WIDTFELDT v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01296

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 27, 2019 at 4:30 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES WIDTFELDT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 737

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES WIDTFELDT +1 402 336 2796
v.
No Logo ARTHUR WELP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Appeals Agent, IRS Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
No Logo DOUGLAS J. PETERSON, Defendant
No Logo DOUGLAS POLSKY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Internal Revenue Agent Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
No Logo LARRY W. DURANT, Defendant
No Logo MARK A. WEBER, Defendant
No Logo MICHELLE MOSER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
IRS Agent Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
No Logo NEBRASKA MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, Defendant
No Logo NEBRASKA STATE BAR ASSOCATION, Defendant
No Logo OFFICE OF THE HIGH COMMISSIONER ON HUMAN RIGHTS, Defendant
United States Department of Agriculture United States Department of Agriculture, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE"
No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
No Logo VINCE J. TILLO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Revenue Officer Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 3 , 5 , and 6 defendants' motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and denying 10 motion for leave to file an amended complaint as futile. This is a final Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/6/2018. (lcegs3)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Dismiss by DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, MICHELLE MOSER, DOUGLAS POLSKY, VINCE J. TILLO, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ARTHUR WELP (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Shoemaker, Martin) Modified event title on 9/29/2017 (znmw).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2017.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (lcegs1)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, LARRY W. DURANT, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, MICHELLE MOSER, NEBRASKA MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, NEBRASKA STATE BAR ASSOCATION, OFFICE OF THE HIGH COMMISSIONER ON HUMAN RIGHTS, DOUGLAS J. PETERSON, DOUGLAS POLSKY, VINCE J. TILLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MARK A. WEBER, ARTHUR WELP ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616085782) with Jury Demand filed by JAMES WIDTFELDT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?