Crystallex International Corp v. Petroleos de Venezuela SA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-4012

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 16, 2017 at 11:14 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 003012652006 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/15/2017 by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439] (NPE)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012643084 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert L. Weigel on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp. [16-4012, 17-1439] (RLW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 003012640873 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Crystallex International Corp in 16-4012, 17-1439, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/01/2017 by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439] (JWM)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012640593 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jason W. Myatt on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp. [16-4012, 17-1439] (JWM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012611968 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439, filed. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2017 by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439] (NPE)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012611964 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439, filed. Certificate of Service dated 05/02/2017 by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439] (NPE)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012610185 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Appellant(s) PDV Holding Inc.. [17-1439, 16-4012] (KJN)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012572281 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc due on or before 05/02/2017. Appendix due on or before 05/02/2017. [16-4012, 17-1439] (JK)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012572263 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER (CHAGARES and VANASKIE, Circuit Judges) Appellee's request to lift the Clerk's 01/13/17 stay is GRANTED and Appellant's request that the stay be continued is DENIED, filed. Panel No.: DCO-054. VANASKIE, Authoring Judge. [16-4012, 17-1439] (JK)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012561186 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: CORRECTED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc, filed. (NPE)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012550090 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER (Clerk) referring to a motions panel the letter repsonse from Appellant to Clerk's January 13, 2017 Order Staying Case, requesting that the case continue to be stayed and Letter Response from Appellee Crystallex International Corp. to Clerk's January 13, 2017 Order Staying Case, requesting that stay be lifted, filed. [16-4012, 17-1439] (SB)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012550039 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CLERK ORDER consolidating the Appeals at Nos. 16-4012 and 17-1439 for all purposes, filed. [16-4012, 17-1439] (SB)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012548421 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Travis S. Hunter, Esq. for Appellee Crystallex International Corp Letter regarding status report. Certificate of Service dated 02/24/2017. (TSH)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012547303 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Nathan P. Eimer, Esq. for Appellant PDV Holding Inc Letter to the Court responding to Jan.13, 2017 Order. Certificate of Service dated 02/23/2017. (NPE)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012511525 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER (Clerk) The appeal is stayed pending disposition of the petition for permission to appeal at No. 17-8001. Within 14 days of the date of the order disposing of the petition for permission to appeal, the parites should file responses addressing the status of the motion to dismiss filed in the District Court. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE TEXT, filed. (JK)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012505627 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ECF FILER: Show Cause Response filed by Attorney Travis S. Hunter, Esq. for Appellee Crystallex International Corp. (TSH)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012505330 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ECF FILER: Show Cause Response filed by Attorney Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esq. for Appellant PDV Holding Inc and Not Parties Petroleos de Venezuela SA and Citgo Holding Inc. (KJN)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012505009 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lisa S. Meyer on behalf of Appellant(s) PDV Holding, Inc.. (LSM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012505003 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of Appellant(s) PDV Holding, Inc.. (NPE)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012496736 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ORDER (Clerk) directing an Answer to be filed. Answer due 01/06/2017. (SLC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012496731 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER (Clerk) vacating briefing notice issued on 12/12/2016, filed. (SLC)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012485542 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc due on or before 01/23/2017. Appendix due on or before 01/23/2017. VACATED per Clerk's Order of 12/23/16.--[Edited 12/23/2016 by SLC] (JK)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012480136 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant PDV Holding Inc advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. (KJN)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012480127 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant PDV Holding Inc, received. (KJN)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012480124 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc, filed. (KJN)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012480116 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc, filed. (KJN)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012480113 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Appellant(s) PDV Holding Inc.. (KJN)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012468483 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      FOLLOW UP LETTER to Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II, Esq. for Petroleos de Venezuela SA and Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esq. for Petroleos de Venezuela SA and Citgo Holding Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/05/2016. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/05/2016. (JK)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012468437 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esq. for PDV Holding Inc and Petroleos de Venezuela SA and Citgo Holding Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/05/2016. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/05/2016. Information Statement on or before 12/05/2016. Concise Summary on or before 12/05/2016. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 12/05/2016. (JK)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012465835 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Crystallex International Corp, filed. (TSH)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012465819 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Raymond J. DiCamillo of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp.. (TSH)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012465813 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Travis S. Hunter of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp.. (TSH)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012465788 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey L. Moyer of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp.. (JLM)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012453330 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant PDV Holding Inc in District Court No. 1-15-cv-01082. (JK)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?