Alfandary v. Nikko Asset Management Co., Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-05137
District Judge Robert W. Sweet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 24, 2021 at 6:06 PM DT (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bill Wilder, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crosby & Higgins, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
Space Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
No Logo Christina Alfandary, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crosby & Higgins, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
Space Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
No Logo Jeffrey Hansen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crosby & Higgins, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
Space Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
No Logo Laurie Vicari, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crosby & Higgins, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
Space Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
No Logo Timothy McCarthy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crosby & Higgins, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
Space Todd Higgins +1 646 452 2300 +1 646 452 2301 thiggins@crosbyhiggins.com
v.
No Logo Nikko Asset Management Co., Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Takumi Shibata, Defendant
Citation Section 12 U.S.C. § 22
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support (non-motion)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law (non-motion)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law (non-motion)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support (non-motion)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support (non-motion)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law (non-motion)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Reply (non-motion)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Rule 56.1 Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Local Rule 37.2 Conference
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/12/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Opposition Brief
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION: re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by Nikko Asset Management Co., Ltd., Takumi Shibata, Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Holdings, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Bank, Limited. In light of the above, personal jur isdiction may be exerted over Nikko, Shibata, SMTB and SMTH. Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is denied. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/4/2018) (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takumi Shibata. (laq) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takumi Shibata, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Christina Alfandary, Jeffrey Hansen, Timothy McCarthy, Laurie Vicari, Bill Wilder. (Higgins, Todd) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nikko Asset Management Co., Ltd. (kl) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nikko Asset Management Co., Ltd., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Christina Alfandary, Jeffrey Hansen, Timothy McCarthy, Laurie Vicari, Bill Wilder. (Higgins, Todd) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PARTY NAME ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takumi Shibata, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Christina Alfandary, Jeffrey Hansen, Timothy McCarthy, Laurie Vicari, Bill Wilder. (Higgins, Todd) Modified on 7/10/2017 (kl). (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Higgins, Todd) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Nikko Asset Management Co., Ltd., Takumi Shibata. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13871059)Document filed by Timothy McCarthy, Christina Alfandary, Laurie Vicari, Jeffrey Hansen, Bill Wilder.(Higgins, Todd) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 788 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?