Gentile et al v. Taylor et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Southern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00141
District Judge Lisa G. Wood, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 7, 2017 at 12:42 AM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alda Gentile, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edmond & Lindsay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Atkins +1 404 525 1080 batkins@edmondfirm.com
No Logo Cody A. White, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edmond & Lindsay, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Atkins +1 404 525 1080 batkins@edmondfirm.com
v.
No Logo Blake Taylor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dept. of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
Individually 
TERMINATED: 02/04/2015 Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
No Logo Cedric L. Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 305

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garret W. Meader +1 912 280 9662 +1 912 267 0654 gmeader@deflaw.com
No Logo Will Woolard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 305

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garret W. Meader +1 912 280 9662 +1 912 267 0654 gmeader@deflaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Approving 24 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice filed by Will Woolard and Cedric L. Brown. The Clerk is ordered to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/11/2015. (csr) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cedric L. Brown, Will Woolard. (Meader, Garret) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Counsel for the parties is directed to show cause in writing within fourteen (14) days from receipt of this Order why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution or why the Answer of the Defendants should not be stricken due to the failure to timely file the Rule 26(f) report. Show Cause Response due by 5/27/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/13/15. (slt) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice all claims against Defendant Blake Taylor. All other claims remains. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 2/4/2015. (csr) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Blake Taylor by Alda Gentile. Responses due by 2/19/2015. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay discovery until such time as the motion to dismiss is ruled upon by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 1/21/15. (slt) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Stay Discovery by Blake Taylor. Responses due by 1/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Briefs)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Dismiss by Blake Taylor. Responses due by 1/15/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Briefs)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Filing by Blake Taylor (Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Blake Taylor answer due 12/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/12/2014. (csr) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Blake Taylor. Responses due by 12/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Cedric L. Brown, Will Woolard. (Meader, Garret) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to Complaint by Cedric L. Brown, Will Woolard.(Meader, Garret) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER granting 10 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time to file Answer; Cedric L. Brown answer due 10/29/2014; Will Woolard answer due 10/29/2014. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/14/2014. (csr) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Taylor shall have an additional sixty days, up to and including December 15, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/14/2014. (csr) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Consent MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, filed by Cedric L. Brown, and Will Woolard. Responses due by 10/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meader, Garret). Modified on 10/14/2014. (csr) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Blake Taylor. Responses due by 10/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Will Woolard on 09/24/14, filed by Alda Gentile. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Blake Taylor on 09/19/14, filed by Alda Gentile. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Cedric Brown on 09/24/14, filed by Alda Gentile. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Alda Gentile. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Deficiency Notice re: 1 Complaint - Disclosure Statement has not been filed. (csr) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Summons Issued as to Blake Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued as to Cedric Brown, # 2 Summons Issued as to Will Woolard). (csr) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                GENERAL ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/16/2014. (csr) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alda Gentile, Cody A. White. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-1665688. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Space Space

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?