Smith, et al v. USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-03332-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Donald Howard., Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L. Katz +2440 244 244 0707
No Logo Michelle Smith, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L. Katz +2440 244 244 0707
v.
No Logo Kevin Waddy, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna C Sanger +1 301 344 4433
No Logo Kevin Waddy, Cross-Claimant

Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
United States of America United States of America, Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna C Sanger +1 301 344 4433
No Logo Kevin Waddy, Cross-Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna C Sanger +1 301 344 4433
Office Baltimore
Filed 12/26/1990
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Court Trial
County Baltimore County
Terminated 8/24/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/9/1993 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, stating case as agreed, settled and satisfied. (jb) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 49 Filed: 9/28/1992, Entered: 9/30/1992, Terminated: 9/28/1992 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [49-1] motion of Defendant, Kevin Wade, for George C. Davis to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney George C. Davis for Kevin Waddy ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg September 23, 1992). (c/m 9/29/92-pjc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 49 Filed: 9/28/1992, Entered: 9/30/1992, Terminated: 9/28/1992 Motion to Withdraw
      MOTION by Kevin Waddy for George C. Davis to Withdraw as Attorney . (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 48 Filed: 8/24/1992, Entered: 8/27/1992 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER "DIRECTING" that listed physical exhibits be returned to counsel who offered them, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 08/24/92 pjc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 47 Filed: 8/24/1992, Entered: 8/25/1992 OrderCourt Filing
          AMENDED ORDER dated 08/24/92 "ENTERING" judgment in favor of plaintiff Michelle Smith against defendants U.S. and Kevin Waddy jointly and severally for damages in amount of Two Thousand, Four Hundred Thirty One Dollars ($2,431.00); "ENTERING" judgment in favor of plaintiff Donald Howard against defendants U.S. and Kevin Waddy jointly and severally for damages in amount of Two Thousand, Thirty Six Dollars ($2,036.00); "ENTERING" judgment in favor of defendant Kimberly Waddy against plaintiff Michelle Smith and Donald Howard and "ENTERING" judgment in favor of cross-claim defendant Kimberly Waddy against cross-claim plaintiff U.S.; and "DISMISSING" cross-claim Kimberly Waddy against cross-claim defendant U.S.; "ENTERING" judgment in favor of cross-claim plaintiff U.S. for contribution against cross-claim defendant Kevin Waddy; and "ENTERING" judgment in favor of cross-claim plaintiff Kevin Waddy for contribution against cross-claim defendant U.S. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m chambers) (3.51%) (Microfilmed 08/24/92) (c/s Judgment Box) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/24/1992, Entered: 8/25/1992 Terminated Case
            Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 46 Filed: 8/12/1992, Entered: 8/19/1992 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER dated 08/12/92 "ENTERING" judgment in favor of plaintiffs against defendant United States; "ENTERING" judgment in favor of plaintiffs against defendant Kevin Waddy; "ENTERING" judgment in favor of defendant Kimberly Waddy against plaintiffs; "DIRECTING" that defendants United States and Waddy are jointly and severally liable to plaintiff Michelle Smith for damages in amount of Two Thousand, Four Hundred Thirty One Dollars ($2,431.00); "DIRECTING" that defendants United States and Waddy are jointly and severally liable to plaintiff Donald Howard for damages in amount of Two Thousand, Thirty Six Dollars ($2,036.00) "ENTERING" judgment in favor of United States on cross-claim for contribution against defendant Waddy; and "ENTERING" judgment in favor of Waddy on cross-claim for contribution against defendant United States. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 08/12/92 bw) (3.51%) (Microfilmed 08/19/92) (c/s Judgment Box) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 45 Filed: 8/12/1992, Entered: 8/19/1992 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION dated 08/12/92 ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 08/12/92 bw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 44 Filed: 6/29/1992, Entered: 6/30/1992 Remark
                  SUPPLEMENTAL Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law of defendant USA. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 43 Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: 6/29/1992 Exhibit
                    Exhibit list by plaintiffs' Donald Howard., Michelle Smith (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 42 Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: 6/29/1992 Exhibit
                      Exhibit list by defendant USA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: 6/29/1992 Remark
                        Oral Motions of defendants US and Waddy for Involuntary Dismissal made at the conclusion of the plaintiffs' case-in-chief-"DENIED" (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/23/1992, Entered: 6/29/1992 Remark
                          Non-Jury Trial-Day Two (ER: Staffer) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 41 Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 6/29/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                            MARGINAL ORDER dated 06/22/92 "granting in part", "reserved ruling in part" [37-1] motion in Limine for Court to instruct all other parites and counsel and witnesses that during trial no person is to mention, refer to interogate concerning or attempt to convey or suggest to jury of Waddy's criminal and driving records ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 06/24/92 pjc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 6/29/1992 Remark
                              Motion of defendant Devin Waddy in limine (paper #37)-argued-"GRANTED" in part and "RESERVED RULING" in part for reasons stated in open Court (Marginial Order signed) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 6/29/1992 Remark
                                Non-Jury Trial-Day One held before Legg, J. (ER: Toomey) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 40 Filed: 6/12/1992, Entered: 6/16/1992 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                  PRETRIAL ORDER dated 06/12/92 ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 06/12/92 pjc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 39 Filed: 6/12/1992, Entered: 6/16/1992 Remark
                                    PROPOSED Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law of plaintiffs. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 38 Filed: 6/10/1992, Entered: 6/15/1992 Response in Opposition
                                      RESPONSE by USA in opposition to [37-1] motion of defendant Kevin Waddy in Limine for Court to instruct all other parites and counsel and witnesses that during trial no person is to mention, refer to interogate concerning or attempt to convey or suggest to jury of Waddy's criminal and driving records. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 37 Filed: 6/5/1992, Entered: 6/10/1992, Terminated: 6/22/1992 Motion in Limine
                                        MOTION by Kevin Waddy in Limine for Court to instruct all other parites and counsel and witnesses that during trial no person is to mention, refer to interogate concerning or attempt to convey or suggest to jury of Waddy's criminal and driving records (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 36 Filed: 6/5/1992, Entered: 6/10/1992 Remark
                                          PROPOSED findings of fact and conclusion of law by defendant Kevin Waddy. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/4/1992, Entered: 6/5/1992 Remark
                                            Defendant United States proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1992, Entered: 6/12/1992 Pretrial Conference - Final
                                              Pre-trial conference held before Legg, J. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 34 Filed: 4/3/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) dated March 31, 1992 "ENTERING" judgment in favor of Defendant Kimberly Waddy against Plaintiffs Michelle Smith and Donald Howard; "ENTERING" judgment in favor of Cross-Claim Defendant Kimberly Waddy against Cross-Claim Plaintiff United States of America; and "DISMISSING" the cross-claim of Kimberly Waddy against Cross-Claim Defendant United States of America for the reasons stated in open Court on March 27, 1992 as therein set forth. (c/m 4/2/92 bw) (microfilmed 4/13/92) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/31/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER (Marginal) dated March 27, 1992 denying [21-1] motion to Strike Exhibits in support of Response of Plaintiffs' to the Motion of Defendant Kevin Waddy for Summary Judgment, for the reasons stated in open Court. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 4/2/92 bw) (For Pleading #33 - See Pleading #21) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/31/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER (Marginal) dated March 27, 1992 denying [20-1] motion to Strike supplemental answers to interrogatories, for the reasons stated in open Court. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 4/2/92 bw) (For Pleading #32 - See Pleading #20) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/31/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER (Marginal) dated March 27, 1992 denying [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Claims of Michelle Smith and Donald Howard, for the reasons stated in open Court. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 4/2/92 bw) (For Pleading #31 - See Pleading #17) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Bench trial set for 6/22/92 ; Pretrial conference for 10:00 6/12/92 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 6/5/92 ; If the case is to be settled, it shall be settled on or before 6/1/92 as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m 3/27/92 pjc) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Remark
                                                          Scheduling Dates set. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Order
                                                            ORDER in open court granting [0-0] motion of Defendant to Depose Certain Witnesses ( by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Oral Motion
                                                              MOTION in open court by USA, Kimberly Waddy, Kevin Waddy to Depose Certain Witnesses (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Order
                                                                ORDER in open court denying [0-0] motion by Kevin Waddy to Strike Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories denying [0-0] motion by Kevin Waddy to Strike Exhibits ( by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Oral Motion
                                                                  MOTION in open court by Kevin Waddy to Strike Exhibits (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Oral Motion
                                                                    MOTION in open court by Kevin Waddy to Strike Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Order
                                                                      ORDER in open court denying [0-0] motion by Kevin Waddy for Summary Judgment for the reasons stated in open Court. ( by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Oral Motion
                                                                        MOTION in open court by Kevin Waddy for Summary Judgment (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/13/1992 Motion Hearing
                                                                          Motion hearing re: [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Claims of Michelle Smith and Donald Howard, [20-1] motion to Strike supplemental answers to interrogatories, [21-1] motion to Strike Exhibits in support of Response of Plaintiffs' to the Motion of Defendant Kevin Waddy for Summary Judgment held before Legg, J. (ER: Toomey) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 3/20/1992, Entered: 3/31/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER (Memo) (copy) dated 03/18/92 "RESCHEDULING" Motion hearing from 03/18/92 to 03/27/92 at 2:00 pm. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (org/m chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 2/21/1992, Entered: 3/2/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER (Memo) (copy) dated 02/20/92 "SCHEDULING" motion hearing on pending motions, as therein set forth. Motion Hearing set for 2:30 3/19/92] ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (org./m chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 11/15/1991, Entered: 11/20/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                REPLY by Kevin Waddy to response to [21-1] motion to Strike Exhibits in support of Response of Plaintiffs' to the Motion of Defendant Kevin Waddy for Summary Judgment (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 11/15/1991, Entered: 11/20/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                  REPLY by Kevin Waddy to response to [20-1] motion to Strike supplemental answers to interrogatories (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 11/1/1991, Entered: 11/9/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                    RESPONSE by Donald Howard., Michelle Smith in opposition to [20-1] motion to Strike supplemental answers to interrogatories and attachments. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 11/1/1991, Entered: 11/9/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Donald Howard., Michelle Smith to continue ruling on defendant's motion for summary judgment , and to Amend scheduling order to extend the time for discovery and affidavit. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 11/1/1991, Entered: 11/9/1991 Response to Motion
                                                                                        RESPONSE by Donald Howard., Michelle Smith to [21-1] motion to Strike Exhibits in support of Response of Plaintiffs' to the Motion of Defendant Kevin Waddy for Summary Judgment and (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/23/1991, Entered: 10/30/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Cross-Claim and all claims of the United States ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/17/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            REPLY by Kevin Waddy to response to [16-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Cross-Claim of the United States (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/17/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991, Terminated: 3/31/1992 Motion to Strike
                                                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Kevin Waddy to Strike Exhibits in support of Response of Plaintiffs' to the Motion of Defendant Kevin Waddy for Summary Judgment (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 10/17/1991, Entered: 10/22/1991, Terminated: 3/31/1992 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Kevin Waddy to Strike supplemental answers to interrogatories & Attachments (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 10/2/1991, Entered: 10/3/1991 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Donald Howard., Michelle Smith to [17-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Claims of Michelle Smith and Donald Howard, Memorandum, Exhibits A thru C, and Request for hearing. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/19/1991, Entered: 9/19/1991 Status Report
                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kevin Waddy, Kimberly Waddy, USA, Donald Howard., Michelle Smith (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/18/1991, Entered: 9/20/1991 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                      CASE reassigned to Judge Benson E. Legg (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 9/16/1991, Entered: 9/17/1991, Terminated: 3/31/1992 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Kevin Waddy, Kimberly Waddy for Summary Judgment as to the Claims of Michelle Smith and Donald Howard and attachments. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 9/16/1991, Entered: 9/17/1991, Terminated: 10/23/1991 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                          MOTION by Kimberly Waddy for Summary Judgment as to the Cross-Claim of the United States (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 5/24/1991, Entered: 5/28/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                            ANSWER by USA to [14-1] cross claim (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 5/20/1991, Entered: 5/21/1991 Crossclaim
                                                                                                              CROSSCLAIM by Kimberly Waddy, Kevin Waddy against USA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 4/26/1991, Entered: 5/1/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                ANSWER by Kimberly Waddy, Kevin Waddy to [7-1] cross claim (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/19/1991, Entered: 4/24/1991 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 8/16/91 ; Pretrial conference for 5:00 11/29/91 ; Additional claims due by 5/28/91 Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 11/22/91 ; ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis )(c/m 4/17/91 jrw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/15/1991, Entered: 4/17/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER dated 4/12/91 granting [8-1] motion to Strike [1-1] demand for jury trial as to Defendant USA only without prejudice to future consideration of an advisory jury ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis ) (c/m 4/12/91 jrw) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/1/1991, Entered: 4/10/1991 Answer
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Kimberly Waddy, Kevin Waddy (Attorney George C. Davis), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/18/1991, Entered: 3/20/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kimberly Waddy, Kevin Waddy 3/12/91 Answer due on 4/1/91 for Kevin Waddy, for Kimberly Waddy (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/7/1991, Entered: 3/13/1991, Terminated: 4/15/1991 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA to Strike [1-1] demand jury (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/7/1991, Entered: 3/13/1991 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                            CROSSCLAIM by USA against Kimberly Waddy, Kevin Waddy (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/7/1991, Entered: 3/13/1991 Answer
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA (Attorney Donna C. Sanger), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 3/7/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to USA 2/13/91 Answer due on 5/13/91 for USA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/13/1991, Entered: 3/7/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to USA 1/4/91 Answer due on 3/4/91 for USA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 2/4/1991, Entered: 2/12/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                    Local Rule 103.3 Statement of Plaintiffs (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/28/1990, Entered: 1/3/1991 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) issued for USA (60 days), Kimberly Waddy, Kevin Waddy (20 days) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/04/1991
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/26/1990, Entered: 1/3/1991 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                        DEMAND for jury trial by Michelle Smith, Don Howard (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/26/1990, Entered: 1/3/1991 Complaint
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 084901 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?