Smith v. McKesson et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Middle District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00429

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 27, 2017 at 3:35 PM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Doe Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grodner and Associates, APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Unkel Grodner +1 225 769 1919 dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 920

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise Ann Vinet +1 225 292 7410 + 225 292 4149 denise@vinetlaw.com
v.
No Logo Black Lives Matter, Defendant
No Logo Alicia Garza, Defendant
No Logo Black Lives Matter Network, Inc., Defendant
McKesson, DeRay McKesson, DeRay, Defendant
Officially listed as "DeRay McKesson"
No Logo Johnetta Elzie, Defendant
No Logo Opal Tometi, Defendant
No Logo Patrisse Cullors, Defendant
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Expedited Hearing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Expedited Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File a Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response to a Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 9/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/10/2017. (JSL) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Johnetta Elzie answer due 9/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/10/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer DeRay McKesson's answer due 9/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/10/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                EX Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to 1 Complaint by Johnetta Elzie. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibbens, William) Modified on 8/10/2017 to edit text (ELW). (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  EX Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to 1 Complaint by DeRay McKesson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibbens, William) Modified on 8/10/2017 to edit text (ELW). (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe Smith. #BlackLivesMatter served on 7/24/2017, answer due 8/14/2017; Black Lives Matter served on 7/24/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SEALED Supplement to 2 MOTION to proceed under Fictitious Names filed by Plaintiffs. (LLH) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File A Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying 21 MOTION for Denise A. Vinet to Withdraw as Attorney and Re-Enroll under new contact info. In accordance with the Court's Administrative Procedures for Filing Electronic Documents, an attorney whose e-mail address, mailing address, telephone or FAX number has changed shall timely file a notice of that change and serve a copy of the notice on all parties in actions in which they are involved. Additionally, any ECF Filer must also update his or her user account in the System. This update must be effected prior to the electronic filing of the Notice of Change of Address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/10/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting 17 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Doc. 2 with R. Doc. 17-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/7/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested a duplication of a summons for Johnetta Elzie. The summons for Ms. Elzie is doc. no. 9 which was already issued. (EDC) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: # 1 summons, # 2 summons, # 3 summons, # 4 summons, # 5 summons, # 6 summons, # 7 summons, # 8 summons)(EDC) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 14 Motion to Strike 3 MOTION for Leave of Rule 5 to File Sealed Supplement. The clerk's office is directed to strike R. Doc. 3 from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/7/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/7/2017) (EDC). Modified on 7/7/2017 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Summons Submitted (Grodner, Donna) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (Second)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief (First)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Complaint (Complete Case Opening First)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?