J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Puente
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:17-cv-02117

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 25, 2019 at 11:29 AM DT (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Show Cause
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Contempt
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Compel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Final
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 9 J&J Sports Productions, Inc. MOTION for Summary Judgment and denying 10 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None stipulation
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Notice of Setting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/1/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Following Telephone Scheduling Conference
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference - FORM - Hoyt
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?