Headley v. Ramsey, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00119
District Judge James M. Moody, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 29, 2017 at 1:48 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lonnie Howard Headley, II, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BARICDF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lonnie Howard Headley, II
v.
No Logo Danny Ramsey, Defendant
No Logo David Fielder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Womack, Phelps & McNeil, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/23/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey W. Puryear +1 870 932 0900 +1 870 932 2553 jpuryear@wpmfirm.com
No Logo JOHN BROWN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Stephen Holt +1 501 868 2500 holt@rainfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Rainwater +1 501 868 2500 rainwater@rainfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell A. Wood +1 479 967 9663 +1 479 967 9664 woodlaw@suddenlinkmail.com
No Logo Michael Anderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Stephen Holt +1 501 868 2500 holt@rainfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Rainwater +1 501 868 2500 rainwater@rainfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell A. Wood +1 479 967 9663 +1 479 967 9664 woodlaw@suddenlinkmail.com
No Logo Sherry Witt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Stephen Holt +1 501 868 2500 holt@rainfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Rainwater +1 501 868 2500 rainwater@rainfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell A. Wood +1 479 967 9663 +1 479 967 9664 woodlaw@suddenlinkmail.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT by Judge James M. Moody consistent with the order that was entered on this day this case is dismissed with prejudice; further the court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith (cc: all counsel) (tjj) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge James M. Moody granting pltf's motion for voluntary dismissal [32-1]; this action is dismissed with prejudice; the evidentiary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for 8/13/02 is cancelled (cc: all counsel) (tjj) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE by defendants to motion for voluntary dismissal [32-1] (tjj) Modified on 07/24/2002 (Entered: 07/22/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION by plaintiff for voluntary dismissal (tjj) Modified on 07/24/2002 (Entered: 07/17/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER by Mag. Judge J. T. Ray directing pltf to provide the court with Mr. Guinn Franks' street address and telephone number; without a current address for Mr. Franks the court cannot issue a subpoena requiring him to appear and testify at the hearing; additionally the court requests a telephone number, if available for Mr. Jimmy Allen Eperson, Jr.; pltf is ordered to provide the requested information by 7/24/02 (cc: all counsel) (tjj) Modified on 07/24/2002 (Entered: 07/15/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            EXHIBIT LIST submitted by defendants (tjj) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              WITNESS LIST submitted by defendants (tjj) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge James M. Moody granting motion to substitute attorney J. Stephen Holt in place of Russell Allen Wood [27-1] for defts Sherry Witt, John Brown and Michael Anderson (cc: all counsel) (tjj) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION by defendant to substitute attorney J. Stephen Holt in place of Russell Allen Wood (tjj) (Entered: 06/06/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge James M. Moody adopting Partial Recommended Disposition [22-1], granting motion to dismiss separate deft David Fielder & pltf's claims against Fielder are dism w/prej for failing to state a cognizable claim for relief under 42 USC 1983; deft Fielder is dism as a party to this action [13-1] (cc: all counsel) (rjh) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE by deft David Fielder to pltf's objections to Recommended Disposition [23-1] (tjj) (Entered: 05/20/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        NOTICE (DOC) the evidentiary hearing scheduled before Judge Ray on 8/13/02 at 9:30 am in Batesville will now be held in Little Rock, Arkansas; there will be no changes to any deadlines previously established by the scheduling order [16-1] entered in this case (cc: all counsel) (tjj) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          OBJECTIONS by plaintiff to Partial Recommended Disposition [22-1] (tjj) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Partial Recommended Disposition by Mag. Judge J. T. Ray recommending deft Fielder's motion to dismiss [13-1] be granted, pltf's claims against deft Fielder be dismissed with prejudice and that deft Fielder be dismissed as a party to this action (tjj) (Entered: 05/02/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Mag. Judge J. T. Ray denying motion for appointment of counsel [19-1] (cc: all counsel) (tjj) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                WITNESS LIST submitted by plaintiff (tjj) (Entered: 03/08/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION by plaintiff for appointment of counsel (tjj) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE by plaintiff to motion to dismiss [13-1] (tjj) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE unexecuted - attempted as to defendant Sherry Witt (tjj) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC) Evidentiary Hearing set for 9:00 am on Tuesday 8/13/02 in Batesville; discovery due by 5/29/02 (cc: all counsel) (tjj) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Mag. Judge J. T. Ray directing pltf to file a response to deft Fielder's motion to dismiss [13-1] within 30 days from the entry date of this order (cc: all counsel) (tjj) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            BRIEF by deft David Fielder in support of motion to dismiss [13-1] (tjj) (Entered: 01/22/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION by deft David Fielder to dismiss (tjj) (Entered: 01/22/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge James M. Moody adopting Partial Recommended Disposition [7-1]; dismissing pltf's claims against deft Danny Ramsey with prejudice; separate deft Ramsey is dismissed as a party to this action; the court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith (cc: all counsel) (tjj) (Entered: 01/14/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant David Fielder on 1/2/02 (tjj) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ANSWER by separate defts Michael Anderson, John Brown and Sherry Witt (tjj) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant John Brown on 12/21/01 (lej) (Entered: 01/03/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Michael Anderson on 12/21/01 (lej) (Entered: 01/03/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Partial Recommended Disposition by Mag. Judge J. T. Ray recommending pltf's claims against separate deft Ramsey be dismissed with prejudice, and that deft Ramsey be dismissed as a party to this action; also recommending that the court certify an in forma pauperis appeal taken from any Order and Judgment entered would not be taken in good faith (tjj) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER by Mag. Judge J. T. Ray granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis [4-1]; the Sheriff of Independence County, his designee, or future custodians shall collect from pltf's prison trust account an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $33.20; the Sheriff shall collect from pltf's account the $116.80 balance of the filing fee by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month's income; service is appropriate for separate defts Fiedler, Anderson, Brown, and Witt only; service is not appropriate at this time for separate deft Ramsey; the clerk of the court is directed to prepare summons and the US Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and summons on these separate defts without prepayment of fees and costs or security thereof (cc: all counsel) (tjj) Modified on 12/18/2001 (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              AMENDED complaint [2-1] by plaintiff (tjj) (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION by plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis (tjj) Modified on 11/14/2001 (Entered: 10/29/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Mag. Judge J. T. Ray denying motion to proceed in forma pauperis as incomplete [1-1]; pltf must submit, within 30 days of entry of this Order, either the $150.00 statutory filing fee or a proper and complete in forma pauperis application, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the detention center; failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice; service is not appropriate for defts at this time; pltf is hereby ordered to file, within 30 days of the date of this Order, an amended complt containing information specified in this Order; failure to timely do so will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice (cc: all counsel) (former empl) (Entered: 10/15/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    COMPLAINT (pag) (Entered: 09/21/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION by Lonnie Howard Headley to proceed in forma pauperis (pag) Modified on 11/14/2001 (Entered: 09/21/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?