J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Eboni J. Malone
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-02772

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 24, 2019 at 7:15 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge William D. Keller: For the reasons stated herein, a Response to this Court's Order to Show Cause is due by 11/22/2017. (cw)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Response
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?