District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  1. Case No. 17-1904
    Filed 4/13/2017
  2. Case No. 17-2130
    Filed 6/6/2017
  3. Case No. 17-2235
    Filed 6/27/2017
  4. Case No. 17-2253
    Filed 6/30/2017
United States Supreme Court

Waymo LLC v. Otto Trucking LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 17-2253

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 30, 2017 at 1:18 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Otto Trucking Llc, Defendant
No Logo Ottomotto LLC, Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc. Uber Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Levandowski, Anthony, Intervenor - Appellant
Officially listed as "Anthony Levandowski"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey & Ehrlich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ismail Jomo Ramsey +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 548 3601 izzy@ramsey-ehrlich.com
Waymo LLC Waymo LLC, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Case Type Civil Private
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=3:17-cv-00939-WHA
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=3:17-cv-00939-WHA
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Official caption revised to correct party designation. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [454100] [17-2235, 17-2253]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301032489 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER filed. The motion to file a corrected appendix to the opening brief [447488-2] is granted. Mr. Levandowski
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER filed. The motion to file a corrected appendix to the opening brief [447488-2] is granted. Mr. Levandowski’s corrected confidential and non-confidential versions of the appendix to the opening brief are accepted for filing. The motion to file a nonconforming appendix to the reply brief [447489-2] is granted to the extent that the appendix will be accepted as filed. No later than July 21, 2017, Waymo is directed to provide this court with a copy of the sealed version of the district court order for in camera review. Any further action will be considered separately, at the request of any party or the intervenor. (Per Curiam). Service: 07/20/2017 by clerk. [447925] [17-2235, 17-2253]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CORRECTED certificate of service for motion for emergency stay pending appeal, Doc No. [3], motion to consolidate appeals, Doc No. [3]. Service: 07/05/2017 by email. [444232]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301024444 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CORRECTED certificate of service for motion for emergency stay pending appeal, Doc No. [3], motion to consolidate appeals, Doc No. [3]. Service: 07/05/2017 by email. [444232]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: response Docket No. [9], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [8], attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [7], ERROR: documents are submitted in the trailer case. CORRECTION: No action needed. Documents have been filed in the lead appeal (17-2235). THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [444223]
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301023946 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [3] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-2253 , motion to consolidate appeals [3] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-2253. Service: 07/03/2017 by email. [443990]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301023943 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Entry of appearance for David Perlson as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/03/2017 by email. [443989]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [3] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-2253 , motion to consolidate appeals [3] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-2253. Service: 07/03/2017 by email. [443990]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301023940 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Entry of appearance for Charles Verhoeven as principal counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/03/2017 by email. [443988]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Entry of appearance for David Perlson as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/03/2017 by email. [443989]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Note to file: The following cases are consolidated: 17-2235 (Lead) with 17-2253 (Member). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [443727] [17-2235, 17-2253]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Entry of appearance for Charles Verhoeven as principal counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 07/03/2017 by email. [443988]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301023214 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER filed. The motion to consolidate appeals 2017-2235 and 2017-2253 [3] is granted. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Mr. Levandowski is directed to file only one opening brief/petition for a writ of mandamus. The briefing schedule set forth in this court
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER filed. The motion to consolidate appeals 2017-2235 and 2017-2253 [3] is granted. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Mr. Levandowski is directed to file only one opening brief/petition for a writ of mandamus. The briefing schedule set forth in this court’s June 29, 2017 order in 2017-2235 shall remain in effect.; Waymo LLC is directed to file a single response to the motions for a stay and Mr. Levandowski is directed to file a single reply. The briefing schedule for the motion for a stay set forth in this court’s June 29, 2017 order in 2017-2235 shall remain in effect.; The district courts order requiring production of the records in question in 2017-2253 is temporarily stayed pending this courts consideration of the motions papers. (Per Curiam). Service: 06/30/2017 by clerk. [443621] [17-2253, 17-2235]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                This entry has been removed from the docket. Official caption revised. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [443593]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION of Appellant Anthony Levandowski for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8, to consolidate appeals (17-2235 17-2253). Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/30/2017 by email. [443552]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301023049 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION of Appellant Anthony Levandowski for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8, to consolidate appeals (17-2235 17-2253). Any response is due within 10 days of service [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/30/2017 by email. [443552]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Entry of appearance for Ismail Ramsey as principal counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 06/30/2017 by email. [443543]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301023023 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Entry of appearance for Ismail Ramsey as principal counsel for Appellant Anthony Levandowski. Service: 06/30/2017 by email. [443543]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Appeal docketed. Received: 06/30/2017. [443523]Entry of Appearance due 07/14/2017. Certificate of Interest due 07/14/2017. Docketing Statement due 07/14/2017. Appellant's brief due 08/29/2017.
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01301022986 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Appeal docketed. Received: 06/30/2017. [443523]
                                            Entry of Appearance due 07/14/2017. Certificate of Interest due 07/14/2017. Docketing Statement due 07/14/2017. Appellant's brief due 08/29/2017.
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?