McCalla v. Yale University
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-01044

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 16, 2019 at 1:47 PM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leon McCalla, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Axelrod & Associates, LLC-CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C. McMinn +1 203 348 2000 +1 203 324 9913 mmcminn@axelrodlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Axelrod & Associates, LLC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene N. Axelrod +1 203 389 6526 +1 203 389 2656 mail@axelrodlegal.com
v.
Yale University Yale University, Defendant
Unknown Role, Mark Centers Trust
Unknown Role, JBG SMITH Properties
Unknown Role, Douglas Emmett Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott L Baena, Esq +1 305 350 2403 +1 305 374 7593 sbaena@bilzin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Broad and Cassel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly Freedman, PHV +1 305 373 9488 +1 305 373 9443 kfreedman@broadandcassel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Warren Herrington +1 860 392 5048 +1 860 392 5058 jherrington@carltonfields.com
Space Jillian R. Orticelli +1 860 392 5055 +1 860 392 5058 jorticelli@carltonfields.com
Space James M. Sconzo +1 860 392 5000 +1 860 392 5058 jsconzo@cfjblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clendenen & Shea

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Clendenen, Jr. +1 203 787 1183 +1 203 787 2847 office@clenlaw.com
Space Kevin C Shea , +1 203 787 1183 +1 203 787 2847 kcs@clenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coffey Burlington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew H. Marks +1 305 858 2900 +1 305 858 5261 amarks@coffeyburlington.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy W. Donahue +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 tdonahue@ddnctlaw.com
Space Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
Space Kristianna Sciarra +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 ksciarra@ddnctlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colleen Noonan Davis +1 203 458 9168 cdavis@ddnctlaw.com
Space Brock Thomas Dubin +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 bdubin@ddnctlaw.com
Space James Daniel Flynn +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 jflynn@ddnctlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C. Williams +1 312 701 8139 +1 312 701 7711 jcwilliams@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Travis Crum +1 202 263 3365 tcrum@mayerbrown.com
Space Brian David Netter +1 202 263 3000 bnetter@mayerbrown.com
Space Nancy G. Ross +1 312 701 8788 +1 312 706 8273 nross@mayerbrown.com
Space Matthew A Waring +1 202 263 3273 mwaring@mayerbrown.com
Space Michelle N. Webster +1 202 263 3714 mwebster@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tiffany R. Hubbard +1 860 275 6732 +1 860 560 5909 thubbard@mccarter.com
Space Pamela J. Moore +1 860 275 6714 +1 860 724 3397 pmoore@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Carim Gray +1 212 326 2078 dgray@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Atwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brooks R. Magratten +1 401 588 5113 +5885 588 588 5166 bmagratten@pierceatwood.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert Riddle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Riddle

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Ertman +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 jertman@ropesgray.com
Space William L. Patton +1 617 951 7572 +1 617 951 7050 wpatton@ropesgray.com
Space Dalila Argaez Wendlandt +1 617 951 7884 +1 617 951 7050 dalila.wendlandt@ropesgray.com
Space Levina Wong

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey R. Babbin +1 203 498 4366 +1 203 782 2889 jbabbin@wiggin.com
Space John Matthew Doroghazi +1 203 498 4421 jdoroghazi@wiggin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yale University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yale University

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Zinn & Bate Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen J Pazzani +1 213 362 1860 +1 213 362 1861 kpazzani@yzblaw.com
Space Julie Arias Young +1 213 362 1860 +1 213 362 1861 jyoung@yzblaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Docket Annotation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None File Excess Pages
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Response
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Objection
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting 57 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/17/18 & 10/22/18 WITH CONSENT Discovery; Dispositive Motions. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/1/2018. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/17/18 & 10/22/18 WITH CONSENT Discovery; Dispositive Motions by Leon McCalla. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Notices)(Axelrod, Eugene)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: On 8/17/2018, defendant submitted 2 documents (as to which it claimed A/C privilege) under seal for court review. Upon review, the court concludes the 2 documents are privileged. No production of them to plaintiff is required. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/10/2018.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Status report
                                                Joint STATUS REPORT by Leon McCalla. (Axelrod, Eugene)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2018; taking under advisement 44 Motion to Compel; granting as stated on the record 45 Motion for Extension of Time ; terminating as addressed on the record 47 Motion for Protective Order; taking under advisement 49 Motion for Protective Order; granting as stated on the record 31 Motion to Preclude; Parties to meet and confer to begin identifying dates of depositions; Depositions to be scheduled by 10/13; defense counsel to submit the 2 emails under seal; dft to submit personnel files of Balis and Wilson as discussed on the record; Pltff to file submission supplementing his Motion to Compel as stated on the record; dfts given 30 additional days to produce additional documents. Total Time: 1 hours and 35 minutes(Court Reporter Terri FIdanza.) (Lewis, D) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Sealed document
                                                      Sealed Document: Notice of Documents Filed Under Seal by Yale University . (Shea, Kevin)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 response
                                                        RESPONSE re 51 Objection to Motion to Compel filed by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Objection
                                                          OBJECTION re 44 MOTION to Compel filed by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Shea, Kevin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 memorandum in support of motion
                                                            Supplemental Memorandum in Support re 44 MOTION to Compel filed by Leon McCalla. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Axelrod, Eugene)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: 7/26/2018 protective order
                                                              MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena - Beckford by Yale University.Responses due by 8/16/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shea, Kevin)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Clendenen, Jr on behalf of Yale University (Clendenen, William)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 protective order
                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena by Yale University.Responses due by 8/15/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Clendenen, William)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing set as to 44 MOTION to Compel for 8/14/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 extension of time
                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until Sept. 30, 2018 & Oct. 30, 2018 Complete Discovery & Dispositive Motions by Leon McCalla. (Axelrod, Eugene)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Compel
                                                                        MOTION to Compel by Leon McCalla.Responses due by 8/10/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Axelrod, Eugene)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying 41 Motion to Strike and for Default Entry 55(a). The motion is decided without prejudice to seeking an extension if plaintiff file a Motion to Compel and the court grants it. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/9/2018. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Objection
                                                                            OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Motions to Strike and for Entry of Default/Default Judgment filed by Yale University. (Shea, Kevin)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Default Entry 55(a)
                                                                              First MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) / Second Request for Extension of Time as to Yale University by Leon McCalla. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Unreported Cases))(Axelrod, Eugene)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Yale University.(Shea, Kevin)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 extension of time
                                                                                  *Entered in Error* MOTION for Extension of Time until and including July 23, 2018 within which to respond to the plaintiff's pro se Complaint by Yale University. (Shea, Kevin) Modified on 6/22/2018, entered in error per attorney (Fanelle, N.).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene N. Axelrod on behalf of Leon McCalla (Axelrod, Eugene)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Status report
                                                                                      Joint STATUS REPORT by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: Counsel and Pro Se Litigants are reminded that Joint Status Reports are due every 90 days unless a Motion for Summary Judgment has been filed or the case is set for trial. A Joint Status Report was last filed in this case on 12/26/2017. Counsel must file a Joint Status Report within 14 days of this Notice. Failure to file by this deadline may result in sanctions against counsel for failure to comply with the courts Order. ( Status Report due by 5/31/2018) SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/17/2018.(Lewis, D) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 34 Motion for MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/16/2018. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 extension of time
                                                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2018 & Aug. 31, 2018 CONSENT Discovery & Dispositive Motions by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until and including June 14, 2018 to serve responses and/or objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/15/2018. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 extension of time
                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until and including June 14, 2018 to serve responses and/or objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery by Yale University. (Shea, Kevin)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony by Yale University.Responses due by 4/18/2018 (Shea, Kevin)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 29 Third MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2018 Respond to First Set of I&P. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/9/2018. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Third MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2018 Respond to First Set of I&P by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 27 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until Jan. 4, 2018 respond to discovery. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/3/2018. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: 1/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time until Jan. 4, 2018 respond to discovery by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: 12/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by Yale University. (Shea, Kevin)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part 24 Motion for Extension of Time. Granted in part to 1/2/2018. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2017. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time until Jan. 15, 2018 respond to interrogatories and requests for production by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    RULING granting 12 Motion to Dismiss and Count Seven is dismissed. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/25/2017. (Lewis, D)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven of the Complaint filed by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(Shea, Kevin)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/5/17. (Pesta, J.) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven of the Complaint by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven of the Complaint filed by Leon McCalla. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Amended Pleadings due by 10/6/2017 Discovery due by 5/31/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2018 Status Report due by 12/26/2017 Trial Brief due by 6/30/2018 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/25/2017.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven of the Complaint. Responses due by 9/29/2017 (Lewis, D) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/19/2017. (Lewis, D) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time until Sept. 29, 2017 with consent respond to motion to dismiss 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven of the Complaint by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven of the Complaint filed by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Count Seven of the Complaint by Yale University.Responses due by 9/15/2017 (Shea, Kevin) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Shea on behalf of Yale University (Shea, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Yale University waiver sent on 6/30/2017, answer due 8/29/2017 filed by Leon McCalla. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE LITIGANTS: PLEASE READ AND COMPLY WITH ATTACHED INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS WHICH ARE IN EFFECT FOR THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/27/2017.(Lewis, D)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yale University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael C. McMinn* *Axelrod & Associates, LLC-CT* *8 Lunar Drive* *Woodbrige, CT 06525*. (Anastasio, F.)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Leon McCalla, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 6 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, 4 Standing Protective Order, 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/27/2017.(Anastasio, F.)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment)(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/23/2017.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/23/2017.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/23/2017.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/23/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2017 Discovery due by 12/23/2017 Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2018 Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2017.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Yale University ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4446967.), filed by Leon McCalla. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 10/17/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2018 (Lewis, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2018 (Lewis, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 8/14/2018. Hearing on pending motions set for 8/14/2018 has been changed to 11:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. (DeRubeis, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 7/31/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2018 (Lewis, D)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/15/2017 (DeRubeis, B.)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Yale University. (McMinn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Caffrey, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?