Jones v. Natchaug Hospital, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-01099

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2019 at 8:28 AM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Franklin Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Natchaug Hospital, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Response
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Motion Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Electronic Service Documents
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE Re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 7/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment)(Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/3/2017.(Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/3/2017.(Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/3/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2017 Discovery due by 1/2/2018 Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2018 Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/3/2017.(Villano, P.) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?