McAninch v. Berryhill
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00187

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 26, 2019 at 12:22 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 206
Nature of Suit Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 6/19/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (khm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's claim is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. on 6/19/2018. (khm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Administrative Record - Social Security Transcript
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?