QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01266-DLF
District Judge Dabney L. Friedrich, presiding

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Last Updated September 18, 2019 at 2:16 AM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Sobel +1 202 246 6180 +1 202 237 7727 sobel@att.net
v.
United States Department of Transportation United States Department of Transportation, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marsha Wellknown Yee +1 202 252 2539 +1 202 252 2599 marsha.yee@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/28/2017
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 11001
Terminated 3/30/2019
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,STAYED,TYPE I-FOIA
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: 3/27/2019 stipulation
STIPULATION of Settlement and Dismissal With Prejudice by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Yee, Marsha)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Order
    MINUTE ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case in light of the parties' [23] Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 27, 2019. (lcdlf2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: 3/22/2019 Status report
      Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Yee, Marsha)
        LREF
        Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 Status report
        STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Yee, Marsha)
          LREF
          Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 3/22/2019. (zcdw)
            LREF
            Blank  Order
            MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's [21] Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another status report on or before March 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 1, 2019. (JK)
              LREF
              Blank  Order on Motion to stay
              MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's [20] Consent Motion for a Stay and Extension of Time in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this case is STAYED until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice and the Department of Transportation. All pending deadlines in this action are extended for a period of time equal to the calendar day duration of the lapse in appropriations. The defendant shall file a status report within seven calendar days of appropriations being restored that proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 2, 2019. (JK)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018, Terminated: 1/2/2019 Motion To Stay
                Consent MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Order
                  MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' [19] Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 29, 2018. (JK)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Status report
                    Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Yee, Marsha)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/30/2018, Entered: 9/30/2018 Order on motion for summary judgmentCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice the defendant's [10] Motion for Summary Judgment and the plaintiff's [12] Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See memorandum opinion and order for details. The parties shall confer and submit a joint status report on or before October 19, 2018 that proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 30, 2018. (JK)(JK)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Substitution of Counsel
                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION Substituting for attorney Claire M. Whitaker (Yee, Marsha)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: 4/6/2018 Notice of Supplemental Authority
                          NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Sobel, David)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: 1/29/2018 Reply to opposition to Motion
                            REPLY to opposition to motion re [12] Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP.. (Sobel, David)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Reply to opposition to Motion
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Whitaker, Claire)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: 12/27/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                Memorandum in opposition to re [12] Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Plaintiff's) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Ex.A- Matheke Supp. Decl., # (2) Declaration Ex.B-Schwall Decl., # (3) Statement of Facts Statement addressing Pl. SMF and Supp. Statement of Def., # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                  Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017, Terminated: 9/30/2018 Motion for partial summary judgment
                                    Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Randall A. Whitfield, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Statement of Facts, # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Memorandum in opposition
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [10] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Randall A. Whitfield, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Statement of Facts, # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017, Terminated: 9/30/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-9 (Referenced in Exhibit A and Exhibit B), # (2) Declaration (Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey Quant), # (3) Declaration (Exhibit B - Declaration of Otto G. Matheke, III), # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017, Terminated: 10/16/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion and extend briefing schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 10/25/2017; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/30/2017; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/27/2017; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 1/29/2018. (tg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                          MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' [9] Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the Court issues the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) the defendant shall, by October 25, 2017, file any motion for summary judgment; (2) the plaintiff shall, by November 30, 2017, file any consolidated opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) the defendant shall, by December 27, 2017, file any consolidated opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment; and (4) the plaintiff shall, by January 29, 2018, file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 16, 2017. (lcbah2)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 10/16/2017; plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/20/2017; defendant's Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/18/2017; Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 1/19/2018. (tg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                              MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' [8] Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order, Instanter nunc pro tunc. Accordingly, the Court issues the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) the defendant shall, by October 16, 2017, file any motion for summary judgment; (2) the plaintiff shall, by November 20, 2017, file any consolidated opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) the defendant shall, by December 18, 2017, file any consolidated opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment; and (4) the plaintiff shall, by January 19, 2018, file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 11, 2017. (lcbah2)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017, Terminated: 9/11/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Proposed Scheduling Order, Instanter by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Whitaker, Claire)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/22/2017. (tg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017, Terminated: 8/2/2017 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other response by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                        MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's [6] Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendant shall, by August 22, 2017, answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's [1] Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 2, 2017. (lcbah2)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Whitaker, Claire)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 28, 2017. (lcbah2)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                              SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Consent) (md)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP. (md)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5010131) filed by QUALITY CONTROL SYSTEMS CORP.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Rule 7.1 certificate, # (3) Summons DOT, # (4) Summons Att'y General, # (5) Summons U.S. Att'y)(Sobel, David)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                  Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 261 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?