Collier v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:05-cv-00279
District Judge Billy Roy Wilson, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Billy Roy Wilson
Last Updated July 4, 2017 at 11:08 PM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Ronald S Collier, Plaintiff

Represented by ADC #70714

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald S Collier
v.
No Logo Arkansas Department of Correction, Defendant
No Logo Blankenship, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Ann Witherspoon +1 501 786 3243 kim.witherspoon87@gmail.com
No Logo Correctional Medical Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo John Lowe, Defendant

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Allen Weems +1 870 225 5094

Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KaTina Rena Hodge +1 501 682 1307 katina.hodge@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Max Mobley, Defendant

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Allen Weems +1 870 225 5094

Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KaTina Rena Hodge +1 501 682 1307 katina.hodge@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Mogbo, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Ann Witherspoon +1 501 786 3243 kim.witherspoon87@gmail.com
No Logo Rebecca Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Rick L Toney, Defendant

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Allen Weems +1 870 225 5094

Represented by Office of the Arkansas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KaTina Rena Hodge +1 501 682 1307 katina.hodge@arkansasag.gov
No Logo Roland Anderson, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Ann Witherspoon +1 501 786 3243 kim.witherspoon87@gmail.com
No Logo Sandra Ferrell, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Ann Witherspoon +1 501 786 3243 kim.witherspoon87@gmail.com
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Timeline
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 66 Order, 67 Judgment (appeal forms to pltf) (vjt) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT purs to Order 66 entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts on all claims set forth in this action; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith; terminating case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 6/1/06. (vjt) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER adopting Recommended Disposition 62 in its entirety; therefore, defts' motions to dismiss 42 and 51 are GRANTED; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 6/1/06. (vjt) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Max Mobley, John Lowe, Rick L Toney re 64 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Hodge, Ka Tina) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Max Mobley, John Lowe, Rick L Toney. (Hodge, Ka Tina) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 62 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 51 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mogbo, 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Blankenship, Roland Anderson,, Sandra Ferrell, 61 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. (smb) (Correct document substituted as attachment on 5/24/2006). (Entered: 05/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 42 51 Defendants' MOTIONS to Dismiss be GRANTED and that plaintiff's inadequate medical care claim involving the alleged failure to give Plaintiff physical therapy in 10/2001 be dismissed, with prejudice and failure to provide Plaintiff with access to gym equipment in 3/2005 be dismissed, without prejudice and that the Court CERTIFY that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order and Judgment adopting this Recommended Disposition would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2006. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/19/2006. (smb) (Docket text modified on 5/23/2006 to correct typographical error.) (thd) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER 54 Motion to Amend/Correct the complaint is Denied, as moot. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/19/2006. (smb) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 59 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney. (smb) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 55 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Clerk is directed to substitute Ms. Ka Tina R. Hodge for Mr. Johnathan Allen Weems as the attorney of record for Separate Defendants Mobley, Lowe, and Toney . Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/18/2006. (smb) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 57 Notice of Docket Correction. (thd) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 56 Notice of Appearance. CORRECTION: Original document submitted with incorrect Certificate of Service; correct document added to docket entry 56 , per attached request. (thd) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Ka Tina Rena Hodge on behalf of Max Mobley, John Lowe, Rick L Toney (Hodge, Ka Tina) (MODIFICATION: Original document submitted with incorrect certificate of service; correct document added as an attachment on 5/16/2006.) (thd) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Max Mobley, John Lowe, Rick L Toney. (Hodge, Ka Tina) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to correct 22 Amended Complaint filed by Ronald S Collier. (pag, )(copy mailed) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Mogbo served on 4/28/2006, answer due 5/18/2006. (COPY OF SUMMONS AND GREEN CARD FILED UNDER SEAL)(pag, ) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Mogbo re 51 Motion to Dismiss. (Witherspoon, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss by Mogbo. (Witherspoon, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ann Witherspoon on behalf of Mogbo (Witherspoon, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Roland Anderson, Blankenship, Sandra Ferrell. (Witherspoon, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 47 Order (bkp, ) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for deft Dr. Mogbo at his last known private address and the U.S. Marshal is to serve the summons, the complaint, the amended complaint, the second amended complaint and this order upon him without prepayment of fees; Dr. Mogbo's address should be redacted from any public portion of this file; plaintiff shall, within 60 days of the entry date of this Order, file a motion for service that provides a valid service address for deft Rebecca Anderson. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/26/06. (bkp, ) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 20 Court's Order of February 27, 2006 filed by Roland Anderson, Blankenship, Sandra Ferrell. (ADDRESS FILED UNDER SEAL PER COURT'S ORDER) (pag, )(copy mailed) Modified on 4/20/2006 to change file date(pag, ). (Entered: 04/20/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ronald S Collier. (pag, )(copy mailed) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER directing plaintiff to file, within 30 days of the entry of this Order, a response to 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by defendants . Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/11/06. (bkp, ) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Roland Anderson, Blankenship, Sandra Ferrell re 42 Motion to Dismiss. (Witherspoon, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss by Roland Anderson, Blankenship, Sandra Ferrell. (Witherspoon, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ann Witherspoon on behalf of Roland Anderson, Blankenship, Sandra Ferrell (Witherspoon, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Mogbo. (pag, ) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Rebecca Anderson. (pag, ) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Blankenship served on 3/20/2006, answer due 4/10/2006. (pag, ) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Roland Anderson served on 3/20/2006, answer due 4/10/2006. (pag, ) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Sandra Ferrell served on 3/20/2006, answer due 4/10/2006. (pag, ) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 34 Order(bkp, ) (Entered: 03/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 29 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/21/06. (bkp, ) (Entered: 03/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Max Mobley, John Lowe, Rick L Toney re 32 Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Weems, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Hearing filed by Max Mobley, John Lowe, Rick L Toney. (Weems, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by John Lowe, Rick L Toney.(Weems, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Allen Weems on behalf of John Lowe, Rick L Toney (Weems, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Hearing on TRO filed by Ronald S Collier. (pag, )(copy mailed) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon John Lowe served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/27/2006. (pag, ) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Rick L Toney served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/27/2006. (pag, ) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 25 Order (bkp, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 24 Motion to File a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/9/06. (bkp, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint filed by Ronald S Collier. (pag, )(copy mailed) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants. (bkp) (Modified on 2/27/2006 - (DUPLICATE of Entry #22) (bfw). (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rebecca Anderson, Roland Anderson, Blankenship, Sandra Ferrell, John Lowe, Mogbo, and Rick L Toney filed by Ronald S Collier.(bfw) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 20 Order (bkp, ) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct and directing Clerk to file the Motion to Amend as Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and to replace the John Doe defts with those listed in plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; then to prepare summons on those defts and for the Marshal to serve through Humphries and Lewis Law Firm or through the ADC Compliance Division without costs. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/27/06. (bkp, ) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Complaint 2 and Amended Complaint 6 by Max Mobley.(Weems, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Amend 2 Complaint filed by Ronald S Collier. (ade)(Copy mailed to plaintiff) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Allen Weems on behalf of Max Mobley (Weems, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Max Mobley served on 2/6/2006, answer due 2/27/2006. (pag, ) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 14 Order on Partial Report and Recommendations (bsm ) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Adopting in Part Partial Report and Recommendation 9 ; Court adopts the portion of the PRD dismissing the ADC and CMS with prejudice and the Clerk is directed to prepare summons for deft Max Mabley; U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complt, the amended complt and this Order w/out prepayment of fees and costs or security; pltf is ordered to file w/in 120 days of the entry of this Order, a Statement containing the full names and service addresses for the ADC and CMS John Doe defts named in this action; Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 2/3/06. Text modified on 2/3/2006 (bsm ). (Entered: 02/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 12 Order on Motion for Copies (bkp, ) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Copies and directing the Clerk to mail plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/30/05. (bkp, ) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Copy of updated docket sheet, and status of this cause of action, by Ronald S Collier. (jct) (copy mailed to plaintiff) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (bkp, ) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 Amended Complaint and 2 Complaint filed by Ronald S Collier, Objections to R&R due by 1/9/2006. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/27/05. (bkp, ) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 7 Order. (mkf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER directing the Clerk to add unknown John Doe employees of ADC, and Max Mobley, Assistant Director of ADC, pursuant to 6 Amended Complaint filed 10/28/05 by Ronald S Collier. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/22/05. (mkf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arkansas Department of Correction and Correctional Medical Services, Inc.filed by Ronald S Collier.(ade, )(Copy mailed to plaintiff) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 4 Order (bkp, ) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing the Director of the ADC to collect an initial partial filing fee of $5.66 from plaintiff's prison trust account with monthly payments equal to 20% of the preceding month's income credited to the account each time the balance exceeds $10 until the fee is paid in full; Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden, Jefferson County Jail Facility, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Banking Office and the ADC Compliance Office; plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/18/05. (bkp, ) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ronald S Collier. (pag, ) (copy mailed) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against all defendants , filed by Ronald S Collier.(pag, )(copy mailed) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald S Collier. (pag, )(copy mailed) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 18 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?