District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  1. Case No. 17-1904
    Filed 4/13/2017
  2. Case No. 17-2130
    Filed 6/6/2017
  3. Case No. 17-2235
    Filed 6/27/2017
  4. Case No. 17-2253
    Filed 6/30/2017
United States Supreme Court

Waymo LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 17-2130

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2017 at 11:32 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Otto Trucking Llc, Defendant
No Logo Levandowski, Anthony, Intervenor
Officially listed as "Anthony Levandowski"
No Logo Ottomotto LLC, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shira Rebecca Anne Liu +1 310 752 2400 +1 310 752 2490 sliu@bsfllp.com
Space Karen L. Dunn +1 202 895 5235 +1 202 237 6131 kdunn@bsfllp.com
Space Hamish P.M. Hume +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 hhume@bsfllp.com
Space David L Zifkin +1 310 395 5800 +1 510 874 1460 dzifkin@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Allen Jacobs +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mjacobs@mofo.com
Uber Technologies, Inc. Uber Technologies, Inc., Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shira Rebecca Anne Liu +1 310 752 2400 +1 310 752 2490 sliu@bsfllp.com
Space Karen L. Dunn +1 202 895 5235 +1 202 237 6131 kdunn@bsfllp.com
Space Hamish P.M. Hume +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 hhume@bsfllp.com
Space David L Zifkin +1 310 395 5800 +1 510 874 1460 dzifkin@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Allen Jacobs +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mjacobs@mofo.com
Waymo LLC Waymo LLC, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John William Mccauley

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Cooper +1 212 849 7000 davidcooper@quinnemanuel.com
Space David Andrew Perlson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 davidperlson@quinnemanuel.com
Space Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Case Type Civil Private
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=3:17-cv-00939-WHA
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=3:17-cv-00939-WHA
  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Official caption revised to correct party designation. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [455977]
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by
    Hamish Hume for Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC and Charles Kramer Verhoeven for Waymo LLC.
    Panel: Judge: Newman , Judge: Wallach , Judge: Stoll. [453335]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion to correct or supplement record on appeal [49] filed by Appellants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC in 17-2130. Service: 08/10/2017 by email. [453183]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301044292 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion to correct or supplement record on appeal [49] filed by Appellants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC in 17-2130. Service: 08/10/2017 by email. [453183]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Sealed or confidential document received [Defendants-Appellants Uber Technologies Inc. and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal] (corresponding to Doc No. [49]) for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 08/09/2017 by email. [452824]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. to supplement the preliminary record on appeal. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 08/09/2017 by email. [452822]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301043456 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. to supplement the preliminary record on appeal. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 08/09/2017 by email. [452822]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion to correct or supplement record on appeal [39] filed by Appellants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC in 17-2130. Service: 08/09/2017 by email. [452807]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301043413 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion to correct or supplement record on appeal [39] filed by Appellants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC in 17-2130. Service: 08/09/2017 by email. [452807]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Clerk's Letter to appellee Waymo LLC (requesting response to appellants' motion to supplement the record). See related entry: [39]. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. Response due on or before 08/09/2017. [451616]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301040864 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Clerk's Letter to appellee Waymo LLC (requesting response to appellants' motion to supplement the record). See related entry: [39]. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. Response due on or before 08/09/2017. [451616]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        6 paper copies of the conf. appendix [44] received from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [450979]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          APPENDIX FILED for Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [43]. Number of Pages: 360. Service: 07/28/2017 by email. [450270]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301037761 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPENDIX FILED for Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [43]. Number of Pages: 360. Service: 07/28/2017 by email. [450270]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX FILED for Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [42]. Number of Pages: 627. Service: 07/28/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 08/07/2017. [450265]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                TENDERED from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 07/28/2017 by email. [450204]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301037605 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  TENDERED from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 07/28/2017 by email. [450204]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    TENDERED from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Title: CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX Service: 07/28/2017 by email. [450202]
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/28/2017 by email. [450200]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301037593 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/28/2017 by email. [450200]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Sealed or confidential document received [CONFIDENTIAL DEFENDANTS-APPELLANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLCS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL] (corresponding to Doc No. [39]) for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 07/27/2017 by email, US mail. [449848]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CORRECTED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. to supplement the record on appeal. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 07/27/2017 by email. [449843]--[Edited 07/28/2017 by clerk - Reason: to correct relief selected]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301036817 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CORRECTED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. to supplement the record on appeal. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 07/27/2017 by email. [449843]--[Edited 07/28/2017 by clerk - Reason: to correct relief selected]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Entry of appearance for Shira Liu as of counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2017 by email. [449524]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301036051 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Entry of appearance for Shira Liu as of counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 07/26/2017 by email. [449524]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    6 paper copies of the Confidential Reply Brief [35] received from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [449470]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [34]. Number of Pages: 30. Service: 07/21/2017 by email. Appendix is due 07/28/2017. [448573]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301033889 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [34]. Number of Pages: 30. Service: 07/21/2017 by email. Appendix is due 07/28/2017. [448573]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CONFIDENTIAL REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [33]. Number of Pages: 30. Service: 07/21/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/31/2017. [448571]
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            TENDERED from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 07/21/2017 by email. [448511]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301033770 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              TENDERED from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 07/21/2017 by email. [448511]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                TENDERED from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Title: CONFIDENTIAL REPLY BRIEF Service: 07/21/2017 by email. [448510]
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Entry of appearance for David L. Zifkin as of counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447374]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301031241 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Entry of appearance for David L. Zifkin as of counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447374]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      6 paper copies of the Opening Response Brief [29] received from Appellee Waymo LLC. [447268]
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Response to oral argument order from the Appellee Waymo LLC. designating Charles K. Verhoeven as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 15 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 0 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [447124]
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Response to oral argument order from the Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. designating Hamish P.M. Hume as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 10 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 5 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [446978]
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            BRIEF FILED for Appellee Waymo LLC [27]. Number of Pages: 48. Service: 07/14/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/24/2017. [447030]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301030452 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              BRIEF FILED for Appellee Waymo LLC [27]. Number of Pages: 48. Service: 07/14/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/24/2017. [447030]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                TENDERED from Appellee Waymo LLC. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 07/14/2017 by email. [446754]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301029995 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  TENDERED from Appellee Waymo LLC. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 07/14/2017 by email. [446754]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Entry of appearance for David M. Cooper as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/14/2017 by email. [446689]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301029808 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Entry of appearance for David M. Cooper as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/14/2017 by email. [446689]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE OF CALENDARING. Panel: 1708J+. Case scheduled Aug 11, 2017 10:00 a.m. at the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Howard T. Markey National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W. Washington, DC 20439), Courtroom 203. Response to oral argument order due: 07/17/2017. Arguing counsel is required to check-in at the Clerk's Office, 4th Floor, Room 401, between 8:30 a.m. and 9:30 a.m. on the day of argument. Please review the Oral Argument Order. [443023]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ORDER filed. The parties' joint motion for expedited briefing and oral argument [10] is granted to the extent that the proposed briefing schedule is accepted. Oral argument shall be set by separate order. (Per Curiam). Service: 06/29/2017 by clerk. [443003]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301021837 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ORDER filed. The parties' joint motion for expedited briefing and oral argument [10] is granted to the extent that the proposed briefing schedule is accepted. Oral argument shall be set by separate order. (Per Curiam). Service: 06/29/2017 by clerk. [443003]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              6 paper copies of the Opening Brief [21] received from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [442247]
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301017729 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                REPLY of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. to response filed by Appellee in 17-2130 , Doc. No [15]. Service: 06/21/2017 by email. [441240]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301017048 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Docketing Statement for the Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/20/2017 by email. [440913]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301017045 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/20/2017 by email. [440912]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301017035 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/20/2017 by email. [440909]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301017028 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Docketing Statement for the Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/20/2017 by email. [440907]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: The contact information included on the entry of appearance for John W. McCauley [14] does not match the information contained in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the entry of appearance and in the user account matches. [440634]
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301016331 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [6] filed by Appellants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC in 17-2130. Service: 06/19/2017 by email. [440589]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301016154 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for John W. McCauley as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/19/2017 by email. [440527]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301017329 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [13]. Number of Pages: 62. Service: 06/16/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/28/2017. [441065]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301015207 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 06/16/2017 by email. [440138]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Entry of appearance for Michael A. Jacobs as of counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/16/2017 by email. [440097]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301015101 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Michael A. Jacobs as of counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/16/2017 by email. [440097]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Attachment A to Emergency Joint Motion to Expedite Proceedings [Docket Number 10] for Appellants Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438396]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301011558 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Attachment A to Emergency Joint Motion to Expedite Proceedings [Docket Number 10] for Appellants Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438396]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Appellee Waymo LLC to expedite briefing schedule. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438374]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301011501 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. and Appellee Waymo LLC to expedite briefing schedule. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438374]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                REPLY of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. to response filed by Appellee in 17-2130 , Doc. No [15]. Service: 06/21/2017 by email. [441240]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ORDER filed. Any opposition to the motion for a stay [6] is due no later than June 19, 2017. Any reply in support of the motion is due no later than June 21, 2017. (Per Curiam). Service: 06/12/2017 by clerk. [438344]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301011439 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    ORDER filed. Any opposition to the motion for a stay [6] is due no later than June 19, 2017. Any reply in support of the motion is due no later than June 21, 2017. (Per Curiam). Service: 06/12/2017 by clerk. [438344]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      BRIEF FILED for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. [13]. Number of Pages: 62. Service: 06/16/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 06/28/2017. [441065]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Charles K. Verhoeven as principal counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438294]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301011346 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Charles K. Verhoeven as principal counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438294]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Docketing Statement for the Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/20/2017 by email. [440913]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for David A. Perlson as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438246]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301011227 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for David A. Perlson as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/12/2017 by email. [438246]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/20/2017 by email. [440912]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/09/2017 by email. [438141]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301010990 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/09/2017 by email. [438141]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/20/2017 by email. [440909]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER filed. Any opposition to the motion [4] is due no later than June 12, 2017. Any reply in support of the motion [4] is due no later than June 14, 2017. The appellants' opening brief is due June 16, 2017. Service: 06/07/2017 by clerk. [436976]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301008661 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER filed. Any opposition to the motion [4] is due no later than June 12, 2017. Any reply in support of the motion [4] is due no later than June 14, 2017. The appellants' opening brief is due June 16, 2017. Service: 06/07/2017 by clerk. [436976]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Docketing Statement for the Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/20/2017 by email. [440907]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. to expedite briefing schedule. Any response is due within 10 days of service, to expedite case. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/06/2017 by email. [436907]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301008503 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION of Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. to expedite briefing schedule. Any response is due within 10 days of service, to expedite case. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/06/2017 by email. [436907]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [6] filed by Appellants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC in 17-2130. Service: 06/19/2017 by email. [440589]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Hamish P.M. Hume as principal counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/06/2017 by email. [436906]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301008500 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for Hamish P.M. Hume as principal counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/06/2017 by email. [436906]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for John W. McCauley as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 06/19/2017 by email. [440527]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Karen L. Dunn as of counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/06/2017 by email. [436904]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301008494 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Karen L. Dunn as of counsel for Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Service: 06/06/2017 by email. [436904]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                TENDERED from Appellants Ottomotto LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 06/16/2017 by email. [440138]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Appeal docketed. Received: 06/01/2017. [436540]Entry of Appearance due 06/20/2017. Certificate of Interest due 06/20/2017. Docketing Statement due 06/20/2017. Appellants' brief due 08/07/2017.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301007688 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Appeal docketed. Received: 06/01/2017. [436540]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of Appearance due 06/20/2017. Certificate of Interest due 06/20/2017. Docketing Statement due 06/20/2017. Appellants' brief due 08/07/2017.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?