2014.
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                  Application (14A216) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 3, 2014 to November 2, 2014, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 468 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?