District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  1. Case No. 17-1904
    Filed 4/13/2017
  2. Case No. 17-2130
    Filed 6/6/2017
  3. Case No. 17-2235
    Filed 6/27/2017
  4. Case No. 17-2253
    Filed 6/30/2017
United States Supreme Court

Waymo LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 17-2235

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 13, 2017 at 12:00 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Otto Trucking Llc, Defendant
No Logo Ottomotto LLC, Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc. Uber Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Levandowski, Anthony, Intervenor - Appellant
Officially listed as "Anthony Levandowski"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey & Ehrlich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy E Craig +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 291 3060 amy@ramsey-ehrlich.com
Space Miles F. Ehrlich +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 291 3060 miles@ramsey-ehrlich.com
Space Ismail Jomo Ramsey +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 548 3601 izzy@ramsey-ehrlich.com
No Logo Lior Ron, Movant
Lyft, Inc. Lyft, Inc., Movant
No Logo Stroz Friedberg, LLC, Movant
Waymo LLC Waymo LLC, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Cooper +1 212 849 7000 davidcooper@quinnemanuel.com
Space David Andrew Perlson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 davidperlson@quinnemanuel.com
Space Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Case Type Civil Private
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=3:17-cv-00939-WHA
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=3:17-cv-00939-WHA
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301051254 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 08/23/2017 by email. [456263]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 08/23/2017 by email. [456263]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Notice to counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski: The record of this case indicates that the Certificate of Interest has not been filed. A completed certificate of Interest must be submitted in accordance with Fed. Cir. R. 47.4 by 08/24/2017. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [456121]
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Official caption revised to correct party designation. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [454100] [17-2235, 17-2253]
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Submitted after ORAL ARGUMENT by
          Miles Ehrlich for Anthony Levandowski and Charles Kramer Verhoeven for Waymo LLC.
          Panel: Judge: Newman , Judge: Wallach , Judge: Stoll. [453336]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Transcript Purchase Order Form from court reporter indicating that a transcript is already on file (5/3/17 & 5/25/17 hearings). Service: 08/08/2017 by clerk. [452292]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301042315 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Transcript Purchase Order Form from court reporter indicating that a transcript is already on file (5/3/17 & 5/25/17 hearings). Service: 08/08/2017 by clerk. [452292]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER filed granting motion to seal document [47] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [451625]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301040891 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER filed granting motion to seal document [47] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [451625]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Response to oral argument order from the Appellee Waymo LLC. designating Charles K. Verhoeven as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 15 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 0 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [450193]
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Response to oral argument order from the Appellant Anthony Levandowski. designating Miles Ehrlich as arguing attorney. Designated time for argument: 10 minutes. Designated time for rebuttal: 5 minutes. Service of other counsel by Notice of Docket Activity from this entry. [450070]
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        6 paper copies of the Corrected Appendix [45] received from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. [449491]
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          6 paper copies of the Corrected Confidential Appendix [44] received from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. [449489]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Anthony Levandowski indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 07/24/2017 by email. [448852]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301034529 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Anthony Levandowski indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 07/24/2017 by email. [448852]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                6 paper copies of the Appendix to Reply Brief [43] received from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. [448753]
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  6 paper copies of the Reply Brief [34] received from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. [448752]
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF CALENDARING. Panel: 1708J+. Case scheduled Aug 11, 2017 10:00 a.m. at the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (Howard T. Markey National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, N.W. Washington, DC 20439), Courtroom 203. Response to oral argument order due: 07/28/2017. Arguing counsel is required to check-in with the Clerk's Office, 4th Floor, Room 401, between 8:30 a.m. and 9:30 a.m. on the day of argument. Please review the Oral Argument Order. [448343]
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION of Appellant Anthony Levandowski to seal document appendix Brief [44]. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 07/20/2017 by email. [448097]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301032845 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION of Appellant Anthony Levandowski to seal document appendix Brief [44]. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: partial consent]. Service: 07/20/2017 by email. [448097]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 46 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/20/2017 by email. [448078]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301032821 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/20/2017 by email. [448078]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              CORRECTED APPENDIX FILED for Anthony Levandowski [37]. Number of Pages: 185. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/27/2017. [448008]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301032680 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CORRECTED APPENDIX FILED for Anthony Levandowski [37]. Number of Pages: 185. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/27/2017. [448008]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CORRECTED CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX FILED for Anthony Levandowski [36]. Number of Pages: 190. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/27/2017. [447995]
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    APPENDIX FILED for Anthony Levandowski [33]. Number of Pages: 119. Service: 07/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/27/2017. [447961]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301032574 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      APPENDIX FILED for Anthony Levandowski [33]. Number of Pages: 119. Service: 07/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/27/2017. [447961]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ORDER filed. The motion to file a corrected appendix to the opening brief [38] is granted. Mr. Levandowski’s corrected confidential and non-confidential versions of the appendix to the opening brief are accepted for filing. The motion to file a nonconforming appendix to the reply brief [39] is granted to the extent that the appendix will be accepted as filed. No later than July 21, 2017, Waymo is directed to provide this court with a copy of the sealed version of the district court order for in camera review. Any further action will be considered separately, at the request of any party or the intervenor. (Per Curiam). Service: 07/20/2017 by clerk. [447925] [17-2235, 17-2253]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301032489 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ORDER filed. The motion to file a corrected appendix to the opening brief [38] is granted. Mr. Levandowski
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Letter from Appellant Anthony Levandowski Re: Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(j). Service: 07/19/2017 by email. [447767]
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301032154 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Letter from Appellant Anthony Levandowski Re: Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(j). Service: 07/19/2017 by email. [447767]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice of Correction to the confidential Brief Doc No. [36] for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/19/2017 by email. [447743]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301032078 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Notice of Correction to the confidential Brief Doc No. [36] for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/19/2017 by email. [447743]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION of Anthony Levandowski Appellant Anthony Levandowski to adopt appendix. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447489]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301031493 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION of Anthony Levandowski Appellant Anthony Levandowski to adopt appendix. Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447489]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [18] for Appellant Anthony Levandowskifrom Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447488]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301031490 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [18] for Appellant Anthony Levandowskifrom Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447488]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski.from Anthony Levandowski Title: CORRECTED JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447487]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301031487 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski.from Anthony Levandowski Title: CORRECTED JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447487]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski.from Anthony Levandowski Title: CORRECTED CONFIDENTIAL JOINT APPENDIX Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447486]
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447485]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301031481 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Certificate of Compliance with Fed. Cir. R. 11(d) (Trial Court) for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/18/2017 by email. [447485]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellant Anthony Levandowski [32]. Number of Pages: 21. Service: 07/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/25/2017. [447245]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301030935 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        REPLY BRIEF FILED for Appellant Anthony Levandowski [32]. Number of Pages: 21. Service: 07/17/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/25/2017. [447245]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 07/17/2017 by email. [447203]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301030871 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 07/17/2017 by email. [447203]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 07/17/2017 by email. [447202]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301030868 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: REPLY BRIEF. Service: 07/17/2017 by email. [447202]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  6 paper copies of the Opening Response Brief [30] received from Appellee Waymo LLC. [446879]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    BRIEF FILED for Appellee Waymo LLC [29]. Number of Pages: 44. Service: 07/13/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/21/2017. [446495]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301029346 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      BRIEF FILED for Appellee Waymo LLC [29]. Number of Pages: 44. Service: 07/13/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/21/2017. [446495]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        TENDERED from Appellee Waymo LLC. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 07/13/2017 by email. [446479]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301029318 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          TENDERED from Appellee Waymo LLC. Title: RESPONSE BRIEF. Service: 07/13/2017 by email. [446479]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            6 paper copies of the Appendix to Opening Brief [20] received from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. [446159]
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              6 paper copies of the Corrected Opening Brief [19] received from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. [446150]
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Docketing Statement for the Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445766]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301027876 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Docketing Statement for the Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445766]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445765]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301027873 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445765]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Entry of appearance for David A. Perlson as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445764]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301027870 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for David A. Perlson as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445764]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for David Cooper as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445763]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301027867 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for David Cooper as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445763]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Entry of appearance for Charles K. Verhoeven as principal counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445762]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301027864 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Entry of appearance for Charles K. Verhoeven as principal counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445762]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Docketing Statement for the Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445757]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301027847 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Docketing Statement for the Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/11/2017 by email. [445757]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX FILED for Anthony Levandowski [18]. Number of Pages: 185. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/14/2017. [444982]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX FILED for Anthony Levandowski [18]. Number of Pages: 185. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/14/2017. [444982] The appendix has been replaced. See Doc No. [45]
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant Anthony Levandowski [17]. Number of Pages: 58. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/14/2017. [444981]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301026114 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              CORRECTED BRIEF FILED for Appellant Anthony Levandowski [17]. Number of Pages: 58. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/14/2017. [444981]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444968]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: JOINT APPENDIX. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444968] The appendix has been replaced. See Doc No. [45]
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444957]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301026064 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444957]
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [10] for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444954]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301026058 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Correction to the Brief Doc No. [10] for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444954]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Miles Ehrlich as of counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444888]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301025913 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Entry of appearance for Miles Ehrlich as of counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444888]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Amended Entry of appearance for Amy Craig as of counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444848]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301025827 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Entry of appearance for Amy Craig as of counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444848]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of appearance for Ismail Ramsey as principal counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444823]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301025774 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of appearance for Ismail Ramsey as principal counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 07/07/2017 by email. [444823]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: The Opening Brief Document No. [11] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-2235 is submitted without the required prerequisite entry of appearance of [ MILES EHRLICH AND ISMAIL J. RAMSEY] You are being afforded the opportunity to correct the deficiency. At the discretion of the court, the corrected document may be accepted for filing if received before midnight (EST) on the date of this notice. [444739]
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF FILED for Appellant Anthony Levandowski [10]. Number of Pages: 58. Service: 07/06/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/14/2017. [444737]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301025591 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF FILED for Appellant Anthony Levandowski [10]. Number of Pages: 58. Service: 07/06/2017 by email. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 07/14/2017. [444737]
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 07/06/2017 by email. [444684]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301025484 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                TENDERED from Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 07/06/2017 by email. [444684]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY of Appellant Anthony Levandowski to response filed by Appellee in 17-2235 , Doc. No [8]. Service: 07/06/2017 by email. [444575]
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301025193 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY of Appellant Anthony Levandowski to response filed by Appellee in 17-2235 , Doc. No [8]. Service: 07/06/2017 by email. [444575]
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [3] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-2235. Service: 07/03/2017 by email. [443991]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301023949 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [3] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-2235. Service: 07/03/2017 by email. [443991] --[Edited 07/05/2017 by clerk to correct docket text to include party filer]
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Official caption revised to reflect movants. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [443771]
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Note to file: The following cases are consolidated: 17-2235 (Lead) with 17-2253 (Member). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [443727] [17-2235, 17-2253]
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER filed. The motion to consolidate appeals 2017-2235 and 2017-2253 [443552-3] is granted. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Mr. Levandowski is directed to file only one opening brief/petition for a writ of mandamus. The briefing schedule set forth in this court’s June 29, 2017 order in 2017-2235 shall remain in effect.; Waymo LLC is directed to file a single response to the motions for a stay and Mr. Levandowski is directed to file a single reply. The briefing schedule for the motion for a stay set forth in this court’s June 29, 2017 order in 2017-2235 shall remain in effect.; The district courts order requiring production of the records in question in 2017-2253 is temporarily stayed pending this courts consideration of the motions papers. (Per Curiam). Service: 06/30/2017 by clerk. [443621] [17-2253, 17-2235]
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301023214 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER filed. The motion to consolidate appeals 2017-2235 and 2017-2253 [443552-3] is granted. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Mr. Levandowski is directed to file only one opening brief/petition for a writ of mandamus. The briefing schedule set forth in this court
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER filed. Waymo LLC is directed to respond to the motion for a stay [3] no later than Monday, July 3, 2017. Any reply is due no later than Thursday, July 6, 2017. The district court's order requiring production of the records in question is temporarily stayed pending this court's consideration of the motions papers. Mr. Levandowski is directed to file his opening brief/petition for a writ of mandamus along with any appendix materials no later than Thursday, July 6, 2017. Waymo is directed to file a response brief along with any appendix materials no later than July 13, 2017. Any reply and accompanying appendix materials are due no later than July 17, 2017. (Per Curiam). Service: 06/29/2017 by clerk. [443220]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301022269 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER filed. Waymo LLC is directed to respond to the motion for a stay [3] no later than Monday, July 3, 2017. Any reply is due no later than Thursday, July 6, 2017. The district court's order requiring production of the records in question is temporarily stayed pending this court's consideration of the motions papers. Mr. Levandowski is directed to file his opening brief/petition for a writ of mandamus along with any appendix materials no later than Thursday, July 6, 2017. Waymo is directed to file a response brief along with any appendix materials no later than July 13, 2017. Any reply and accompanying appendix materials are due no later than July 17, 2017. (Per Curiam). Service: 06/29/2017 by clerk. [443220]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Appellant Anthony Levandowski for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/27/2017 by email. [442599]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301020899 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION of Appellant Anthony Levandowski for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/27/2017 by email. [442599]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of appearance for Amy Craig as principal counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 06/27/2017 by email. [442596]
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301020890 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of appearance for Amy Craig as principal counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 06/27/2017 by email. [442596]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appeal docketed. Received: 06/26/2017. [442553]Entry of Appearance due 07/11/2017. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/11/2017. Docketing Statement due 07/11/2017. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 08/28/2017.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301020743 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appeal docketed. Received: 06/26/2017. [442553]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of Appearance due 07/11/2017. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/11/2017. Docketing Statement due 07/11/2017. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 08/28/2017.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?