Ronald Sayles v. Advanced Recovery Systems, Inc
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 16-60640

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 8:53 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504061068 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [16-60640] (EAB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504061046 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [16-60640 Affirmed] Judge: JES, Judge: ECP, Judge: JEG. Mandate pull date is 07/27/2017 [16-60640] (EAB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503971263 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated Date of Service: 04/27/2017 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Melendez; Attorney for Appellant: Westbrook; Attorney for Appellee: Sheffield [16-60640] (William V. Westbrook III)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503910283 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 05/01/2017. [16-60640] (PFT)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503867612 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated. # of Copies Provided: 0. Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/13/2017, for Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated. [16-60640] (DLJ)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503867603 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CLERK ORDER granting opposed motion to file appellant's reply brief out of time, filed by Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated [8417376-2]. [16-60640] (DLJ)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503862445 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated for leave to file reply brief out of time [8417376-2] - Brief Tendered? Yes. Date of service: 02/03/2017 [16-60640] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated for leave to file brief out of time [8417376-2] - Brief Tendered? Yes. Date of service: 02/03/2017 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Melendez; Attorney for Appellant: Westbrook; Attorney for Appellee: Sheffield [16-60640] (William V. Westbrook III)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504061068 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [16-60640] (EAB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00504061046 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [16-60640 Affirmed] Judge: JES, Judge: ECP, Judge: JEG. Mandate pull date is 07/27/2017 [16-60640] (EAB)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503971263 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated Date of Service: 04/27/2017 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Melendez; Attorney for Appellant: Westbrook; Attorney for Appellee: Sheffield [16-60640] (William V. Westbrook III)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503910283 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 05/01/2017. [16-60640] (PFT)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503867612 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated. # of Copies Provided: 0. Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/13/2017, for Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated. [16-60640] (DLJ)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503867603 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CLERK ORDER granting opposed motion to file appellant's reply brief out of time, filed by Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated [8417376-2]. [16-60640] (DLJ)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503862445 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated for leave to file reply brief out of time [8417376-2] - Brief Tendered? Yes. Date of service: 02/03/2017 [16-60640] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Advanced Recovery Systems, Incorporated for leave to file brief out of time [8417376-2] - Brief Tendered? Yes. Date of service: 02/03/2017 via email - Attorney for Amicus Curiae: Melendez; Attorney for Appellant: Westbrook; Attorney for Appellee: Sheffield [16-60640] (William V. Westbrook III)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 33 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?