Stockham v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-03982

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 4:13 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Boyd Lee Stockham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wood Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dashiell Shapiro +1 415 321 9124 +1 415 834 1888 Shapiro@woodllp.com
No Logo Dani Jane Stockham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wood Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dashiell Shapiro +1 415 321 9124 +1 415 834 1888 Shapiro@woodllp.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jose Apolinar Olivera +1 415 436 6888 +1 415 436 7009 jose.olivera@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7426
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, 35 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Stipulation of Dismissal filed by United States of America. (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER RESETTING Further Case Management Conference from 3/15/2018 to 4/26/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States of America. (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 31 Case Management Statement (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
              CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America. (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CLERK'S NOTICE. Further CMC set for 2/8/18 at 10:30 a.m. An updated Joint CMC statement was due 2/1/18. An updated joint CMC statement or stipulation for dismissal shall be filed by 2/5/18. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/01/2017, before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 11:53 a.m. - 11:55 a.m. = 2 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/15/2018. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge Edward M. Chen by United States of America, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: 12/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Amended Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/09/17, before Judge Chen. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 20 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2018. (Related documents(s) 20 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Settlement Conference held on 12/1/2017. Case settled. Confidential terms of the settlement were placed on the record. Parties may obtain a copy of the FTR Recording and/or transcript without a Court order. (Sealed FTR Time: 11:53-11:55.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Dashiell Shapiro. Attorney for Defendant: Jose Olivera. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/1/2017) Modified on 1/9/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          *** FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOCKET #27 *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/09/17, before Judge Chen. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 20 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2018. (Related documents(s) 20 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 11/27/2017) Modified on 12/4/2017 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 23 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Appear by Telephone United States' Unopposed Motion to Excuse Individual with Full Settlement Authority from Attending December 1, 2017 Settlement Conference and Allow to Be Available by Telephone filed by United States of America. (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: 11/17/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/17/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/17/2017. Settlement conference set for 12/1/2017 at 9:30 AM. The Court will issue a settlement conference order. (Total Time in Court: 5 minutes.) (Not reported. )Attorney for Plaintiffs: Dashiell Shapiro. Attorney for Defendant: Jose Olivera. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2017) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/9/2017 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Boyd Lee Stockham, Dani Jane Stockham, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Shapiro, Dashiell) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Changing Time of Telephonic Scheduling Conference: At the request of counsel, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 11/17/2017 is reset for 02:00 PM in Chambers-SF before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. The dial-in information will remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers-SF before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/13/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2017 re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. Court took matter under submission. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Batalo. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER REGARDING NOVEMBER 9, 2017 HEARING. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on November 8, 2017. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America. (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                REPLY (re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Defendant United States' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to United States' Motion to Dismiss filed byUnited States of America. (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byBoyd Lee Stockham, Dani Jane Stockham. (Shapiro, Dashiell) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 10/12/2017 to 11/9/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/18/2017. Replies due by 10/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olivera, Jose) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Summons Issued as to United States of America, Department of Justice (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2017, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Proposed Summons. (Shapiro, Dashiell) (Filed on 7/29/2017) (Entered: 07/29/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/30/2017, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Shapiro, Dashiell) (Filed on 7/29/2017) (Entered: 07/29/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boyd Lee Stockham, Dani Jane Stockham. United States of America served on 7/14/2017, answer due 9/12/2017. (Shapiro, Dashiell) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Summons Issued as to United States of America. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Proposed Summons. (Shapiro, Dashiell) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: 7/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Case assigned to Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              COMPLAINT FOR DETERMINATION OF VALUE OF FEDERAL TAX LIEN against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11548842). Filed by Boyd Lee Stockham, Dani Jane Stockham. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G)(Shapiro, Dashiell) (Filed on 7/14/2017) Modified on 7/17/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Electronic filing error Re: 8 Proposed Summons filed by Dani Jane Stockham, Boyd Lee Stockham. Commissioner of Internal Revenue is not a named defendant on the Complaint. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Proposed Summons must be filed under the Proposed Summons event. Only one summons may be issued. Please re-file one summons listing all defendants. [err101] Re:[1-2][1-3][1-4] Proposed Summons, filed by Dani Jane Stockham, Boyd Lee Stockham (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?