LEA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:16-cv-00043
District Judge Elaine D. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2019 at 6:36 PM ST (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANDREA LEA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Peter Bruskin +1 202 307 5958 +1 202 514 8264 eric.bruskin@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491
Nature of Suit 134 - Contract - Other
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None Unreported Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None CAFC Mandate Reversing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None CAFC Decision
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/20/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment; 15 CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 14 Motion for Summary Judgment : Oral Argument set for 6/22/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 06/12/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA , filed by ANDREA LEA. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply due by 3/30/2017. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/13/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/30/2017 to File Reply and for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit, filed by ANDREA LEA.Response due by 3/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE and reply to 15 CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by USA.Reply due by 3/16/2017. (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Reply and Response due by 2/27/2017. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/27/2017 to Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment , Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by 10 pages , filed by USA.Response due by 2/24/2017.(Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA, filed by ANDREA LEA.Response due by 2/13/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Combined Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by USA.Response due by 1/9/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 1, # 2 Appendix Part 2)(Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER Defendant Shall Produce Copies of Documents by 10/14/16; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Motion to Dismiss Due 12/9/16; Plaintiff's Response and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Due 1/13/17; ORDER finding as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6) Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/07/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/7/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/4/2016 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/27/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Staying Submission and Briefing of Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Dispositive Motions Due 9/16/2016; Defendant's Response and Cross-Motions Due 10/10/2016; Plaintiff's Reply and Response Due 10/24/2016; Defendant's Reply Due 11/7/2016. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is STAYED. Plaintiff's Dispositive Motions due 7/19/16; Defendant's Response and Cross-Motions due 8/5/16; Plaintiff's Response and Reply due 8/19/16; Defendant's Reply due 8/31/16. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bl) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/11/2016 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/05/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) , filed by USA.Response due by 2/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D)(Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Peter Bruskin for USA . (Bruskin, Eric) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (dw1) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 9998-3142794) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by ANDREA LEA. Answer due by 3/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Public Debt Bulletin No. 111, # 3 Letter to Ronald Geary, # 4 Treasury Direct FAQ, # 5 Judgment of Escheatment, # 6 Letter to Commissioner Morrow) (dw1) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?