J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. DA Garcia, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 7:17-cv-00268

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 26, 2019 at 3:09 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Costs
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
        OPINION re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(BelindaSaenz, 7)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Show Cause
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2017, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference - FORM
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?