J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Melida's Restaurant & Bar, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-02108

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2019 at 3:49 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 16 Motion for Default Judgment(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Dismissal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Judge Ellison
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Continuance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Continuance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference - FORM
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?