National Labor Relations Board v. Garcia
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-21169

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 7:49 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marinelly Maldonado +1 305 530 7034 +5365 536 536 5320 marinelly.maldonado@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Vilma Garcia, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0160
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT Closing Case. Motions terminated: 6 MOTION to Compel Response filed by National Labor Relations Board,, 12 MOTION to Withdraw Document Motion to Withdraw Application filed by National Labor Relations Board,. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/12/2017. (rms1) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 07/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Withdraw Document Motion to Withdraw Application by National Labor Relations Board,. Responses due by 7/26/2017 (Maldonado, Marinelly)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Compliance - per DE# 10 -Order directing the Clerk of Court to re-designate this matter as a contested CIVIL case (mr1) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          PAPERLESS Order directing the Clerk of Court to re-designate this matter as a contested civil case for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/10/2017. (rkn) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to 8 Order to Show Cause. (rms1) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE setting Show Cause Hearing for 7/21/2017 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Show Cause Response due by 7/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/28/2017. (eaa) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER REFERRING matters relating to the Application for Order requiring Obedience to Subpoena Ad Testificandum to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes with receipt of notices for all filings in case Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/5/2017. (lk) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to Compel Response by National Labor Relations Board,. Responses due by 5/19/2017 (Maldonado, Marinelly) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2017-18 to Magistrate Judge Alicia Otazo-Reyes. (vp) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board, re 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, Amended Certificate of Service (Maldonado, Marinelly) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re Terminated Case. Document Stricken Due to Filing Error. Case Reopened. (ail) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez (rms1) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Application for subpoena enforcement. Filing fee $47.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by National Labor Relations Board,. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Maldonado, Marinelly) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              **STRICKEN** Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (rms1) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. Text Modified on 3/30/2017 per DE 3 Clerk's Notice of Correction (ail).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Case Reopened. Clerk's Notice striking Civil Case Terminated (rms1) Modified on 3/30/2017 (rms1).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?