Shinu Gupta v. Snap Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-05054

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2018 at 2:39 PM ST (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shinu Gupta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard William Gonnello +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 rgonnello@faruqilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Heikali +1 424 256 2884 +1 424 256 2885 Bheikali@faruqilaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherief Morsy +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 smorsy@faruqilaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A Rohr +1 424 256 2884 +1 424 256 2885 brohr@faruqilaw.com
v.
No Logo Allen & Company Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew William Close +1 213 430 6000 mclose@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker, Zachary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Rosenberg +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 jrosenberg@omm.com
No Logo Andrew Vollero, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Takamizawa, Yukio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Boris Feldman +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 boris.feldman@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ignacio Evaristo Salceda +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 isalceda@wsgr.com
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew William Close +1 213 430 6000 mclose@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker, Zachary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Rosenberg +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 jrosenberg@omm.com
No Logo BTIG, LLC, Defendant
No Logo C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Connaught UK Limited, Defendant
No Logo Cowen And Company, Llc, Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew William Close +1 213 430 6000 mclose@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker, Zachary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Rosenberg +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 jrosenberg@omm.com
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew William Close +1 213 430 6000 mclose@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker, Zachary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Rosenberg +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 jrosenberg@omm.com
No Logo Evan Spiegel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Takamizawa, Yukio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Boris Feldman +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 boris.feldman@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ignacio Evaristo Salceda +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 isalceda@wsgr.com
No Logo Evercore Group LLC, Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman, Sachs and Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew William Close +1 213 430 6000 mclose@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker, Zachary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Rosenberg +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 jrosenberg@omm.com
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew William Close +1 213 430 6000 mclose@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker, Zachary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Rosenberg +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 jrosenberg@omm.com
No Logo Jefferies Llc, Defendant
Officer/Director, Mikohn Gaming Corp
Officer/Director, Jefferies & Co Inc
Officer/Director, Jef Holding Co Inc
Officer/Director, Easterly Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Leucadia National Corp
Officer/Director, Iporussia Inc
Officer/Director, Live Oak Acquisition Corp
No Logo JMP Securities, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Liontree Advisors LLC, Defendant
No Logo Luma Securities LLC, Defendant
No Logo Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew William Close +1 213 430 6000 mclose@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitaker, Zachary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Rosenberg +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 jrosenberg@omm.com
No Logo Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Defendant
RBC Capital Markets, LLC RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Samuel A. Ramirez and Co. Inc, Defendant
No Logo Snap, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Takamizawa, Yukio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Boris Feldman +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 boris.feldman@wsgr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ignacio Evaristo Salceda +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 isalceda@wsgr.com
No Logo Stifel Financial Corp., Defendant
Officer/Director, Carlyle Gms Finance, Inc.
No Logo Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Defendant
UBS Securities LLC UBS Securities LLC, Defendant
No Logo William Blair And Company, LLC, Defendant
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS 19 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: I. CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the above-captioned actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes into one action (the "Consolidated Action"). 2. The Master File and Master Docket for the Consolidated Action shall be No. 2:17-cv-03679. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MINUTES OF Motion in 5054: 11 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Notice of Shinu Gupta's Motionfor (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of Lead Counsel filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta Hearing held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The motions are submitted. Order to issue. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 51 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT IN HSIEH 1 23 AND RESCHEDULING HEARING FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR ERICKSON AND GUPTA 11 15 19 21 25 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Notice of Shinu Gupta's Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of Lead Counsel 11 . With regard to the Erickson and Gupta actions, the Court does have federal question jurisdiction over the subject matter because Plaintiffs filed the initial claims in federal court. The Court DISCHARGES the order to show cause with respect to the two actions and reschedules the hearing for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel to Monday, September 11, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. 2:17-cv-03679-SVW-AGR Dkts. 11, 15, 19, 21, and 25. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Notice of Shinu Gupta's Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of Lead Counsel 11 - Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/30/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Shinu Guptato Order to Show Cause,,, 47 (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. On the Court's own motion, the Court vacates the hearing on the motion for appointment of counsel 11 , previously scheduled for 8/21/2017 at 1:30 p.m. No appearance is necessary. The motion will be rescheduled after plaintiffs respond to the order to show cause. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JURISDICTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Pursuant to the Court's recent ruling in Bucks County Employees Retirement Fund v. Nanthealth, Inc. et al, 2:17-cv-03964, (C.D. Cal. August 18, 2017) (Order Granding Mot. To Remand August 18, 2017), the Court questions whether it has subject-matter jurisdiction over this matter or any related matters. The Court orders Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE and clearly articulate how this Court has jurisdiction. Plaintiffs have 7 days to comply with this order and set forth reasons why this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction of these cases in light of the Bucks order. No hearing is scheduled for this order. If Plaintiffs fail to timely respond to this order, the case will be dismissed. (smo) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting 45 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan Rosenberg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC; Goldman, Sachs & Co.; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Barclays Capital Inc.; Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC; and Allen & Company LLC., designating Matthew W. Close as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman, Sachs and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20330319) filed by Defendant Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman, S achs and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley and Co LLC, identifying Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Morgan Stanley and Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Goldman, Sachs and Co., identifying The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., identifying DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, DB USA Corporation and Deutsche Bank A.G.. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, identifying Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Guernsey Branch and Credit Suisse AG. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Barclays Capital Inc., identifying Barclays Group US Inc., Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays PLC. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allen and Company LLC, identifying Allen Operations LLC and Allen Holding Inc.. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. (Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew W Close on behalf of Defendants Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman, Sachs and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co LLC (Attorney Matthew W Close added to party Allen and Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Close added to party Barclays Capital Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Close added to party Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Close added to party Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Close added to party Goldman, Sachs and Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Close added to party J.P. Morgan Securities LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew W Close added to party Morgan Stanley and Co LLC(pty:dft))(Close, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Benjamin Heikali on behalf of Plaintiff Shinu Gupta (Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Shinu Gupta(pty:pla))(Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, Notice of Shinu Gupta's Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of Lead Counsel 11 - Hearing on the motion previously scheduled for 08/14/2017 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled to 8/21/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 25 . No Defendant shall have any obligation to respond to the complaint in this action until an agreed-upon date after the appointment of a lead plaintiff, selection of lead counsel, and filing of a consolidated amended complaint. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Allen and Company LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Close. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Barclays Capital Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Close. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Close. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Close. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon J.P. Morgan Securities LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Close. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Goldman, Sachs and Co. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Close. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Morgan Stanley and Co LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/1/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew Close. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants Snap Inc, Evan Spiegel, Andrew Vollero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Boris) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to defendants Allen and Company LLC, BTIG, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Connaught UK Limited, Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Evercore Group, LLC, Goldman, Sachs and Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Liontree Advisors LLC, Luma Securities LLC, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Morgan Stanley and Co LLC, Oppenheimer and Co. Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez and Co. Inc, Snap Inc, Stifel Financial Corp., Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., UBS Securities LLC, William Blair and Company LLC. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Andrew Vollero waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/21/2017, answer due 9/19/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Ignacio E. Salceda. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Evan Spiegel waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/21/2017, answer due 9/19/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Ignacio E. Salceda. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. upon Snap Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/21/2017, answer due 9/19/2017. Waiver of Service signed by Ignacio E. Salceda. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Snap Inc, Evan Spiegel, Andrew Vollero, identifying A.F. Beazley, Tokio Marine HCC, American International Group, Inc., Allied World Assurance Company, Inc., Berkley Professional Liability, RLI Insurance Company, Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Co. (SOMPO Holdings, Inc.), Lloyd's of London Insurers, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, and AXIS Insurance Company. (Feldman, Boris) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ignacio E Salceda on behalf of Defendants Snap Inc, Evan Spiegel, Andrew Vollero (Attorney Ignacio E Salceda added to party Snap Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ignacio E Salceda added to party Evan Spiegel(pty:dft), Attorney Ignacio E Salceda added to party Andrew Vollero(pty:dft))(Salceda, Ignacio) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Boris Feldman on behalf of Defendants Snap Inc, Evan Spiegel, Andrew Vollero (Attorney Boris Feldman added to party Snap Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Boris Feldman added to party Evan Spiegel(pty:dft), Attorney Boris Feldman added to party Andrew Vollero(pty:dft))(Feldman, Boris) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE re: MOTION for Appointment of Counsel; Notice of Shinu Gupta's Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of Lead Counsel 11 - Hearing on the Motion is reset to 8/14/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Appointment of Counsel
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Notice of Shinu Gupta's Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and (2) Approval of Lead Counsel filed by plaintiff Shinu Gupta. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Barbara A. Rohr, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Proposed Order) (Rohr, Barbara) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sherief Morsy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard W Gonnello. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Shinu Gupta. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-03679-SVW, 2:17-cv-04403-SVW (Rohr, Barbara) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shinu Gupta, (Rohr, Barbara) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20153589 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Shinu Gupta. (Attorney Barbara A Rohr added to party Shinu Gupta(pty:pla))(Rohr, Barbara) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?