Haseeb v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-02074

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 3, 2019 at 3:55 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cheryl L. Haseeb, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7426
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/22/2018, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Continuance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Continuance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Continuance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Continuance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Continuance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Substitution
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None answer to counterclaim
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Continuance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Initial Disclosures
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Amend
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference - FORM
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None order on motion for temporary restraining order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: 9/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER, filed.(Matta, Derek)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 15 Motion for Continuance. Injunction Hearing reset for 9/29/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        STIPULATION re: allowing deposition of Umer Haseeb before the Rule 26(f) conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          OBJECTIONS to Amended Motion to Continue Hearing from Sept 1st to September 29th, filed by Cheryl L. Haseeb. (Matta, Derek) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Opposed AMENDED 15 MOTION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Continuance of Hearing from September 1st to September 29th by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/14/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                DECLARATION of Christopher Fletcher re: 13 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed.(Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition to 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Maragani, Goud) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 8/7/2017.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maragani, Goud)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cheryl L. Haseeb, filed.(Matta, Derek)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Injunction Hearing set for 9/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE of Setting parties notified. Injunction Hearing reset for 8/25/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. 7 Stipulation. (ledwards, 4)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              STIPULATION re: to Continue Hearing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Maragani, Goud)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Miscellaneous Hearing set for 7/14/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(LaurenWebsteradi, 4)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Civil Cover Sheet by Cheryl L. Haseeb, filed.(Matta, Derek)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Cheryl L. Haseeb, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/27/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Injunction)(Matta, Derek)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Request for Issuance of Summons as to Cheryl L. Haseeb, filed.(Matta, Derek)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-18608642) filed by Cheryl L. Haseeb. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notices of Levy, # 2 Exhibit Premarital Agreement, # 3 Exhibit Notices of Levy, # 4 Exhibit Bank Signature Card, # 5 Exhibit Bank Records, # 6 Exhibit Bank Records, # 7 Exhibit Bank Records)(Matta, Derek)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?