Thangsongcharoen v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00609

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2019 at 12:32 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FREEMAN LAW PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
No Logo Tony & Mii's Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FREEMAN LAW PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
No Logo Tony Thangsongcharoen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FREEMAN LAW PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Brent Freeman +1 214 984 3410 +1 214 984 3409 jason@freemanlaw-pllc.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Cutler Smith +1 214 880 9734 +1 202 307 0054 curtis.c.smith@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7426
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER re: the 41 Motion for Sanctions for Mr. Smith's and Ms. Yepuri's Knowingly False Misrepresentations to the Court; and the 43 United States' Amended Emergency Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 (c) and Brief. Based on the filing of the amended motion, the United States' Emergency Motion for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) and Brief, filed 12/7/2018 (doc. 38 ) is DEEMED MOOT. Counsel for the parties to the dispute are hereby ORDERED to meet face-to-face to fully confer on each of the items in dispute. Agreed proposed order or joint submission due by 12/24/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/12/2018) (mcrd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion re: 43 Amended MOTION for Protective Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/11/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Amended Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by United States with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 to United States' Amended Emergency Motion) (Yepuri, Moha) Modified text on 12/11/2018 (ykp). (Entered: 12/10/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion re: 41 MOTION for Sanctions for Mr. Smith's and Ms. Yepuri's Knowingly False Misrepresentations to the Court. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/10/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Sanctions for Mr. Smith's and Ms. Yepuri's Knowingly False Misrepresentations to the Court filed by Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Tony Thangsongcharoen, Tony & Mii's Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C) (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER re: 38 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. The five depositions that are the subject of the above-referenced motion is hereby STAYED pending further order of this Court. The respondent may file a response and brief containing citations to relevant authorities1 no later than 12/17/2018. The movant may not file a reply. An oral argument is set for 12/19/2018 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1566, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/7/2018) (axm) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion re: 38 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/7/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by United States with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 to United States' Emergency Motion) (Yepuri, Moha) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Moha Yepuri on behalf of United States. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Yepuri, Moha) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Order on Stipulated Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and for Continuance of Trial Setting : The trial date is set for this Court's four-week docket beginning 6/3/2019 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Motions due by 3/5/2019. Discovery due by 2/5/2019. Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 5/20/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/9/2018) (ykp) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION Stipulated Motion for Second Modification of Scheduling Order and Continuance of Trial Setting re 25 Scheduling Order filed by United States (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: 6. Prv Fee: $ $3298.75. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Coffin, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 32 Unopposed motion for relief from Order Requiring an Executive Officer with Full Settlement Authority to Personally Attend the Court-Ordered Mediation. The mediation will be attended by the United States as represented in the United States motion. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/19/2018) (svc) Modified file date on 10/19/2018 (svc). (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER REQUIRING AN EXECUTIVE OFFICER WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY PERSONALLY ATTEND THE COURT-ORDERED MEDIATION re 27 Order Referring Case to ADR, filed by United States with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 30 Stipulated Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. The deadline for Designation of Experts by Plaintiffs is now on or before September 14, 2018, and Designation of Experts by Defendant is now on or before October 19, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/11/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Stipulated MOTION for Modification of Scheduling Order by United States. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Curtis) Modified event on 9/11/2018 (rekc). (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Proof of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action serving Mitchell Terry on 7/18/2018. (ran) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Return of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action serving Interstate Business Management on 7/19/2018. (ran) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints David Brandon Coffin as mediator. Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/2/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/17/2018) (rekc) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Selection of Mediator filed by Tony & Mii's Inc. (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning 4/1/2019 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 7/5/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2018. Motions due by 1/2/2019. Discovery due by 12/3/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/2/2018. Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 3/18/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/9/2018) (zkc) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Joint STATUS REPORT for Plaintiffs and United States filed by Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Tony Thangsongcharoen, Tony & Mii's Inc. (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/16/2018) (axm) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 13 Motion to Strike. The Defendant is correct that under the causes of action presently before the Court in this case, Plaintiffs are not entitled to a jury trial. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/2/2018) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint,, filed by United States. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United States filed by Tony Thangsongcharoen, Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Tony & Mii's Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Memorandum Opinion and Order GRANTS in part and DENIES in part 14 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than Friday, 12/22/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/28/2017) (epm)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY filed by United States re: 13 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY filed by United States re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE filed by Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Tony Thangsongcharoen, Tony & Mii's Inc re: 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 05/20/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESPONSE filed by Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Tony Thangsongcharoen, Tony & Mii's Inc re: 13 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 05/20/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by United States with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States. (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by United States. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Curtis C Smith added to party United States(pty:dft) (Smith, Curtis) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Proof of Service for Summons served on Honorable John Koskinen on 3/3/2017. (Freeman, Jason) Modified event text on 4/10/2017 (axm). (Entered: 04/09/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Proof of Service for Summons served on Honorable Jeffrey Session on 3/3/2017. (Freeman, Jason) Modified event text on 4/10/2017 (axm). (Entered: 04/09/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States; served on 3/2/2017. (epm) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/3/2017) (chmb) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to 1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Tony Thangsongcharoen, Tony & Mii's Inc. (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Summons issued as to United States, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (axm) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Tony Thangsongcharoen, Tony & Mii's, Inc. (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tony & Mii's Inc. (Freeman, Jason) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/2/2017 to flatten pdf) (axm). (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United States filed by Tony Thangsongcharoen, Somnuek Thangsongcharoen, Tony & Mii's Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8246531) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B) (Freeman, Jason) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?