United States v. Flynn
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-10283
District Judge Rya W. Zobel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 8, 2018 at 12:01 AM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniel J. Flynn, III, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/14/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Oscar Cruz, Jr. +1 617 223 8061 +1 617 223 8080 Oscar_Cruz@fd.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1) TO 7/14/17. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 14, 2017 to File Joint Restitution Order as to Daniel J. Flynn, III by USA. (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Set/Reset Hearings as to Daniel J. Flynn, III Evidentiary Hearing re; restitution set for 6/20/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. STATEMENT OF REASONS as to Daniel J. Flynn, III (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Daniel J. Flynn, III (1), Count(s) 1-7, The defendant was sentenced to 48 months BOP; 3 years SR; $900 SA; no fine; restitution to be determined; standard conditions apply; SC; no new credit; pay balance of restitution ; share with financial litigation; mental health; ok to be auctioneer; self report to facility 6/26/17 before 2:00 p.m.; Count(s) 8-9, The defendant was sentenced to 48 months BOP; 3 years SR; $900 SA; no fine; restitution to be determined; standard conditions apply; SC; no new credit; pay balance of restitution; share with financial litigation; mental health; ok to be auctioneer; self report to facility 6/26/17 before 2:00 p.m. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Sentencing held on 5/9/2017 for Daniel J. Flynn, III (1), Count(s) 1-7, The defendant was sentenced to 48 months BOP; 3 years SR; $900 SA; no fine; restitution to be determined; standard conditions apply; SC; no new credit; pay balance of restitution ; share with financial litigation; mental health; ok to be auctioneer; self report to facility 6/26/17 before 2:00 p.m.; Count(s) 8-9, The defendant was sentenced to 48 months BOP; 3 years SR; $900 SA; no fine; restitution to be determined; standard conditions apply; SC; no new credit; pay balance of restitution; share with financial litigation; mental health; ok to be auctioneer; self report to facility 6/26/17 before 2:00 p.m.. (Attorneys present: Gallagher & McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Catherine Handel at hhcatherine2@yahoo.com. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              EXHIBIT Y in Support of 45 Sentencing Memorandum, filed by Daniel J. Flynn, III (Gioia, AnaMaria) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                EXHIBIT X in Support of 45 Sentencing Memorandum, filed by Daniel J. Flynn, III (Gioia, AnaMaria) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Daniel J. Flynn, III (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W)(McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Daniel J. Flynn, III (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 42 Motion for Hearing as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1) (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Assented to MOTION for Hearing (on Restitution after Sentencing) as to Daniel J. Flynn, III by USA. (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Daniel J. Flynn, III Sentencing set for 5/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          PLEA AGREEMENT as to Daniel J. Flynn, III (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Rule 11 Hearing as to Daniel J. Flynn, III held on 2/1/2017, Plea entered by Daniel J. Flynn III (1) Guilty Count 1-7,8-9.,Government states maximum penalties. Defendant sworn. Colloquy re; defendants educational background, state of mind, charges, penalties and defendants rights. Government summarizes evidence if case were to go to trial. ( Sentencing set for 5/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.) (Attorneys present: Gallagher & McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Catherine Handel at hhcatherine2@yahoo.com. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Daniel J. Flynn, III Rule 11 Hearing set for 2/1/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: granting 35 Motion to Continue as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1)( Jury Trial set for 2/6/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.); Affirming 29 Report and Order on Final Status Conference by Magistrate Judge as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1)( Jury Trial/PLEA REset for 2/6/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.); initial Status Conference as to Daniel J. Flynn, III held on 8/11/2016 (Attorneys present: Gallagher & McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: No Reporter Used. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Daniel J. Flynn, III Status Conference set for 8/11/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Continue Trial to 1/2/2017 to Continue Trial as to Daniel J. Flynn, III. (McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Case as to Daniel J. Flynn, III no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Initial Pretrial Conference as to Daniel J. Flynn, III held on 4/20/2016, ( Jury Trial set for 9/6/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.) (Attorneys present: Gallagher & McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Catherine Handel at hhcatherine2@yahoo.com. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Daniel J. Flynn, III Interim Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Daniel J. Flynn, III. Time excluded from 1/13/16 until 3/3/16. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 27 Motion to Exclude as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1) (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. REPORT AND ORDER on Final Status Conference as to Daniel J. Flynn, III (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference as to Daniel J. Flynn, III held on 3/3/2016. Counsel confer, request that the case be sent up to the district judge and agree to the exclusion of time from this date until the first appearance before the district court. Government to file an assented to motion to exclude the time. (Attorneys present: Gallagher, McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from 1/13/2016 to 3/3/2016 as to Daniel J. Flynn, III by USA. (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference as to Daniel J. Flynn, III held on 1/13/2016. Counsel confer, ask for a further date and agree to the exclusion of time from this date until 3/3/16. Government to file an assented to motion to exclude the time. ( Status Conference set for 3/3/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.) (Attorneys present: Gallagher, McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Daniel J. Flynn, III. Time excluded from 11/4/15 until 1/13/16. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 23 Motion to Exclude as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1) (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from 11/04/2015 to 01/13/2016 as to Daniel J. Flynn, III by USA. (Gallagher, Neil) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference as to Daniel J. Flynn, III held on 11/4/2015. Counsel confer, ask for a further date and agree to the exclusion of time from this date until 1/13/16. Government to file an assented to motion to exclude the time. ( Status Conference set for 1/13/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.) (Attorneys present: Gallagher, McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Attorney Oscar Cruz, Jr terminated as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1) (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/27/15 as to Daniel J. Flynn, III. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Daniel J. Flynn, III. (Cruz, Oscar) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler:Arraignment as to Daniel J. Flynn III held on 10/2/2015. Government states the maximum penalties, anticipates a trial lasting two weeks and estimates calling 30 witnesses. Plea entered by Daniel J. Flynn, III Not Guilty on all counts. ( Status Conference set for 11/4/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.) (Attorneys present: Gallagher, McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cara McNamara appearing for Daniel J. Flynn, III. Type of Appearance: Federal Defender Office. (McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Daniel J. Flynn, III Arraignment set for 10/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Reason for referral: For Pretrial Proceedings...as to Daniel J. Flynn, III (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Daniel J. Flynn, III; Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                INDICTMENT as to Daniel J. Flynn, III (1) count(s) 1-7, 8-9. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Daniel J. Flynn, III Preliminary Examination set for 10/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Garvin, Brendan) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Daniel J. Flynn, III. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley:Initial Appearance as to Daniel J. Flynn, III held on 8/27/2015. Case called;Court appoints Federal Defender for today's purpose. Defendant advises that hewill be hiring private attorney. Government states maximum penalties. Partiesagree on conditions of release. A Probable Cause hearing will be scheduled by M.J. Bowler. (Attorneys present: Gallagher,AUSA, Cruz, deft.. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Lovett, Zita) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Daniel J. Flynn, III Initial Appearance set for 8/27/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Lovett, Zita) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1) (Garvin, Brendan) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Case as to Daniel J. Flynn, III by USA. (Garvin, Brendan) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Daniel J. Flynn, III; Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler as to Daniel J. Flynn, III. (Moore, Kellyann) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  SEALED COMPLAINT as to Daniel J. Flynn, III (1). (Attachments: # 1 JS45, # 2 Affidavit of Special Agent Kevin M. McCusker)(Moore, Kellyann) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 1 Motion to Seal as to Daniel J. Flynn III (1). "Allowed" (Moore, Kellyann) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal as to Daniel J. Flynn, III by USA. (Moore, Kellyann) [1:15-mj-02236-MBB] (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?