Nutter v. Lynk Investments, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00375

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2018 at 11:03 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Judgment - consent
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Filing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Filing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER re 16 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/5/2017. (jaw)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?