Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Khan
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03744

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 1, 2019 at 11:41 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Order(Other)Court Filing
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached, it is ordered that Plaintiff be awarded $1,848 in attorneys' fees and no additional costs. The case remains closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/20/2018. (Cuevas Ingram, Joanna)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Judgment Default
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
      ORDER MODIFYING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Court adopts the 10 Report & Recommendation of the Honorable Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., except that Plaintiff will be permitted to submit a motio n for attorney's fees and a supporting affidavit within fourteen (14) days after the entry of judgment. 47 U.S.C. ยง 605(e)(3)(B)(iii); Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2). The Court awards Plaintiff $1,313.00 in statutory damages and $525.00 in costs, for a total of $1,838.00. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to enter judgment. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 07/02/2018. (Cuevas Ingram, Joanna)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 8 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?