Islam v. Lee's Motors, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03955

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 27, 2019 at 1:23 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mir S. Islam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlanger & Schlanger, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Daniel Adam Schlanger +1 212 500 6114 +1 646 612 7996 daniel.schlanger@schlangerlegal.com
No Logo Mir T. Islam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlanger & Schlanger, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Daniel Adam Schlanger +1 212 500 6114 +1 646 612 7996 daniel.schlanger@schlangerlegal.com
v.
No Logo Lee's Motors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by labontelawgroup.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Scott Howard Mandel +1 516 280 8580 +1 631 794 2434 smandel@labontelawgroup.com
Toyota Motor Credit Corporation Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP - Den/CO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ian Trevor Hicks +1 303 260 7712 +1 303 260 7714 ian.hicks@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Collins, May, Potenza, Baran & Gillespie, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Thomas Reynolds +1 602 252 1900 +1 602 252 1114 mreynolds@cmpbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cummisford, Acevedo & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Acevedo +1 414 761 1700 +1 414 761 3550

Toggle Switch Represented by Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Natalie Ann Daugherty +1 251 438 7850 +1 251 438 7875 ndaugherty@gallowayjohnson.com
, R. Scott Traweek +1 251 438 7850 +1 251 438 7875 straweek@gjtbs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Sherilyn A. Olsen +1 801 799 5800 +1 801 799 5700 solsen@hollandhart.com
Space Ellen E Ostrow +1 801 799 5981 +1 801 799 5700

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John S. Devlin +1 206 223 7000 +1223710 +12 223 7107 devlinj@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abraham K Lorber +1 206 223 7434 +1 206 223 7107 lorbera@lanepowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kenneth M Jones, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth M Jones, +1 954 473 6605

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Todd Daniel Erb +1 602 262 5726 +1 602 734 3933 TErb@lrrc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by May, Adam, Gerdes & Thompson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Robert B. Anderson +2246 224 224 6289 rba@mayadam.net

Toggle Switch Represented by providentlawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Philip Ashley Overcash +1 480 388 3343 +1 602 753 1270 philip@providentlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Terry B Bates +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 tbates@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Zachary Chad Frampton +1 213 457 8131 +1 213 457 8080 zframpton@reedsmith.com
, Nana Japaridze +1 212 549 0282 +1 212 521 5450 njaparidze@reedsmith.com
, Casey Devin Laffey +1 212 549 0389 +1 212 521 5450 claffey@reedsmith.com
, , , Robert Miltz Luck, III +1 804 344 3400 rluck@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd O Maiden +1 415 543 8700 +1 415 391 8269 tmaiden@reedsmith.com
Space Judith Sethna +1 213 457 8068 +1 213 457 8080 jsethna@reedsmith.com
Space Raagini Shah +1 213 457 8000 +1 213 457 8080 rshah@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Tuan Van Uong +1 213 457 8152 +1 213 457 8080 tuong@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Wystan M. Ackerman +1 860 275 8388 +1 860 275 8299 wackerman@rc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Rachel Tarko Hudson +1 415 774 2999 +1 415 403 6229 rhudson@sheppardmullin.com
, Christopher Michael Loveland +1 202 218 0000 +1 202 218 0020 cloveland@sheppardmullin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/21/2018, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Anna S McLean +1 415 774 3154 +1 415 403 6223 amclean@sheppardmullin.com
, Anna S McLean +1 415 774 3154 +1 415 403 6223 amclean@sheppardmullin.com
, Ryan Rosner +1 202 218 0000 +1 202 312 9509 rrosner@sheppardmullin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/21/2018, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Joy O. Siu +1 415 774 3108 +1 415 403 6226 jsiu@sheppardmullin.com
, Lai Lam Yip +1 415 774 3147 +1 415 403 6221 Lyip@sheppardmullin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toyota Motor Credit Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason W. Canne +1 617 367 0808 jason.canne@wilsonelser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright Finlay & Zak LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, DANIEL SCHLEIFSTEIN +1 908 725 9700 +1 908 333 6212 daniel.schleifstein@piblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/21/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael D. Barnes +1 501 212 1228 mbarnes@wlj.com
, , , , , Gary D. Marts, Jr. +1 501 212 1234 gmarts@wlj.com
, , , , , Regina Ann Young +1 501 212 1235 ryoung@wlj.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yu Mohandesi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Brett B Goodman +1 213 375 3543 +1 213 377 5501 bgoodman@yumollp.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam (Herrington, Brian)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Settlement between all paries, and request to cancel Status Conference scheduled for October 11, 2018 by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (Boyer, Nana) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORA NDUM AND ORDER, Defendants' motion to dismiss this action is granted in part and denied in part. Accordingly, Mir T.'s claims are dismissed and the motion is denied as to Mir S.'s claims and as to improper joinder. The Clerk of the Co urt shall note the termination of Plaintiff Mir T. Islam on the docket. This matter is referred to the magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings, including settlement discussions. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 09/30/2018. (Irizarry, Dora)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of MOTION to Withdraw 47 First MOTION for Protective Order to reschedule depositions by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                First MOTION for Protective Order to reschedule depositions by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: 8/15/2018 1 - Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying 41 Motion to Compel; denying 42 Motion to Compel; SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 8/15/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), an in Status Conference is set for 10/24/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel must meet and confer before making a motion to compel. The motions at [41, 42] along with 43, 44, and 45 are unnecessarily detailed and cover disputes counsel should have either resolved or narrowed. Only after a meet and confer may counsel raise theses issues if they are not resolved. In light of settlement discussions and Defendants' health issues, discovery is extended in this case (not the Experian case). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/15/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Letter Update on Discovery Disputes by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam (Herrington, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE to Motion re 41 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant Lee's Motors, Inc. filed by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corp. filed by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Boyer, Nana) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant Toyota Motor Credit Corp. by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TMCC's Discovery Responses) (Herrington, Brian) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant Lee's Motors, Inc. by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lee's Motors' Discovery Responses) (Herrington, Brian) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER finding as moot 32 Motion to Reassign Case; finding as moot 34 Motion to Reassign Case. SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 4/10/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), a Telephone Conference is set for 8/15/2018 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Plaintiffs' counsel is to organize a conference call, then phone Chambers at (718) 613-2300 with all counsel on the line. Proposed scheduling order at 37 is adopted. No extensions absent good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/10/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10337667. by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BKH Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit TN Letter of GS, # 3 Exhibit MS Letter of GS) (Herrington, Brian) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 Memorandum in Opposition, 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (joining the Motion to Dismiss filed by co-defendant Lee's Motors (Dkt. 25) joined by Defendant TMCC by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Proposed Scheduling Order Joint Revised Scheduling Order by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Change of Address and Firm Name by Daniel Adam Schlanger (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference CORRECTED Joint Motion To Adjourn Conference And Stay Discovery In Light Of Filing Of Request On Consent Of All Parties To Relate Cases (Correcting ECF Doc. 33) by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Consent MOTION to Reassign Case CORRECTED Consent Application To Clerk Of Court Requesting Cases Be Deemed Related Pursuant To L.R. 50.3.1 by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference Joint Motion To Adjourn Conference And Stay Discovery In Light Of Filing Of Request On Consent Of All Parties To Relate Cases by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Consent MOTION to Reassign Case Consent Application To Clerk Of Court Requesting Cases Be Deemed Related Pursuant To L.R. 50.3.1 by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (joining the Motion to Dismiss filed by co-defendant Lee's Motors (Dkt. 25), 25 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Vehicle Invoice)) (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (joining the Motion to Dismiss filed by co-defendant Lee's Motors (Dkt. 25), 25 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint filed by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (joining the Motion to Dismiss filed by co-defendant Lee's Motors (Dkt. 25), 25 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation, Corporate Parent Toyota Financial Services Corporation, Corporate Parent Toyota Financial Services Americas Corporation for Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Japaridze, Nana) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference And Extend Certain Related Discovery Deadlines by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (proposed revised scheduling order)) (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (joining the Motion to Dismiss filed by co-defendant Lee's Motors (Dkt. 25) by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Japaridze, Nana) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amended Complaint by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 Scheduling Order,,, by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY in Opposition re 21 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re: motion to dismiss, 20 MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss filed by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Pre-Motion Letters (Request Made With Consent Of All Parties) by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re: motion to dismiss by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Japaridze, Nana) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed Pursuant To 10/23/17 Scheduling Order (ECF Doc. 18) against Lee's Motors, Inc., Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, filed by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 10/23/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 7/12/2018. On or before 7/13/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 8/13/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 9/13/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. An in person Status Conference is set for 2/8/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 2/2/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/23/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lee's Motors, Inc. re 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference Currently Scheduled For October 23, 2017, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 1 Complaint, As A Matter Of Course, Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Until November 10, 2017 by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Japaridze, Nana) (Entered: 10/09/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lee's Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Scott H. Mandel, # 2 Declaration Joel Cohn, # 3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Amended Sales Contract, # 5 Exhibit Retail Installment Contract, # 6 Exhibit Credit Application, # 7 Memorandum in Support) (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Japaridze, Nana) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Proposed Scheduling Order (Submitted On Behalf Of All Parties) by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer STIPULATION ACCEPTING SERVICE AND EXTENDING DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT CORP.'S TIME TO ANSWER by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nana Japaridze on behalf of Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Japaridze, Nana) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Lee's Motors, Inc. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 9/26/2017. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 10/12/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 10/5/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/24/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Howard Mandel on behalf of Lee's Motors, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mandel, Scott) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Defendant Lee's Motors Inc.'s Time To Answer, Move Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Schlanger, Daniel) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Toyota summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Proposed Summons. by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam (Schlanger, Daniel)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Proposed Summons. by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam (Schlanger, Daniel)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9649799 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Mir T. Islam, Mir S. Islam. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schlanger, Daniel)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORDER electronically endorsing 53 . So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/30/2018. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal until 11/26/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/15/2018. (Tuffaha, Omar)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File. STATUS REPORT ORDER: On or before 11/15/2018, the Parties will file their stipulation of dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/13/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the letter at 50 stating that the Parties have a reached a settlement in principle, the status conference scheduled for 10/11/18 is adjourned sine die. The Parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal by 11/9/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/10/2018. (Tuffaha, Omar)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ORDER: The 48 Motion to Withdraw the 47 Motion for Protective Order is granted. The Motion at 47 is terminated as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/5/2018. (Tuffaha, Omar)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person Status Conference is set for 10/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/3/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the Order on 8/15/2018, the Status Conference scheduled for 9/14/2018 is cancelled. The Status Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 11:00 AM will proceed as scheduled. The Parties are to file a joint status report by 10/11/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/6/2018. (Tuffaha, Omar)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. Brian Herrington appearing for Plaintiff. Scott Mandel and Nana Boyer appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #12:46-1:07.) (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person Status Conference is set for 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 9/6/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/13/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: On or before 7/20/2018, Defendants Lee's Motors, Inc. and Toyota Motor Credit Corp. shall file responses to Plaintiffs' letters at 41 and 42, respectively. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/17/2018. (Tuffaha, Omar)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Status Conference held on 4/10/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. Brian Herrington appearing for Plaintiffs. Scott Mandel (via telephone) and Nana Japaridze appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #10:42-11:09.) (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF. Registration is available online on the NYED homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. To the extent s/he has not already done so, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/10/2018. (Miller, Hannah)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        ORDER finding as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- This motion is moot in light of the amended complaint, see 19 . Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 4/6/2018. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time -- Reply is now due by March 29, 2018. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/22/2018. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 33 Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting 35 Motion to Adjourn Conference. At the request of the parties, the 3/12/2018 status conference is rescheduled to 4/10/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/12/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time -- Opposition is now due by March 5, 2018 and reply is due by March 22, 2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 2/22/2018. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting consent 27 Motion to Adjourn Conference. At the request of parties, the 2/8/2018 Status Conference is adjourned to 3/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties revised scheduling order is approved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/1/2018. (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. Discovery responses previously due on 1/8/2018 are now due on or before 2/7/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/9/2018. (Miller, Hannah)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER -- Defendants' request is denied, as my rules do not require premotion conferences for motions made in lieu of an answer pursuant to Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendants are directed to file their motion. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/26/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File -- Response to request for pre motion conference now due by December 20, 2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/14/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/23/2017 in Courtroom 13A South. Daniel Schlanger appearing for Plaintiffs. Scott Mandel and Nana Japaridze appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #11:36-12:06.) (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 16 Motion to Adjourn Conference, granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend, and denying 16 Motion to Stay. The Initial Conference scheduled for 10/23/2017 will proceed as scheduled. In consultation with the District Judge's chambers, Plaintiffs' time to amend pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) is extended to 11/10/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/20/2017. (Miller, Hannah)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting consent 15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 10/12/2017 has been rescheduled to 10/23/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/10/2017. (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 9/26/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/8/2017. (Quinlan, Krista)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?