Lattimore v. Klein et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-09269
District Judge Loretta A. Preska, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2017 at 1:37 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Lattimore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Lattimore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Lattimore
v.
No Logo Dawn Meconi, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Walcott, Defendant
No Logo Department of Education of the City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Director of the Medical Bureau, Doe, Defendant
No Logo Edwin Copa, Defendant
No Logo Jill Bloomberg, Defendant
No Logo Joel Klein, Defendant
No Logo John Doe at "The Region"(Region 2), Defendant
No Logo John Staton, Defendant
No Logo Judy A. Henry, Defendant
No Logo Lina Barbera, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Ferraiola, Defendant
No Logo Margaret Lacey-Bermanand, Defendant
No Logo Mark Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Martin F. Scheinman, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Michael Mehmet, Defendant
No Logo PAUL THOMPSON, Defendant
No Logo Sheila Montoute, Defendant
No Logo Steven Dorcely, Defendant
No Logo William Jusino, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael Lattimore, dated 5/4/15 re: Plaintiff requests that his Amended Complaint be voluntarily dismissed with prejudice by the Court. Document filed by Michael Lattimore.(sc) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL: On May 7, 2015, the Court received a letter from Plaintiff, advising the Court that he wishes to voluntarily dismiss this action. Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff's request to voluntarily dismiss this action pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and to note service on the docket. The amended complaint is dismissed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/13/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER denying 14 Motion TO ENJOIN THE DEPARTMENTS OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY & STATE OF NEW YORK FROM ADMINISTERING THE 8TH GRADE ENGLISH LANGUAGE ARTS COMMON CORE TEST DURING THE WEEK OF APRIL 13TH OR UNTIL A HEARING IN SAID MATTER MAY BE HELD. EMERGENCY IN NATURE OF EMERGENCY. Plaintiff, proceeding pro se and in forma pauperis, brings an order to show cause seeking to enjoin the New York City Department of Education from administering the eighth grade "English Language Arts Common Core test." (Motion (ECF No. 14) at 1.) Plaintiff seeks the injunction because of the ill- timing of the test," on the ground that students will just be returning from spring break and "will still be reacclimatizing to school and school work and ill prepared to take any high-stakes State tests." (Id. at 1-2.) The request for an order to show cause is denied, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending application. The Court will issue an explanatory order at a later date. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/28/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION TO ENJOIN THE DEPARTMENTS OF EDUCATION OF THE CITY & STATE OF NEW YORK FROM ADMINISTERING THE 8TH GRADE ENGLISH LANGUAGE ARTS COMMON CORE TEST DURING THE WEEK OF APRIL 13TH OR UNTIL A HEARING IN SAID MATTER MAY BE HELD. EMERGENCY IN NATURE OF EMERGENCY. Document filed by Michael Lattimore.(sc) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Overturn A Waiver & Release. Document filed by Michael Lattimore. (kgo) (kgo). (Entered: 04/06/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Withdraw Complaints. Document filed by Michael Lattimore.(kgo) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF MOTION REQUEST TO SUBMIT A DVD AS EVIDENCE. Document filed by Michael Lattimore.(sc) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joel Klein, Mark Ryan, Martin F. Scheinman, Michael Mehmet, John Doe at "The Region"(Region 2), Judy A. Henry, John Staton, Jill Bloomberg, Michael Bloomberg, Dennis Walcott, Sheila Montoute, Director of the Medical Bureau, Doe, Edwin Copa, William Jusino, Dawn Meconi, Lisa Ferraiola, Margaret Lacey-Bermanand, Lina Barbera, Steven Dorcely, Paul Thompson.Document filed by Michael Lattimore. (Attachments: # 1 Main Document, # 2 Main Document, # 3 Main Document, # 4 Main Document, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(sc) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER TO AMEND denying 4 Application for the Court to Request Counsel. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to assign this matter to my docket and to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Plaintiff's request for counsel (Dkt. No. 4) is denied without prejudice to renewal. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint containing the information specified above. The amended complaint must be submitted to this Court's Pro Se Office within sixty days of the date of this order, be captioned as an "AMENDED COMPLAINT," and bear the same docket number as this order. An Amended Civil Rights complaint form, which Plaintiff should complete as specified above, is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/16/2015) (ajs). (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    LETTER from Michael Lattimore re: EXHIBITS 1-6. Document filed by Michael Lattimore.(sc) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW -AMENDED 12/30/14. Document filed by Michael Lattimore. (sc) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER DENYING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is denied as Plaintiff has sufficient assets to pay the fee. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1). Plaintiff is directed to pay the $400.00 in fees- a $350.00 filing fee and a $50.00 administrative fee- within 30 days of the date of this Order. Filing Fee due by 1/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/24/2014) (sbr) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Document filed by Michael Lattimore. (sc) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO REQUEST PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Michael Lattimore.(sc) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Michael Lattimore.(sc) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/24/2014) (man). (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 12/22/2014. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/22/2014. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/21/2014) (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(keb) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION TO REOPEN. Document filed by Michael Lattimore.(laq) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?