Martin v. Colgan Air, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-06927
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 11:51 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John A Martin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Timothy Green +1 212 687 8181 +1 212 972 9432 JGreen@kreindler.com
Space James P. Kreindler +1 212 973 3449 +1 212 972 9432 jkreindler@kreindler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
Space Robert Turner Haefele +1 843 216 9184 +1 843 216 9450 rhaefele@motleyrice.com
No Logo PAUL R MARTIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Timothy Green +1 212 687 8181 +1 212 972 9432 JGreen@kreindler.com
Space James P. Kreindler +1 212 973 3449 +1 212 972 9432 jkreindler@kreindler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
Space Robert Turner Haefele +1 843 216 9184 +1 843 216 9450 rhaefele@motleyrice.com
v.
No Logo Alaska Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Britnee Marie Reamy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Britnee Marie Reamy

Toggle Switch Represented by Casey Lee Griffith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Casey Lee Griffith

Toggle Switch Represented by Coddington, Hicks, & Danforth, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Richard Grotch +1 650 592 5400 rgrotch@chdlawyers.com
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Jonathan Charles Harriman +1 650 592 5400 +1 650 592 5027 JHarriman@CHDLawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Darin Michael Klemchuk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Darin Michael Klemchuk

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Harry James Franklyn Korrell, III +1 206 622 3150 harrykorrell@dwt.com
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Rebecca Meissner +1 206 757 8159 +1 206 757 7700 rebeccameissner@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Clement S. Roberts

Toggle Switch Represented by Eugene Novikov

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Eugene Novikov

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly James Kubasta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Kelly James Kubasta

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby Blair Drake

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Kirby Blair Drake

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Ryan P McBride +1 206 223 7000 mcbrider@lanepowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark A. Lemley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Mark A. Lemley

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Travis Crum +1 202 263 3365 tcrum@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neil J. McNabnay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Alaska Corporation
TERMINATED: 09/30/2004 Neil J. McNabnay
No Logo America West Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
A Delaware Corporation
TERMINATED: 07/10/2006 GEORGE S. KOLBE +1 212 759 7466 gkolbe@ravenkolbe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Gavalas & Fromm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
A Delaware Corporation
TERMINATED: 07/10/2006 Robert J.. Brown +1 212 983 8500 +1 212 983 5946 rjb@browngavalas.com
No Logo American Eagle Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brickell Bay View Centre

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Mark Palmer +1 305 358 5577 +1 305 371 7580 gpalmer@rumberger.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PAUL HASTINGS LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Gallagher +1 202 551 1712 +1 202 508 9700 jackgallagher@paulhastings.com
Space Intra Laura Germanis +1 202 551 1761 +1 202 551 1705 intragermanis@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WALLER LANSDEN DORTCH & DAVIS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Park +1 615 244 6380 +1 615 726 5417 john.park@wallerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WALLER LANSDEN DORTCH & DAVIS, LLP - Nashville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Waverly David Crenshaw, Jr. +1 615 244 6380 +1 615 244 6804 wcrenshaw@wallerlaw.com
No Logo Atlantic Coast Airlines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004

doing business asUnited Express
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004
doing business asDelta Connection
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004 GEORGE S. KOLBE +1 212 759 7466 gkolbe@ravenkolbe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Gavalas & Fromm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004

doing business asUnited Express
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004
doing business asDelta Connection
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004 Robert J.. Brown +1 212 983 8500 +1 212 983 5946 rjb@browngavalas.com
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price & Axelrod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 Jeffrey Wayne Gutchess +1 305 350 7311 +1 305 351 2131 margote@bilzin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 Brian V Otero +1 212 309 1020 +1 212 309 1870 botero@hunton.com
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 Michelle R. Parker +1 212 309 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Marin Goodman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 Alyson M. Sciacca +1 212 661 1151

Toggle Switch Represented by Marin Goodman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/18/2017 Russell S. Jamison +1 212 661 1151 +1 212 661 1141 rjamison@maringoodman.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ansa Assuncao LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Michael J. O'Neill +1 267 528 0750 michael.oneill@ansalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Co, Roseland Property

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Damian Schaible +1 212 450 4580 +1 212 450 3580

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Jonathan E. DeMay +1 212 894 6816 +1 212 370 4483 jdemay@condonlaw.com
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Marissa N. Lefland +1 212 490 9100 +1 212 370 4453 mlefland@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Connell Foley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro JEFFREY W. MORYAN +1 973 535 0500 jmoryan@connellfoley.com
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Camille V. Otero +1 212 262 2390

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Marshall Scott Huebner +1 212 450 4099 +1 212 450 3099 marshall.huebner@davispolk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Alan D. Reitzfeld +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 alan.reitzfeld@hklaw.com
One Commerce Square
40 S. Main St.
13th Floor
Memphis, TN 38103
SHELBY-TN
Tax ID / EIN: 54-1397506dba PinnPro Christine Tramontano +1 212 513 3598 +1 212 385 9010 christine.tramontano@hklaw.com
No Logo Continental Airlines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard T Stilwell +1 713 646 1378 +1 713 751 1717 tstilwell@bakerlaw.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Lee Allen +1 650 838 2000 +1 650 838 2001 randall.allen@alston.com
Space Nowell Donald Berreth +1 404 881 4481 +1 404 253 8489 nberreth@alston.com
Space Gregory B. Mauldin +1 404 881 4823 +1 404 253 8223 greg.mauldin@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Banker Lopez Gassler (Tampa)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LOUIS ROBERT BOURGEOIS +1 813 222 1150 +1 850 222 3066 bbourgeois@bankerlopez.com
Space Richard K. Bowers, Jr. +1 813 222 1151 +1 813 229 8313 rbowers@bankerlopez.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Peter Denvir, III +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 jdenvir@bsfllp.com
Space Scott E Gant +1 202 895 7566 +2376 237 237 6131 sgant@bsfllp.com
Space Michael S. Mitchell +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 mmitchell@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Irving McClammy +1 212 450 4584 +1 212 450 3584 mcclammy@dpw.com
Space Benjamin A. Tisdell +1 212 450 4720 +1 212 450 3720 benjamin.tisdell@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HUGH ROBERT MCCULLOUGH +1 206 622 3150 +1 206 757 7189 hughmccullough@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Delta Airlines, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallagher Harnett & Lagalante LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Francis Gallagher +1 516 742 2500 +1 516 742 2516 JFGallagher@ggfc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S Shin +1 617 728 7133 +1 617 426 6567 michael.shin@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew A. Porter +1 617 367 0025 +1 617 367 2155 porterm@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christine A. Hopkinson +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 chopkinson@kslaw.com
Space David E. Meadows +1 404 572 2726 +1 404 572 5100 demeadows@kslaw.com
Space Catherine M. O'Neil +1 404 572 2704 coneil@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan P McBride +1 206 223 7000 mcbrider@lanepowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Travis Crum +1 202 263 3365 tcrum@mayerbrown.com
Space Andrew John Pincus +1 202 263 3220 +1 202 263 3300 apincus@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hanna Elizabeth Martin +1 212 309 6000 +1 212 309 6001 hanna.martin@morganlewis.com
Space Blair J. Robinson +1 215 963 5398 +1 215 963 5001 blair.robinson@morganlewis.com
Space Ira Rosenstein +1 212 309 6960 irosenstein@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger & Stone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Alexander Stone +1 404 815 1884 ben.stone@mungerandstone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PETKOFF AND FEIGELSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Glen Cossey +1 901 292 6452 +1 901 523 1061 dcossey@nstlaw.com
Space David I. Feigelson +1 901 523 1050 +1 901 523 1061 dfeigelson@pf-law.net
Space George S. Petkoff +1 901 523 1050 +1 901 523 1061 gpetkoff@pf-law.net

Toggle Switch Represented by UPSHAW, WILLIAMS, BIGGERS & BECKHAM, LLP - Greenwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Lee Kimmel +1 601 455 1613 rkimmel@upshawwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vaibhav P. Kadaba

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vaibhav P. Kadaba

Toggle Switch Represented by Walraven & Lehman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry A Walraven +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 lwalraven@calemployerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walraven & Westerfeld Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry A Walraven +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 lwalraven@calemployerlaw.com
Space Bryan Scott Westerfeld +1 949 215 1997 +1 949 215 1999 bwesterfeld@walravenlaw.com
Space Nicole Elizabeth Wurscher +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 new@walravenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by William Henry Boice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Henry Boice
No Logo Delta Connection, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frontier Airlines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenney & Barkowitz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004 Donald Browning MacDougall, Jr. +1 415 397 3170 dmacdougall@kennmark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenney & Markowitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004 Stephen Craig Kenney +1 415 397 3100 +1 415 397 3170 skenney@kennmark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2004 Patricia Ann Leid +1 305 446 2646 +4412 441 441 2374 leid@tdflaw.com
No Logo Globe Aviation Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Hirsch Connors & Bull PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Patrick Connors +1 212 527 1350 +1 212 527 1680 jconnors@jhcb.com
No Logo Heimann Systems Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Heimann Systems GmbH, Defendant
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo ICTS International, N.V., Defendant
No Logo In Vision Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Elizabeth Funk +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 junebug130@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrew Colin Mayo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Colin Mayo

Toggle Switch Represented by Armbrecht Jackson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wayne Martin, Jr. +1 251 405 1287 awm@ajlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Armbrecht Jackson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Robert Lancaster +1 251 405 1300 +1 251 432 6843 wrl@ajlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Juliet S Burgess +1 602 474 3618 +1 602 957 1801 jburgess@littler.com
Space Joanna Frances Sandolo +1 914 920 7400 +1 914 761 1900 jsandolo@denleacarton.com
Space Jack Strauch +1 336 837 1061 +1 336 725 8867 jstrauch@sgandm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BUCHALTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurent Richard George Badoux +1 480 383 1800 +1 480 824 9400 lbadoux@buchalter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Connolly Gallagher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry E. Gallagher, Jr. +1 302 888 6288 hgallagher@connollygallagher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AARON RICHARD KRAUSS +1 215 665 2000 +1 215 665 2013 akrauss@cozen.com
Space TAMAR S. WISE +1 215 665 5570 twise@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donald E. Tiller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald E. Tiller

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather Lynn Richardson +1 213 229 7409 +1 213 229 6409 hrichardson@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Erich Stuhlman +1 302 651 7578 stuhlmang@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Huie Fernambucq Stewart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip R Collins +1 205 251 1193 +1 205 251 1256 prc@hfsllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ginger Anders , +1 202 639 6070 ganders@jenner.com
Space Donald B Verrilli, Jr +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 dverrilli@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by John R. Emerson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Emerson

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Hirsch Connors & Bull PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALAN M. GELB +1 212 527 1000 +1 212 527 1680 agelb@jhcb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Cartier Godfrey +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 richard.godfrey@kirkland.com
Space J. Andrew Langan +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 andrew.langan@kirkland.com
Space Timothy Conrad Pickert +1 312 862 3787 +1 312 862 2200 tim.pickert@kirkland.com
Space Kristopher S. Ritter +1 312 469 7118 ritterk@kirkland.com
Space Kristopher Ritter +1 312 862 2000 kristopher.ritter@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lauren E. Maguire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren E. Maguire

Toggle Switch Represented by Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph L. Pellis, II +1 412 394 5411 jpellis@leechtishman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Edwin Hopkins +1 973 520 2366 +1 888 325 9057 joseph.hopkins@lockelord.com
Space Lisa Ann Ruggiero +1 973 525 2390 +1 888 325 9034 lisa.ruggiero@lockelord.com
Space James Edward Tyrrell, Jr. +1 973 520 2346 +1 888 325 9019 james.tyrrell@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matheson & Matheson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darrel Scott Jackson +1 480 889 8951 +1 480 339 4538 djackson@mathesonlegal.com
Space Michelle Ray Matheson +1 480 889 8951 +1 480 339 4538 mmatheson@mathesonlegal.com
Space Matthew Edward Walls +1 480 889 8957 +1 480 889 8952 mwalls@mathesonlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin G. Chew +1 202 663 8041 +1 202 663 8007 benjamin.chew@pillsburylaw.com
Space Nigel L. Wilkinson +1 202 663 8000 +1 202 663 8007 nigel.wilkinson@pillsburylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Kaplan +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 akaplan@proskauer.com
Space Steven Michael Kayman +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 skayman@proskauer.com
Space Kevin James Perra +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 kperra@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard D. Kirk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard D. Kirk

Toggle Switch Represented by Shealy, Crum & Pike, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steadman Stapleton Shealy, Jr. +1 334 677 3000 +1 334 677 0030 sshealy@scplaw.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Brenton Dwerlkotte +1 816 559 0353 dbdwerlkotte@shb.com
Space Joseph Michael Rebein +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 jrebein@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Kuster +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599
Space Howard J. Rubinroit +1 212 839 5300

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Summer Craig +1 212 455 2266 +1 212 455 2502 scraig@stblaw.com
Space Roy L. Reardon +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 rreardon@stblaw.com
Space Joseph Franklin Wayland +1 212 455 3203 +1 212 455 2502 jwayland@stblaw.com
Space David W. Woll +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 dwoll@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steven J. Balick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Balick

Toggle Switch Represented by Stranger & Arnold, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven E. Arnold +1 860 561 0650 +1 860 561 0646 sea@SAlaw.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abram B. Gregory +1 317 713 3577 +1 317 713 3699 abram.gregory@telamon.com
Space Richard A. Kempf +1 317 713 3500 +1 317 713 3699 rkempf@taftlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Travis E. DeArman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Travis E. DeArman
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems, Defendant
No Logo L3 Communications Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Connolly Gallagher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Henry E. Gallagher, Jr. +1 302 888 6288 hgallagher@connollygallagher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Gregory Erich Stuhlman +1 302 651 7578 stuhlmang@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Paul C. Curnin +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pcurnin@stblaw.com
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 David Elbaum +1 212 668 1900 +1 212 668 0315 david.elbaum@stblaw.com
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Michael John Garvey +1 212 455 7358 +1 212 455 2502 mgarvey@stblaw.com
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Nicholas Stoloff Goldin +1 212 637 2334 +1 212 637 2527 ngoldin@stblaw.com
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Joshua Mark Slocum +1 212 455 2062 +1 212 455 2502 jslocum@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by STRAUCH FITZGERALD & GREEN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Stanley B. Green +1 336 725 8688 +1 336 725 8867 sgreen@sgandm.com
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Jack Strauch +1 336 837 1061 +1 336 725 8867 jstrauch@sgandm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Michael J. Coolican +1 860 256 8601 +1 800 404 3970 michael.coolican@bgllp.com
a Delaware corporation
TERMINATED: 01/14/2004 Gregory W. Nye +1 860 256 8533 +1 860 760 6471 gregory.nye@bracewell.com
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cetrulo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul O. Mulroney +1 617 217 5500 pmulroney@cetllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher D. Moore +1 617 570 1319 +1 617 523 1213 cmoore@goodwinprocter.com
Space F. Dennis Saylor, IV +1 617 570 1977 +1 617 523 1231 fsaylor@goodwinprocter.com
Space Paul F. Ware, Jr. +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 523 1231 pware@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick T. Uiterwyk +1 617 202 4609 +1 617 573 4710 patrick.uiterwyk@nelsonmullins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald D. Cooper +1 617 345 6077 +1 617 345 1000 dcooper@nixonpeabody.com
Space Kacey E. Houston +1 518 427 2689 +1 866 736 9664 khouston@nixonpeabody.com
Space Brian T. Kelly +1 617 345 1000 bkelly@nixonpeabody.com
Space Melanie C. Nevin +1 617 345 1098 mnevin@nixonpeabody.com
Space Jonathan Sablone +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jsablone@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John L. Altieri, Jr. +1 212 326 2000
Space Allen W. Burton +1 212 326 2282 +1 212 326 2061 aburton@omm.com
Space Paul R. Koepff +1 212 326 2189 +1 212 326 2000 paul.koepff@clydeco.us
Space Marissa Bea Mole +1 212 326 4476 +1 212 326 2061 mmole@omm.com
Space Willard Mark Wood +1 213 430 6000 +4306 430 430 6407

Toggle Switch Represented by Prince, Lobel, Glovsky & Tye LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M. Duffy +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 eduffy@princelobel.com
Space Kristin M. Knuuttila +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 kmknuuttila@plgt.com
Space Walter B. Prince +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 wbprince@plgt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE CHARTWELL LAW OFFICES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Rauworth +1 857 350 3408 mrauworth@chartwelllaw.com
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leo Maurice Bearman, Jr. +1 901 526 2000 +1 901 577 0717 lbearman@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Briggs & Morgan PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M Brama +1 612 977 8400 +1 612 977 8650 ebrama@briggs.com
Space Timothy G Gelinske +1 612 977 8558 +1 612 977 8650 tgelinske@briggs.com
Space Timothy R. Thornton, PHV +1 612 977 8550 +1 612 977 8650 pvolk@briggs.com
Space Molly Borg Thornton +1 612 977 8726 +1 612 977 8650 mthornton@briggs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theresa M. Bevilacqua +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 2868 bevilacqua.theresa@dorsey.com
Space Daniel J Brown +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8800 brown.daniel@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardas, Ravindra Gopal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Tinkham +1 612 340 2600
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Quantam Magnetics, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2011 Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 maofiling@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Liberty Plaza,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2011 Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 maofiling@cgsh.com
No Logo Smiths, Detection -., Defendant
No Logo Smiths Group Plc, Defendant
No Logo Smiths Heimann, Defendant
No Logo Smiths Heimann GmbH, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Melinda S. Riechert +1 650 843 4000 +1 650 843 4001 melinda.riechert@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Tiffany R Hedgpeth +1 213 680 6400 +1 213 680 6499 tiffany.hedgpeth@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BOONE KARLBERG PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Matthew B. Hayhurst +1 406 543 6646 +5496 549 549 6804 mhayhurst@boonekarlberg.com
a Delaware corporation Randy J. Tanner +1 406 543 6646 +1 406 549 6804 rtanner@boonekarlberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Nicholas Adam Danella +1 205 521 8000 +1 205 521 8800 ndanella@babc.com
a Delaware corporation J Thomas Richie +1 205 521 8348 +1 205 488 6348 trichie@bradley.com
a Delaware corporation R Thomas Warburton +4886 488 488 6987 twarburton@babc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jeffrey W. Morof +1 310 576 2100 +5762 576 576 2200 jwmorof@bryancave.com
a Delaware corporation James C. Pettis +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 james.pettis@bryancave.com
a Delaware corporation Jennifer W Russell +1 312 602 5000 +2592 259 259 2020 Jennifer.russell@bryancave.com
a Delaware corporation Alfred Shaumyan +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 alfred.shaumyan@bryancave.com
a Delaware corporation Douglas E. Winter +1 202 508 6072 +1 202 220 7372 dewinter@bryancave.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Snow O'Mara Stevens & Cannada, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation H. Barber Boone +1 601 985 4479 +1 601 985 4500 barber.boone@butlersnow.com
a Delaware corporation Phillip Sykes +1 601 985 4431 +1 601 985 4500 phillip.sykes@butlersnow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Lea Ann Smith +1 504 299 7700 +1 504 299 7701 LeaAnn.Smith@butlersnow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Amy E. Furness +1 305 539 7253 +1 305 530 0055 afurness@cfjblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Randa Adra +1 248 924 0419 radra@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CROWLEY FLECK PLLP - BILLINGS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Paul C. Collins +1 406 252 3441 +1 406 252 5292 pcollins@crowleyfleck.com
a Delaware corporation John W Harkins, IV +1 406 252 3441 +1 406 256 0277 jharkins@crowleyfleck.com
a Delaware corporation Aaron W. Nicholson +1 406 252 3441 +1 406 256 8526 anicholson@crowleyfleck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Taylor S Ball +1 206 757 8280 taylorball@dwt.com
a Delaware corporation Jennifer C Berry +1 206 757 8076 jenniferberry@dwt.com
a Delaware corporation Fred Burnside +1 202 622 3150 +1 206 757 7016 fredburnside@dwt.com
a Delaware corporation Boris Gaviria +1 425 646 6100 borisgaviria@dwt.com
a Delaware corporation Paula L Lehmann +1 206 622 3150 paulalehmann@dwt.com
a Delaware corporation Sheehan H Sullivan Weiss +1 206 622 3150 sulls@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Erik Christopher DiMarco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Erik Christopher DiMarco

Toggle Switch Represented by FedEx Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jane M Flynn +1 949 862 4643 +1 949 862 4605 jmf@paynefears.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Figari & Davenport, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Doug K. Butler +1 214 939 2000 +1 214 939 2090 doug.butler@figdav.com
a Delaware corporation Amanda D. Sotak +1 214 939 2000 +1 214 939 2090 amanda.sotak@figdav.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation David Brandon Conrad +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 conrad@fr.com
a Delaware corporation Theresa M. Dawson tdawson@fr.com
a Delaware corporation Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
a Delaware corporation James Youngkwang Wang +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 wang@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gregory J. Commins, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Gregory J. Commins, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by HOLMES WEDDLE & BARCOTT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Megan Elizabeth Blomquist +1 206 292 8008 +1340028 +13 340 0289 mblomquist@hwb-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Ali-Reza Boloori ali-reza.boloori@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation Peter A Farrell +1 202 879 5959 +1 202 879 5200 peter.farrell@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation Erin Camille Johnston +1 202 879 5233 erin.johnston@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation JOSEPH SERINO, JR. +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 6460 joseph.serino@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation Craig Scott Primis +1 202 879 5921 +1 202 879 5200 cprimis@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation Tammy Ann Tsoumas +1 213 680 8233 +1 213 808 8189 ttsoumas@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation KEVIN T. VANWART +1 312 862 2130 +1 312 862 2200 kevinvanwart@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation Corey Craig Watson +1 213 680 8482 +1 213 680 8500 cwatson@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation Bradley H. Weidenhammer - NOT SWORN +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 bweidenhammer@kirkland.com
a Delaware corporation Nimalka Wickramsekera +1 213 615 1700 +1 213 615 1750 nwickramasekera@winston.com
a Delaware corporation Michael Francis Williams +1 202 879 5123 +1 202 879 5200 mwilliams@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation David P. R. Symes +1 503 889 8854 +1 503 961 8198 dsymes@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Dustin Clark Beckley +1 213 622 7300 +1 213 622 7313 dbeckley@mgmlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Amaryah K. Bocchino +1 302 657 2100 +1 302 657 2104 abocchino@cmjlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Jason A. Cincilla +1 302 657 2100 jcincilla@cmjlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Jennifer L. Cree +1 302 504 6808 +1 302 657 2104 jcree@mgmlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Javier Fernando Flores +1 617 670 8428 jflores@mgmlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Brian D Gross +1 617 670 8519 +61767871 617 767 8719 bgross@mgmlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Brent Marshall Karren +1 415 512 4381 +1 415 512 6791 bkarren@mgmlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Daniel P. McCarthy +1 617 670 8800 +1 617 670 8801 dmccarthy@mgmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jonathan P Harmon +1 804 775 4712 +1 804 698 2073 jharmon@mcguirewoods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation James J Gallagher +1 213 688 1000 +1 213 243 6330 jgallagher@mckennalong.com
a Delaware corporation Gail D Zirkelbach +1 303 634 4000 +1 303 634 4400 gzirkelbach@mckennalong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Christopher Banks +1 415 442 1000 christopher.banks@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation James J Dragna +1 213 680 6436 +1 213 680 6499 jim.dragna@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Jeremy B Esterkin +1 213 680 6400 +1 213 680 6499 jeremy.esterkin@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Denise G Fellers +1 213 680 6427 +1 213 680 6499 denise.fellers@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Joseph Vincent Marra, III +1 213 612 2500 +1 213 612 2501 joseph.marra@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Jason Scott Mills +1 213 612 2500 +1 213 612 2501 jmills@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Patricia S Riordan +1 213 612 7473 +1 213 612 2501 priordan@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Lisa Marie Rodriguez +1 213 612 2500 +1 213 612 2501 lisa.rodriguez@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Clifford Douglas Sethness +1 213 612 2500 +1 213 612 2501 csethness@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Jennifer P. Svanfeldt +1 415 442 1276 +1 415 442 1001 jennifer.svanfeldt@morganlewis.com
a Delaware corporation Nancy Villarreal +1 650 843 4000 +1 650 843 4001 nancy.villarreal@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Adam R. Lawton +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 adam.lawton@mto.com
a Delaware corporation Rohit K. Singla +1 415 512 4032 +1 415 512 4077 rohit.singla@mto.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nancy Sher Cohen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Nancy Sher Cohen

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Michael Haynes Cramer +1 312 558 1240 +1 312 807 3619 michael.cramer@ogletreedeakins.com
a Delaware corporation Joseph Lawrence John Appel +1 415 442 4810 joe.appel@ogletreedeakins.com
a Delaware corporation Dawn Michelle Knepper +1 714 800 7938 +1 714 754 1298 dawn.knepper@ogletreedeakins.com
a Delaware corporation Gregg M. Lemley +1 314 802 3935 gregg.lemley@ogletreedeakins.com
a Delaware corporation Andrew Laird Metcalf +1 314 802 3935 +1 314 802 3936 andrew.metcalf@ogletreedeakins.com
a Delaware corporation Taylor Nicole Rollinson +1 312 558 3142 taylor.rollinson@ogletreedeakins.com
a Delaware corporation Lawrence David Smith +1 210 277 3620 +1 210 277 2702 larry.smith@ogletreedeakins.com
a Delaware corporation Charles L. Thompson, IV +1 415 442 4810 +1 415 442 4870 charles.thompson@ogletreedeakins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One James Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Eric B Martin +1 804 775 1129 +1 804 698 2149 EMartin@McGuireWoods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Market, Spear Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Karen Y Cho +1 415 442 1000 karen.cho@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Payne & Fears LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jeffrey K Brown +1 949 851 1100 jkb@paynefears.com
a Delaware corporation Matthew J Cute +1 949 851 1100 +1 949 851 1212 mjc@paynefears.com
a Delaware corporation Daniel F Fears +1 949 851 1100 +1 949 851 1212 dff@paynefears.com
a Delaware corporation Andrew Keith Haeffele +1 949 851 1100 +1 949 851 1212 akh@paynefears.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PERKINS COIE LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jonathan R Buck +1 312 263 5601 +1 312 324 9644 jbuck@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Bruce Duplan Campbell +1 206 359 8414 +1 206 359 9000 bcampbell@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation John David Dillow +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 JDillow@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Bates McIntyre Larson +1 312 324 8400 +1 312 324 9400 blarson@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Thomas Jeffrey McLaughlin +1 206 359 8483 +1 206 359 9483 tmclaughlin@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Steven C. Minson +1 206 359 8000
a Delaware corporation Charles William Mulaney, III +1 312 324 8648 +1 312 324 9648 cmulaney@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Gretchen Marie Paine +1 206 359 6874 +1 206 359 7874
a Delaware corporation Michael E. Sconville +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000
a Delaware corporation Grant Josiah Silvernale, III +1 206 359 8883 +1 206 359 9338 JSilvernale@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Kathleen A Stetsko +1 312 324 8400 kstetsko@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Matthew H. Wernz +1 312 324 8589 mwernz@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Eric Brian Wolff +1 206 359 3779

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Emily A Bushaw +1 206 359 3069 ebushaw@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation William Thomas Cahill +1 312 263 5601 wcahill@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Perkins Coie
a Delaware corporation Jeffrey M Hanson +1 206 359 8000 jhanson@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Jeffrey Alan Hollingsworth +1 206 583 8888 +1583850 +15 583 8500 JHollingsworth@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Allison Roseman Kendrick +1 206 583 8888 +1 206 359 9000 akendrick@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Daniel Eric Lassen +1 650 838 4300 DanLassen@PerkinsCoie.com
a Delaware corporation Eric Scott Lent +20635 980 00x3058 +1 206 359 9000 elent@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Charles William Mulaney, III +1 312 324 8648 +1 312 324 9648 cmulaney@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Chelsea D Petersen +1 206 359 3993 cdpetersen@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation TODD W. ROSENCRANS +1 206 359 8874 trosencrans@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation James Sanders +1 206 583 8888 +1583850 +15 583 8500 jsanders@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Mack H. Shultz, Jr. +1 206 583 8888 +1 206 359 7724 mshultz@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation William B. Stafford +1 206 359 6217 +1 206 359 7217 WStafford@perkinscoie.com
a Delaware corporation Kaycie Lynn Wall +1 650 838 4300 +1 650 838 4350 kwall@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phong Nguyen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Phong Nguyen

Toggle Switch Represented by RIDDELL WILLIAMS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Kristina Markosova +1 206 624 3600 kmarkosova@riddellwilliams.com
a Delaware corporation Blake Edward Marks-Dias +1 206 624 3600 bmarksdias@riddellwilliams.com
a Delaware corporation Laurence A. Shapero +1 206 524 3600 +1 206 389 1708 lshapero@riddellwilliams.com
a Delaware corporation Skylar A Sherwood +1 206 624 3600 ssherwood@riddellwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald A Valenzuela

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Ronald A Valenzuela

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Lee S. Gayer +1 212 841 5700 +1 212 841 5725 Lee.Gayer@ropesgray.com
a Delaware corporation William I. Sussman +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 841 5725 william.sussman@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shawn S Ledingham , Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Shawn S Ledingham, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Charles E. Koob +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 ckoob@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spears & Imes, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Brian S. Fraser +1 212 530 1800 +1 212 530 1801 bfraser@rkollp.com
a Delaware corporation H. Rowan Gaither, IV +1 212 530 1807 +1 717 344 8807 rgaither@rkollp.com
a Delaware corporation Arthur S. Greenspan +1 212 530 1800 +1 212 530 1801 agreenspan@rkollp.com
a Delaware corporation Lee S. Richards, III +1 212 530 1840 +5301 530 530 1801 lrichards@rkollp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Charles N Eberhardt +1 425 453 6980 + 425 450 7467 ceberhardt@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Peter E Gratzinger +1 213 683 9513 +1 213 683 4013 peter.gratzinger@mto.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walraven & Westerfeld Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Bryan Scott Westerfeld +1 949 215 1997 +1 949 215 1999 bwesterfeld@walravenlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Nicole Elizabeth Wurscher +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 new@walravenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Charles Christopher De Martino +1 914 205 3884 cdemartino@davanzomorreale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Christian Edward Dodd +1 213 615 1700 +1 213 615 1750 cdodd@winston.com
a Delaware corporation Eric James Marcotte +1 202 282 5721 +1 202 282 5100 emarcotte@winston.com
a Delaware corporation Neal Ross Marder +1 213 615 1700 +1 213 615 1750 nmarder@winston.com
a Delaware corporation Stephen R Smerek +1 213 615 1735 +1 213 615 1750 ssmerek@winston.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by A Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation M Michael Cole +1 415 464 4300 +1 415 464 4336 mmc@millerlawgroup.com
a Delaware corporation Mary L. Guilfoyle +1 415 464 4300 +1 415 464 4336 mlg@millerlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen Franklin Gardner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Allen Franklin Gardner

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Ross Ritter Barton +1 704 444 1287 +1 704 444 1677 ross.barton@alston.com
a Delaware corporation Keith Edward Broyles +1 404 881 7558 +1 404 811 7777 kbroyles@alston.com
a Delaware corporation Michael S. Connor +1 704 444 1022 +1 704 444 1752 mike.connor@alston.com
a Delaware corporation Pamela Holland Councill +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 pamela.councill@alston.com
a Delaware corporation Stephen Richard Lareau +1 704 444 1000 +1 704 444 1783 stephen.lareau@alston.com
a Delaware corporation Courtney Suzanne Werner +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 suzanne.werner@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alton Absher , III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Alton Absher, III

Toggle Switch Represented by Ann Marie Duffy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Ann Marie Duffy

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Joachim P. Cox jcox@cfhawaii.com
a Delaware corporation Joon Hwang +1 703 442 8425 +1 703 373 2628 jhwang@littler.com
a Delaware corporation Kenneth L. Steinthal +1 415 318 1200 +1 415 318 1300 KSteinthal@kslaw.com
a Delaware corporation Joseph Richard Wetzel, Jr., +1 415 318 1200 +1 415 318 1300 jwetzel@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Frank T. Blechschmidt +1 312 416 6295 fblechschmidt@bakerlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Alexander David Burch +1 713 751 1357 +1 713 751 1717 aburch@bakerlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Matthew J Caccamo +1 312 416 6235 +1 312 416 6256 mcaccamo@bakerlaw.com
a Delaware corporation TTAB Attorney Placeholder jletchinger@bakerlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Richard T Stilwell +1 713 646 1378 +1 713 751 1717 tstilwell@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Mark Todd Barnes +1 303 223 1100 +1 303 223 1111 mbarnes@bhfs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation ROSEMARY JOAN BRUNO +1 973 273 9800 +1 973 273 9430 rosemary.bruno@bipc.com
a Delaware corporation Jinkal Pujara +1 973 424 5623 jinkal.pujara@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cabot Mantanona LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Matthew S. Kane +1 671 646 2001 +1 671 646 0777 mk@cmlaw.us
a Delaware corporation Rawlen M.T. Mantanona +1 671 646 2001 +1 671 646 0777 rm@cmlaw.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Coddington, Hicks, & Danforth, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Richard Grotch +1 650 592 5400 rgrotch@chdlawyers.com
a Delaware corporation Jonathan Charles Harriman +1 650 592 5400 +1 650 592 5027 JHarriman@CHDLawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen, Salk & Huvard, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Amanda J. Wendorff +1 847 480 7800 awendorff@cshlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Anthony U. Battista +1 212 490 1900 +1 212 370 4453 abattista@condonlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Christopher R. Christensen +1 212 490 9100
a Delaware corporation Richard Anthony Lazenby +1 310 557 2030 +1 310 557 1299 rlazenby@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Mary Katherine Dow +1 212 894 6776 +1 212 370 4453 mdow@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cox Fricke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Abigail Marie Holden +1 808 585 9440 aholden@cfhawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dara M. Kurlancheek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Dara M. Kurlancheek

Toggle Switch Represented by Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP - Louisville KY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Colin Hugh Lindsay +1 502 540 2300 +1 502 585 2207 colin.lindsay@dinslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation ELENA CHKOLNIKOVA +1 973 307 3046 +1 973 273 9430 elena.chkolnikova@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Andrew Holly +1 612 340 8830 +1 612 340 2868 holly.andrew@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FordHarrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Michelle Brauer Abidoye +1 213 237 2400 +1 213 237 2401 mabidoye@fordharrison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation John Kenneth Johnson +1 212 277 4000
a Delaware corporation Michael Lacovara +1 212 230 4630 michael.lacovara@freshfields.com
a Delaware corporation Richard Sutton Snyder +1 202 777 4565 +1 202 777 4555 richard.snyder@freshfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilbert, Harrell, Sumerford & Martin, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Mark David Johnson +1 912 265 6700 +1 912 264 3917 mjohnson@gilbertharrelllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Quinn Colleen Shean +1 312 646 5824 +1 312 646 5858 quinn.shean@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees - Glastonbury

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Ann Christoff Purvis +1 303 200 6894 apurvis@grsm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Horwood Marcus & Berk, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Alyssa Clifford Scott +1 312 606 3200 +1 312 606 3232 ascott@hmblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Katherine Ann Staton +1 214 953 6015 +1 214 661 6699 kstaton@jw.com
a Delaware corporation Matthew Eric Vandenberg +1 210 978 7700 +1 210 978 7790 mvandenberg@jw.com
a Delaware corporation Michael J Woodson +1 713 752 4200 mwoodson@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by John Frederick Bufe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation John Frederick Bufe

Toggle Switch Represented by Jon Robert Pierce

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jon Robert Pierce

Toggle Switch Represented by Kamlet Shepherd & Reichert, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Stephen D. Gurr +1 303 825 4200

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jeffrey Scott Seddon +1 212 556 2190 +1 212 556 2222 jseddon@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Paul David Collier +1 312 861 2471 +1 312 861 2200 pcollier@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lafayette & Kumagai LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Gary T. Lafayette +1 415 357 4600 +1 415 357 4605 glafayette@lkclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Williams Stevens

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Michael Williams Stevens +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 mwstevens@seyfarth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Oyindamola Hanna Badmus +1 312 372 5520 hbadmus@littler.com
a Delaware corporation Jody A. Boquist +1 312 372 5520 jboquist@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Martinez Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Elizabeth Imhoff Mabey +1 303 597 4000 +1 303 597 4001 mabey@mlgrouppc.com
a Delaware corporation Glen Edward Matthews +1 303 597 4000 +1 303 597 4001 matthews@mlgrouppc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Martinez Law Group P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Meghan W. Martinez +1 303 597 4000 +1 303 759 5203 martinez@mlgrouppc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation James W. Gladden, Jr. +1 312 782 0600
a Delaware corporation Ranjit James Hakim +1 312 701 8758 +1 312 701 7711 courtnotification@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Micah E. Marcus +1 312 280 0111 mmarcus@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation John T Rouse +1 601 960 8400 +1 601 960 8431 jrouse@mcglinchey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael E Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Michael E Jones

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael J. Turton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Michael J. Turton

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Mani Sheik +1 415 464 3600 +1 415 262 4336 mani@sheiklaw.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Joshua Hill, Jr. +1 415 268 6000 +1 415 268 7522 jhill@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Brett Christopher Govett +1 214 855 8118 +1 214 855 8200 brett.govett@nortonrosefulbright.com
a Delaware corporation Gabriel David Kaim +1 713 651 5295 gabriel.kaim@nortonrosefulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nyemaster, Goode, West, Hansell & O'Brien PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Scott Sundstrom +1 515 283 3100 +2833 283 283 3108 sasundstrom@nyemaster.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PAUL HASTINGS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation William K. Whitner +1 404 815 2400 +1 404 815 2424 kwhitner@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jennifer S Baldocchi +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 jenniferbaldocchi@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PAUL HASTINGS LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Melinda Ann Gordon +1 213 683 6000
a Delaware corporation Ji Hae Kim +1 213 683 6163 +1 213 627 0705 jihaekim@paulhastings.com
a Delaware corporation Scott Matthew Klausner +1 213 683 6000 scottklausner@paulhastings.com
a Delaware corporation Nathalie Catherine Knight +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 nathalieknight@paulhastings.com
a Delaware corporation Donna D Melby +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 donnamelby@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Penthouse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Dane B Jaques +1 703 336 8709 +1 703 336 8750 djaques@dglitigators.com
a Delaware corporation Erin E. Slusser +1 703 336 8800 eslusser@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jeffrey J. Ellis +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 Jellis@QuirkBakalor.com
a Delaware corporation Loretta Anne Redmond +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 lredmond@quirkbakalor.com
a Delaware corporation Brian Patrick Sexton +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1065 bsexton@quirkbakalor.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saqib Javaid Siddiqui

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Saqib Javaid Siddiqui

Toggle Switch Represented by SBC Ameritech Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jeri Anne Lindahl-Garcia +1 312 727 4121

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Sondra A. Hemeryck +1 312 258 5743 +1 312 258 5600 shemeryck@schiffhardin.com
a Delaware corporation Jacob L. Kahn +1 312 258 5595 jkahn@schiffhardin.com
a Delaware corporation Paula Marie Ketcham +1 312 258 5500 +1 312 258 5600 pketcham@schiffhardin.com
a Delaware corporation Ronald S. Safer +1 312 876 1000 +1 312 258 5700 rsafer@schiffhardin.com
a Delaware corporation Leah Ward Sears +1 404 437 7000 +1 404 437 7100 lsears@schiffhardin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Kathryn Suzanne Clark +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 kclark@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Ariel D. Cudkowicz +1 617 946 4884 +1 617 946 4801 acudkowicz@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Brigitte M. Duffy +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 bduffy@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Carla J. Eaton +1 617 946 4903 +1 617 946 5352 ceaton@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Michele Haydel Gehrke +1 415 397 2823 +1 415 397 8549 mgehrke@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Rachel M. Hoffer +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 rhoffer@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Gary S. Kaplan +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 gkaplan@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Ronald J. Kramer +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 rkramer@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Jessica M. Schauer +1 617 946 4800 +1 617 946 4801 jmschauer@seyfarth.com
a Delaware corporation Jason M Torres +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jtorres@seyfarth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jennifer Naomi Gaspar +1 415 772 7490 +1 415 772 7400 jgaspar@sidley.com
a Delaware corporation Peter K. Huston +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 722 7400 phuston@sidley.com
a Delaware corporation Vikram S Shah +1 415 772 1200 +1 415 772 7400 vikram.shah@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Nicholas E Zito +1 713 266 0074 +1 713 266 1064 nez@ramey-chandler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen E. Baskin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Stephen E. Baskin

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Mackenzie Mayes Walter +1 859 425 1000 +1 859 425 1099 mackenzie.walter@dinslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Dwayne Cuthbert Norton +1 469 729 5853 dnorton@chenmalin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Jennifer Rose Cotner +1 415 262 8311 +1 415 464 4336 jrc@millerlawgroup.com
a Delaware corporation Elizabeth A. Lalik +1 703 286 3131 +1 703 842 8517 elalik@littler.com
a Delaware corporation Lindsey Hager McGinnis +1 703 442 8425 +1 703 442 8428 lmcginnis@littler.com
a Delaware corporation Tracy Thompson +1 415 464 4300 +1 415 464 4336 tt@millerlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Misra Legal Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Amit K Misra +1 832 723 4776 +1 832 476 9656 amit@misralegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Timothy Joseph Keane

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Timothy Joseph Keane

Toggle Switch Represented by Ungaretti & Harris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Kevin Patrick Shea +1 312 977 4400 kpshea@uhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United Airlines, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Janet Lynn Hall +1 847 700 1088

Toggle Switch Represented by Walraven & Westerfeld Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation Larry A Walraven +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 lwalraven@calemployerlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Bryan Scott Westerfeld +1 949 215 1997 +1 949 215 1999 bwesterfeld@walravenlaw.com
a Delaware corporation Nicole Elizabeth Wurscher +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 new@walravenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by William H. Boice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation William H. Boice

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware corporation GARY A. GARDNER +1 212 915 5147 gary.gardner@wilsonelser.com
No Logo US Air Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
doing business asUS Airways Express Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
doing business asUS Airways Express Kurt Bernard Gerstner +1 617 241 3086 +1 617 241 5115 kgerstner@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
doing business asUS Airways Express Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle +1 617 241 3109 +1 617 241 5115 kguilfoyle@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
No Logo US Airways Shuttle, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Thad T Dameris +1 713 576 2402 +1 713 576 2499 thad.dameris@aporter.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Denis M. Delja +1 202 942 5000
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Mara V.J. Senn +1 202 942 6448

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Stephen Joseph Arena +1 917 902 5996 +1 212 972 7581 sarena@trflaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 David Gregg Trachtenberg +1 212 972 2929 +1 212 972 7581 dtrachtenberg@trflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bean, Kinney & Korman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Jennifer A. Brust +1 703 525 4000 +1 703 525 2207 jbrust@beankinney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch Horton Bittner and Cherot, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 James H. Lister +1 202 659 5800 +1 202 659 1027

Toggle Switch Represented by Britnee Marie Reamy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Britnee Marie Reamy

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Joseph J. Bial +1 202 223 7318 +1 202 223 7420 jbial@paulweiss.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Andrew J. Forman +1 202 862 2200 +1 202 862 2400 andrew.forman@cwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Daniel J. Howley +1 202 223 7372 +1 202 223 7420 dhowley@paulweiss.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Peter E. Moll +1 202 862 2200 +1 202 862 2400 peter.moll@cwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Derek Winston Moore +1 202 862 2200 +1 202 862 2400 derek.moore@cwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Charles F. Rule +1 202 862 2420 +1 202 862 2400 rrule@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle +1 617 241 3109 +1 617 241 5115 kguilfoyle@campbell-trial-lawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carl Edward Bruce

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Carl Edward Bruce

Toggle Switch Represented by Coddington, Hicks, & Danforth, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Gina Joelle Beltramo +1 650 592 5400 +1 650 592 5027 gallendorf@chdlawyers.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Richard Grotch +1 650 592 5400 rgrotch@chdlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia Square

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 David J. Weiner +1 202 637 5617 david.weiner@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowley, Liberatore, Ryan & Brogan, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Karen M. Crowley +1 757 333 4500 +1 757 333 4501

Toggle Switch Represented by Durie Tangri Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Clement S. Roberts

Toggle Switch Represented by Eugene Novikov

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Eugene Novikov

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Trevor R Jefferies +1 713 632 1415 +1 713 583 8410 trevor.jefferies@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Eric J. Lobenfeld +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 eric.lobenfeld@hoganlovells.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Ira James Schaefer +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 ira.schaefer@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 J. Eric Crupi +1 202 419 2143

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan, Massamillo & Andrews, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Larry S. Kaplan +1 312 345 3000 lkaplan@kvolaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Susan J. Russell +1 312 345 3029 srussell@kvolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Karen Yeh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Karen Yeh

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Sadik Harry Huseny +1 415 391 0600 +1 415 395 8095 sadik.huseny@lw.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr. +1 415 391 0600 +1 415 395 8095 Al.Pfeiffer@lw.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Daniel Murray Wall +1 415 395 8240 +1 415 395 8095 dan.wall@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lauren Murphy Pringle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Lauren Murphy Pringle

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark A. Lemley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Mark A. Lemley

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Ann Marie Duffy aduffy@mayerbrown.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Dara Kurlancheek +1 202 263 3355 +1 202 263 3300 dkurlancheek@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Sarah Beckett Boehm +1 804 775 7487 +1 804 698 2255
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Douglas M. Foley +1 202 857 1720
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 John H. Maddock III +1 804 775 1178
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Lawrence E. Rifken +1 703 712 5000 +1 703 712 5250
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Joseph S. Sheerin +1 804 775 1135

Toggle Switch Represented by Melissa Cross, Arnold & Porter LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Christopher Mohr Odell +1 713 576 2401 +1 713 576 2499 christopher.odell@apks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Neil J. McNabnay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Neil J. McNabnay

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Daniel Frederic Blanks +1 904 665 3656 +1 904 665 3699 daniel.blanks@nelsonmullins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Charles P. Diamond +1 301 246 6801 +1 310 246 6779 CDiamond@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Marc F. Feinstein +1 213 430 7274 +1 213 430 6407 mfeinstein@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Sara May Folchi +1 650 473 2600 +1 650 473 2601 sfolchi@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Alicia K Hancock +1 310 246 6890 +1 310 246 6779 ahancock@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Susannah Kelly Howard +1 415 984 8976 showard@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Adam P. KohSweeney +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 akohsweeney@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 David K. Lukmire +1 212 326 2000 dlukmire@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Michael G McGuinness +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 mmcguinness@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Edward Nathaniel Moss +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 emoss@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Kenneth Takashi Murata +1 212 326 2274 +1 212 326 2061 kmurata@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Madhu Pocha +1 310 553 6700 +1 310 246 6779 mpocha@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Mark Wayne Robertson +1 212 326 4373 +1 212 326 2061 mrobertson@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Katrina M Robson +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 krobson@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Robert A. Siegel +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 rsiegel@omm.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Henry C. Thumann +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 hthumann@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Roussos, Glanzer & Barnhart, P.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Kelly Megan Barnhart +1 757 622 9005 +1 757 624 9257
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Lawrence H. Glanzer +1 757 622 9005 +1 757 624 9257

Toggle Switch Represented by Saqib Javaid Siddiqui

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Saqib Javaid Siddiqui

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Mark C. Tatum +1 816 421 5547 mtatum@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Moore Leatherwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 C. Bailey King, Jr. +1 704 384 2616 +1 704 384 2919 bailey.king@smithmoorelaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Robert R Marcus +1 704 384 2600 +1 704 384 2800 rob.marcus@smithmoorelaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Fred M. Wood, Jr. +1 704 384 2646 +1 704 384 2800 fred.wood@smithmoorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Moore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Jonathan P Heyl +1 704 384 2625 +1 704 384 2600 jon.heyl@smithmoorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen E. Baskin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Stephen E. Baskin

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas M Melsheimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Thomas M Melsheimer

Toggle Switch Represented by Us Airways, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Howard E. Kass +1 202 326 5153 +1 202 898 4810

Toggle Switch Represented by Walraven & Lehman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Larry A Walraven +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 lwalraven@calemployerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Walraven & Westerfeld Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Larry A Walraven +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 lwalraven@calemployerlaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Bryan Scott Westerfeld +1 949 215 1997 +1 949 215 1999 bwesterfeld@walravenlaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 Nicole Elizabeth Wurscher +1 949 215 1990 +1 949 215 1999 new@walravenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by William Joseph Cornelius , Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/23/2011 William Joseph Cornelius, Jr.
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331al
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT that the settlement agreement is approved, the full amounts of payments shall count against the total libility, the plaintiff's claims are severed from all other claims in this action, final judgment in accordance with the terms of the settlement agreement shall be entered purusuant to Rule 54(b)FRCP, the complaint in 03 Cv 6827, is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to all defts., any claims are extinguished, and this order does not terminate any of the cross-claims by WTC Properties, except for the claims for contribution and indemnity which are dismissed with prejudice and without costs; this constitutes the final judgment of the Court, there being no just reason for delay.(Orig. fld. in 21 MC 97 AKH) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/24/06) (jf, ) Modified on 8/29/2006 (jf, ). (Entered: 08/29/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL As To ALASKA AIRLINES, INC., the above-entitled action is dismissed without prejudice as against defendant, Alaska Airlines, Inc., and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/23/04) (dt, ) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendant United Air Lines, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of adopting answer of defendants AMR Corporation and American Airlines, Inc. to plaintiffs' amended flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. (jco, ) (Entered: 08/26/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION, that defendant Delta Air Lines incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc., hereby adopts its Master Answer to plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint as its Answer in the above-captioned action. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc. (tp, ) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Globe Aviation Services served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Gregory Borgese. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. US Airways Shuttle, Inc. served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Rita Evans. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Huntleigh USA Corp. served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Cathy Richardson, Legal Clerk. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. US Airways, Inc. served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Bou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Delta Connection, Inc. served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Janet Connection. Document filed by Delta Connection, Inc.. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Northwest Airlines, Inc. served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Bou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Continental Airlines served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Bou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Delta Connection, Inc. served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Bou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Pinkerton's, Inc. served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Bou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Burns International Security Services Corporation served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Bou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Atlantic Coast Airlines served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elenabou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Atlantic Coast Airlines served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elenabou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. US Air Group served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Rita Evans. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Colgan Air, Inc. served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Mary Bergere. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Colgan Air, Inc. served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Mary Bergere. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. America West Airlines, Inc. served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elenabou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Atlantic Coast Airlines served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elenabou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Frontier Airlines served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Frontier Airlines. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, American Eagle Airlines, Inc. served on 2/12/2004, answer due 3/3/2004. Service was accepted by Elenabou. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. United Airlines, Inc. served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Glaydys Ryan. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, John A. Martin served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004; Paul R. Martin served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Mark Syrnick. Document filed by L-3 Communications Corporation. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Austin Choi. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, Delta Airlines, Inc. served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Glaydys Ryan. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Dan Muhlem. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. The Boeing Company served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Gladys Ryan. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Heimann Systems Corporation served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Karen Chain. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Smiths Detection served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Karen Chain. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Jeannie Gammon, Legal Department. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, L-3 Communications Corporation served on 3/5/2004, answer due 3/25/2004. Service was accepted by Paula Cash, Legal Clerk. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 3/5/2004, answer due 3/25/2004. Service was accepted by Paula Cash, Legal Clerk. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Massachusetts Port Authority served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Marie snow, Legal Clerk. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS. Document filed by John A. Martin, Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services. (sac, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of Adoption Of Master Answer Of Defendant Huntleigh USA Corporation. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corp.. (jmi, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of adopting Massachusetts Port Authority's Master Answer to plaintiffs' amended flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Air Lines, Inc. (ps, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (sac, ) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Securitas AB served on 3/17/2004, answer due 4/6/2004. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by John A. Martin ; Paul R. Martin. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/12/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against America West Airlines, Inc., Burns International Security Services Corporation, Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Delta Airlines, Inc., Globe Aviation Services, Huntleigh USA Corp., ICTS International, N.V., Massachusetts Port Authority, Northwest Airlines, Inc., Pinkerton's, Inc., Securitas AB, The Boeing Company, US Air Group, US Airways Shuttle, Inc., US Airways, Inc., United Airlines, Inc..Document filed by John A. Martin, Paul R. Martin. Related document: 1 Complaint.(sac, ) (Entered: 04/12/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB at the following address: Securitas AB Lindhagensplan 70, PO Box 12307, SE-102 28, Stockholm, Sweden on 3/8/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 405 635. (ps, ) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Notice of Case assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Justin T. Green . (laq) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484502. (gmo) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?