J&J Sports Productions Inc v. PSR Petro Mart LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00899

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2019 at 3:45 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/10/2018: GRANTING 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Document; ADOPTING 21 and 22 Parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Seal or Restrict Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Seal or Restrict Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Seal or Restrict Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Disclosure Statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?