Bluestem Brands, Inc. v. Merkle, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00185
District Judge Ellen L. Hollander, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 29, 2017 at 11:16 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bluestem Brands, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Goldstein & Levy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Frank Goldstein +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 dfg@browngold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BROWN GOLDSTEIN LEVY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooke E Lierman +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 blierman@browngold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
TERMINATED: 02/28/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monte A Mills +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mmills@greeneespel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence M Shapiro +1 612 373 8325 lshapiro@gr-espel.com
No Logo Merkle, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela Anne Bresnahan +1 202 467 8800 +1 202 467 8900 pabresnahan@vorys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Beau Alan Miller +1 713 588 7000 +1 713 588 7050 bamiller@vorys.com
TERMINATED: 04/08/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Hayes Mykytiuk +1 202 467 8800 +1 202 467 8900 ehmykytiuk@vorys.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond D. Pinkham +1 202 467 8806 +1 202 467 8900
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Russell Ryan +1 202 467 8842 +1 202 467 8900 matthew.ryan@kattenlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Treubert Simon +1 202 467 8879 +1 202 533 9074 etsimon@vorys.com
TERMINATED: 04/23/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary D. Welsh +1 513 723 4487 +1 513 852 8449 rdwelsh@vssp.com
v.
No Logo Merkle, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KATTEN AND MUCHIN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Russell Ryan +1 202 467 8842 +1 202 467 8900 matthew.ryan@kattenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela Anne Bresnahan +1 202 467 8800 +1 202 467 8900 pabresnahan@vorys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Beau Alan Miller +1 713 588 7000 +1 713 588 7050 bamiller@vorys.com
TERMINATED: 04/08/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Hayes Mykytiuk +1 202 467 8800 +1 202 467 8900 ehmykytiuk@vorys.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond D. Pinkham +1 202 467 8806 +1 202 467 8900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Treubert Simon +1 202 467 8879 +1 202 533 9074 etsimon@vorys.com
TERMINATED: 04/23/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary D. Welsh +1 513 723 4487 +1 513 852 8449 rdwelsh@vssp.com
No Logo Bluestem Brands, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Goldstein & Levy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Frank Goldstein +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 dfg@browngold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BROWN GOLDSTEIN LEVY, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooke E Lierman +1 410 962 1030 +1 410 385 0869 blierman@browngold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sybil Louise Dunlop +1 612 373 8345 +1 612 373 0929 sdunlop@greeneespel.com
TERMINATED: 02/28/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monte A Mills +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 mmills@greeneespel.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence M Shapiro +1 612 373 8325 lshapiro@gr-espel.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Treubert Simon on behalf of Merkle, Inc. (Simon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Merkle, Inc. Responses due by 2/19/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bresnahan, Pamela) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Anne Bresnahan on behalf of Merkle, Inc. (Bresnahan, Pamela) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sybil L Dunlop for Bluestem Brands, Inc. Directing attorney Sybil L Dunlop to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/13. (cmns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PAPERLESS ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew M Luger for Bluestem Brands, Inc. Directing attorney Andrew M Luger to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/13. (cmns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sybil L. Dunlop ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3912138.) by Bluestem Brands, Inc. (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew M. Luger ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3912113.) by Bluestem Brands, Inc. (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Summons Issued 21 days as to Merkle, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bluestem Brands, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bluestem Sales, Inc., Other Affiliate Bluestem Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate Bluestem Fulfillment, Inc., Other Affiliate Fingerhut Receivables 1 LLC for Bluestem Brands, Inc... (Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    COMPLAINT against Merkle, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0416-3900704.), filed by Bluestem Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Goldstein, Daniel) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 68 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?