Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Beer Closet Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03735

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2018 at 8:27 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Rule 72, the Court has reviewed the R&R for clear error and, finding none, concurs with the R&R in its entirety. See Covey v. Simonton, 481 F.Supp. 2d 224, 226 ( E.D.N.Y. 2007). Joe Hand's motion for default judgment is granted, and it is hereby ordered that judgment be entered against the defendants in the amount of $6,359.75. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment pursuant t o this Order and close the case. Joe Hand is directed to mail a copy of this Order and the accompanying judgment to the defendants and file a declaration of service on the docket within one week of the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/24/2018. (Taronji, Robert)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Order(Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 15 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?