Reyes, Jr. v. Lincoln Automotive Financial S
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-2104

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 14, 2017 at 11:07 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until 07/20/2017 to file petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc [78] filed by Appellant Alberto Reyes, Jr., by DJ, FILED. [2069629][83] [16-2104] [Entered: 06/30/2017 08:56 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Alberto Reyes, Jr., FILED. Service date 06/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2068634] [16-2104] [Entered: 06/28/2017 08:30 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alberto Reyes, Jr., FILED. Service date 06/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2068584] [16-2104] [Entered: 06/28/2017 05:03 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        JUDGMENT, FILED.[2063986] [16-2104] [Entered: 06/22/2017 10:48 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          OPINION, affirming the district court judgment, by JMW, DJ, BDP, C.JJ., FILED.[2063775] [16-2104] [Entered: 06/22/2017 09:02 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2063765] [16-2104] [Entered: 06/22/2017 08:55 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw as counsel [63] filed by Appellee Lincoln Automotive Financial Services, by DJ, FILED. [2008824][67] [16-2104] [Entered: 04/11/2017 12:18 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 74 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?