Caliste v. Cantrell
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-06197-EEF-MBN
District Judge Eldon E. Fallon, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 18, 2020 at 5:33 PM DT (11.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adrian Caliste, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Rights Corps

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alec George Karakatsanis +1 202 824 2451 alec@civlrightscorps.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Andrew Foley +1 504 684 2364 eric.foley@macarthurjustice.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann +1 504 620 2259 katie.schwartzmann@macarthurjustice.org
No Logo Brian Gisclair, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Civil Rights Corps

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alec George Karakatsanis +1 202 824 2451 alec@civlrightscorps.org
Space Alec George Karakatsanis +1 202 824 2451 alec@civlrightscorps.org

Toggle Switch Represented by MACARTHUR JUSTICE CENTER - University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann +1 504 620 2259 katie.schwartzmann@macarthurjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Andrew Foley +1 504 684 2364 eric.foley@macarthurjustice.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann +1 504 620 2259 katie.schwartzmann@macarthurjustice.org
v.
No Logo Harry E. Cantrell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burglass & Tankersley, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste Brustowicz +1 949 494 7453 cbrustowicz@burglass.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Doubleday +1 504 836 0428 edoubleday@burglass.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis J. Phayer +1 504 836 2220 dphayer@burglass.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Kent Tankersley +1 504 836 2220 ctankersley@burglass.com
Office New Orleans
Filed 6/27/2017
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Orleans
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 17-30831[5th Circuit Court of Appeals]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLASS
  Entries (201) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Show Cause
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Memorandum
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Withdraw Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Manual Attachment Received
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Show Cause
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/6/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Enforce Judgment
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None USCA Judgment
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 158 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Approve Consent Judgment
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Enroll as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Permanent Injunction
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                DECLARATORY JUDGMENT: ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that there be judgment in favor of plaintiffs, Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair, both individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, and against defendant, Harry E. Cantrell, Magistrate Judge of Orleans Parish Criminal District Court as stated fully herein. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter be Dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear his or its own costs. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/13/2018.(clc)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 131 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER & REASONS that the Plaintiffs' [116] Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and the Court provides declaratory relief as set forth in order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant's [121] Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/6/18. (dno)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair re [121] MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(mmv)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING [126] Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/11/2018. (mmv)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair re [116] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (mmv)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING [125] Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment and to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/11/2018. (mmv)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2018 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                            EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [121] by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, # (3) Proposed Pleading Plaintiffs' Statement of Contested Facts)(Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018, Terminated: 7/11/2018 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment [116] and to Exceed Page Limits by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading)(Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [122] Motion to Substitute Exhibit to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/29/2018. (mmv)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                  Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [121] MOTION for Summary Judgment . **Image filed sideways. Clerk has corrected image of attachment 4, pages 3 and 14. Please adjust scanner for future filings. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct [116] MOTION for Summary Judgment by substituting attached document as Ex. 5 [116-8] by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 5)(Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018, Terminated: 8/6/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by Harry E. Cantrell. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/11/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit A- Motion for Summary Judgment, # (3) Exhibit B - Motion for Summary Judgment, # (4) Exhibit C - Motion for Summary Judgment, # (5) Exhibit D - Motion for Summary Judgment, # (6) Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # (7) Exhibit A - Statement of Uncontested Material Facts, # (8) Notice of Submission)(Phayer, Dennis) (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/29/2018) (jeg).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Harry E. Cantrell re [116] MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(Phayer, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018, Terminated: 6/28/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                          DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - MOTION for Summary Judgment by Harry E. Cantrell. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/11/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit A - Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # (3) Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # (4) Exhibit A - Statement of Uncontested Material Facts, # (5) Notice of Submission)(Phayer, Dennis) Modified on 6/28/2018 (dno).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            **DEFICIENT** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Harry E. Cantrell re [116] MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Phayer, Dennis) Modified on 6/27/2018 (jeg).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Manual Attachment Received
                                                                                                                                                              Manual Attachment Received re [116] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brian Gisclair, Adrian Caliste. (dno)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/11/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # (3) Notice of Submission, # (4) Exhibit 1, # (5) Exhibit 2, # (6) Exhibit 3, # (7) Exhibit 4, # (8) Exhibit 5, # (9) Exhibit 6, # (10) Exhibit 7, # (11) Exhibit 8, # (12) Exhibit 9, # (13) Notice of Manual Attachment, # (14) Exhibit 12)(clc) (Additional attachment(s) added per Order, rec. doc. 124 on 6/29/2018: # (15) Correct Exhibit 5) (mmv).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [113] Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/14/2018. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                    Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [112] Notice (Other). **Document 112 was incorrectly filed as a separate document instead of an attachment todocument 111. Filing attorney has re-filed at Rec doc 113. No further action is needed.** (jeg)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/14/2018 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                      EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading Motion for Summary Judgment, # (3) Memorandum in Support, # (4) Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # (5) Notice of Submission, # (6) Exhibit 1-Tr. of Pls.' First App. Hr'g, # (7) Exhibit 2-Caliste Decl., # (8) Exhibit 3-Gisclair Decl., # (9) Exhibit 4-Cantrell Deposition, # (10) Exhibit 5-First App. Tr. 12/27/16, # (11) Exhibit 6. First App. Tr. 6/12/17, # (12) Exhibit 7-First App. Tr. 2/6/17, # (13) Exhibit 8-Resp. to RFA, # (14) Exhibit 9-Kazik Resp. to SDT, # (15) Notice of Manual Attachment, # (16) Exhibit 12-N.O. City Bus. art.)(Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                        **ERROR- DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN ATTACHED TO REC DOC 111** NOTICE by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair re Notice of Deficient Filing,, Notice of Submission for Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion. (Foley, Eric) Modified on 6/14/2018 (jeg).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018, Terminated: 6/13/2018 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                          **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memorandum in support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading Motion for Summary Judgment, # (3) Memorandum in Support, # (4) Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # (5) Exhibit 1 Tr. of Pls' First App. Hr'g, # (6) Exhibit 2 Decl. of Adrian Caliste, # (7) Exhibit 3 Decl. of Brian Gisclair, # (8) Exhibit 4 Dep. of Magistrate Cantrell, # (9) Exhibit 5 Tr. of First App. Hr'g, # (10) Exhibit 6 Tr. of First App. Hr'g, # (11) Exhibit 7 Tr. of First App. Hr'g, # (12) Exhibit 8 Response to Req. for Admiss., # (13) Exhibit 9 Response to SDT to Judicial Admin. Kazik, # (14) Notice of Manual Attachment Exs. 10 and 11, # (15) Exhibit 12 NO City Bus. Art.)(Foley, Eric) Modified on 6/13/2018 (jeg).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 5/29/2018. (dno)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING [108] Motion to Withdraw Counsel. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/15/2018. (mmv)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Celeste Brustowicz as Attorney by Harry E. Cantrell. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Phayer, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 5/1/2018. Negotiations were again productive but unfortunately no resolution of Plaintiffs' claims could be achieved at this time. Further negotiations will proceed telephonically. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re [104] MOTION for Settlement Conference filed by Harry E. Cantrell. ORDERED that the settlement conference will be reconvened on May 1, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael B. North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 4/2/2018.(clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 105 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 Correction of Docket Entry by ClerkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [104] MOTION for Settlement Conference; Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018, Terminated: 4/2/2018 motion for settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Settlement Conference by Harry E. Cantrell. Motion referred to Michael North. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order)(Phayer, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: 3/27/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 5/29/2018 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Bench Trial set for 8/29/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 7/16/2018. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/27/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Pretrial Notice Form)(jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Status Conference held on 3/26/2018. IT IS ORDERED that the parties will participate in a telephone status conference with the Court on Tuesday, 5/29/2018 at 3:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the call. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a bench trial is hereby set in the above captioned matter for Wednesday, 8/29/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and a pretrial conference is hereby set for Wednesday, 8/15/2018 at 1:30 p.m. (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [100] MOTION Set Status Conference. Status Conference set for 3/26/2018 03:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/21/2018.(cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018, Terminated: 3/21/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Set Status Conference by Harry E. Cantrell. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order)(Phayer, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 order on motion to certify classCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER & REASONS that the Plaintiffs' [5] Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/16/18. (dno)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair re [5] MOTION to Certify Class . (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: 3/16/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [96] Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/16/2018. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018, Terminated: 3/16/2018 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Certify a Class Action by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading Reply Memo, # (2) Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Harry E. Cantrell re [5] MOTION to Certify Class . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Phayer, Dennis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [93] MOTION to set briefing schedule and the Plaintiffs' [5] MOTION to Certify Class is set for submission on March 14, 2018. Defendant shall submit a memorandum in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion no later than eight days prior to the submission date. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/20/2018. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: 2/19/2018, Terminated: 2/21/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric) Modified text on 2/20/2018 (mmv).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/16/2018. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDERED that the parties will participate in a telephone status conference on February 16, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/6/2018. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **DEFICIENT**NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re [87] Supplemental Memorandum, [5] MOTION to Certify Class noticing submission of Motion to Certify Class on 2/28/18 at 9 a.m. (Foley, Eric) Modified on 2/6/2018 (cms).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 1/24/2018. Negotiations were productive but unfortunately no resolution of Plaintiffs claims could be achieved at this time. Further negotiations will proceed telephonically. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RECONVENING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 1/24/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 1/9/2018.(clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Memorandum filed by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair, in Support of [5] MOTION to Certify Class . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [84] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/8/2018. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Status Conference held on 1/5/2018. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: 1/4/2018, Terminated: 1/8/2018 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Class Certification by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum in Support of Class Certification, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H, # (11) Exhibit I, # (12) Exhibit J)(Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties will participate in a telephone status conference on January 5, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/14/2017.(jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERED that Plaintiffs' [80] Motion for Leave to File is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/12/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER & REASONS that the [65] Motion filed by Defendant Harry E. Cantrell is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/11/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017, Terminated: 12/12/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Surresponse Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, rec. doc. 65 by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading, # (2) Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric) Modified text on 12/12/2017 (jls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Harry E. Cantrell re [65] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [75] Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/6/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 USCA order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to [52] Notice of Appeal filed by David Andrew Christenson; ORDERED that the appeal is dismissed for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely file a transcript order form and make financial arrangements with the court reporter. (Attachments: # (1) Letter) (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017 USCA order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER of USCA as to [15] Notice of Appeal filed by David Andrew Christenson; ORDERED that the appeal is moot and must be dismissed as stated herein by USCA Clerk, 5th Circuit Court. (Attachments: # (1) Letter) (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017, Terminated: 12/6/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted by Harry E. Cantrell. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Proposed Pleading)(Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re [65] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 11/27/2017. Negotiations were productive but unfortunately no resolution of Plaintiffs' claims could be achieved at this time. Further negotiations will proceed telephonically. (clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 11/27/2017 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 11/21/2017.(clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER,granting [69] MOTION Set Settlement Conference . Settlement Conference set for 11/27/2017 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 11/17/2017.(clc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of the Status of Discovery on Class Certification. (Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017, Terminated: 11/20/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Set Settlement Conference by Harry E. Cantrell. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/13/2017. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendant's [57] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is hereby GRANTED, and the deadline for completion of class certification discovery is extended thirty days, from November 14, 217 to December 14, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's [58] MOTION to Expedite is hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 order on motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [63] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/7/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [1] Complaint, with Jury Demand by Harry E. Cantrell.(Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017, Terminated: 12/12/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Harry E. Cantrell. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/6/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Notice of Submission)(Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/7/2017. IT IS ORDERED that the parties will participate in a telephone status conference on Monday, November 13, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the call. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by David Andrew Christenson. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 Notice of Deficient Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re [61] Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 11/24/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Application) (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **DEFICIENT**MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re [57] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [57] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 12/6/2017. Clerk took corrective action. (sa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017, Terminated: 11/13/2017 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite by Harry E. Cantrell. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017, Terminated: 11/13/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Harry E. Cantrell. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/6/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Notice of Submission)(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified submission on 11/2/2017 (sa).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [55] Request for Subpoenas. **Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP. Also, please note that a deposition subpoena can be issued by the attorney of record.** (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Request for Subpoenas
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Request for Subpoenas. 1 subpoenas issued by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair.(Foley, Eric) Modified text on 11/1/2017 (jls). (Main Document 55 replaced on 11/1/2017) (jls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDERED that the parties will participate in a telephone status conference on November 6, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/19/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 17-30831 appealed to 5th Circuit Court of Appeals for [15] Notice of Appeal. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017, Terminated: 12/5/2017 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by David Andrew Christenson. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDERED that David Andrew Christenson's [50] Motion for Stay for Notice of Appeal is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/26/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay for Notice of Appeal by David Andrew Christenson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/31/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Submission, # (2) Exhibit) (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay for Notice of Appeal by David Andrew Christenson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Submission, # 2 Exhibit) (cms) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [48] Motion for Discovery and discovery on theissue of class certification shall close on November 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/18/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017, Terminated: 9/18/2017 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order on Discovery for Class Certification by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric) Modified referral on 9/15/2017 (cms).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDERED that David Andrew Christenson's [45] Motion for Reconsideration is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/8/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Status Conference held on 9/7/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [24] Order on Motion to Join by David Andrew Christenson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/31/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits, # (2) Notice of Submission) (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER AND REASONS denying [12] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Harry E. Cantrell. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall attend a status conference in chambers set for 9/7/2017 at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/25/2017.(jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Notice of Deficient Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re [42] Motion for Reconsideration. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/15/2017. (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Memorandum filed by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair, in Opposition to [12] MOTION to Dismiss . (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [33] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/24/2017. (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Surresponse Memorandum filed by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair, in Opposition to [12] MOTION to Dismiss . (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING [30] Motion for Leave to File Surresponse in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/23/2017. (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Harry E. Cantrell re [12] MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [29] Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of FRCP 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss and all attached exhibits. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/23/2017. (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair re [5] MOTION to Certify Class . (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [27] Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify a Class Action. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/23/2017. (jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **DEFICIENT** MOTION for Reconsideration re [24] Order on Motion to Join, by David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017, Terminated: 8/24/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Law by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading Supplemental Memorandum of Law, # (2) Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric) Modified text on 8/24/2017 (ss).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Harry E. Cantrell re [12] MOTION to Dismiss . (Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2017: re [5] MOTION to Certify Class. After argument Motion continued to be reset; re [12] MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1). After argument Motion was taken under submission. Defense Exhibit 1 was offered and admitted. (Court Reporter Mary Thompson.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (mmv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017, Terminated: 8/24/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Surresponse to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading Proposed Surresponse to [29], # (2) Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: 8/21/2017, Terminated: 8/24/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of FRCP 12b(1) Motion to Dismiss by Harry E. Cantrell. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading, # (3) Exhibit 1)(Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [27] MOTION for Leave to File Replying to Defendant's Opposition [21] ***Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion.*** (ss)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017, Terminated: 8/24/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Replying to Defendant's Opposition [21] by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Foley, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2017: # (2) Proposed Order) (ss).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **DEFICIENT** REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re [5] MOTION to Certify Class Replying to Defendant's Opposition [21]. (Foley, Eric) Modified text on 8/16/2017 (ss).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: 8/15/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re [12] MOTION to Dismiss . (Foley, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDERED that David Andrew Christenson's [14] Motion to Join is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/11/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: 8/9/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [14] MOTION to Join by David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: 8/9/2017 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [20] Motion for Leave to File Response. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/8/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Harry E. Cantrell re [5] MOTION to Certify Class . (Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified text on 8/8/2017 (ss).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017, Terminated: 8/9/2017 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply by David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Pleading, # (2) Exhibit)(jls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on Plaintiffs' [5] MOTION to Certify Class, and Defendant's [12] MOTION to Dismiss, on August 23, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/4/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Notice of Deficient Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re [17] Reply to Response to Motion. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/24/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **DEFICIENT**REPLY to Response to Motion re [14] MOTION to Join by David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits) (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **DEFICIENT**REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Join by David Andrew Christenson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (cms) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Harry E. Cantrell re [14] MOTION to Join . (Brustowicz, Celeste)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by David Andrew Christenson. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by David Andrew Christenson. (cms) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Join by David Andrew Christenson Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/23/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits, # (2) Notice of Submission-Cured Deficiency)(cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Join by David Andrew Christenson Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Notice of Submission-Cured Deficiency)(cms) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [11] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alec George Karakatsanis. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/18/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017, Terminated: 8/25/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Harry E. Cantrell. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/23/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Notice of Submission)(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified text on 7/18/2017 (ss).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017, Terminated: 7/18/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-6260717) by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Alec Karakatsanis, # (3) Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric) Modified on 7/18/2017 (ss).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017, Terminated: 7/17/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFICIENT MOTION to Dismiss by Harry E. Cantrell. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/23/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Notice of Submission)Attorney Celeste Brustowicz added to party Harry E. Cantrell(pty:dft).(Brustowicz, Celeste) Modified text on 7/17/2017 (ss).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 summons returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed; Harry E. Cantrell served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Schwartzmann, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Related Case(s) by All Plaintiffs of related case(s) 15-cv-4479. (Schwartzmann, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Notice of Deficient Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re [6] Motion to Join. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/21/2017. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **DEFICIENT**MOTION to Join by David Andrew Christenson (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits)(cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017, Terminated: 3/16/2018 motion to certify class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Certify Class by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/23/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit Schwartzmann Dec, # (3) Exhibit Foley Dec, # (4) Exhibit Karakatsanis Dec, # (5) Notice of Submission)(Schwartzmann, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Harry E. Cantrell. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re [1] Complaint; Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons and civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Initial Case AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Harry E. Cantrell, Jr (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6227758) filed by Adrian Caliste, Brian Gisclair. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann added to party Adrian Caliste(pty:pla), Attorney Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann added to party Brian Gisclair(pty:pla).(Schwartzmann, Katharine) (Attachments 1 & 2 replaced on 6/27/2017) (cms).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?